Asha Lane Gibson v. NSA
Original Case: 6:15-cv-00132
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:15-cv.us-01413 |
Type | civil u.s. / united states |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 22, 2015 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 02, 2015 9:46 PM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
U.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
FBI
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
IBM CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES NAVY
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ASHA LANE GIBSON
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jun 22 2015
UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Originating case number: 6:15-cv-00132-HMH Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [999606364]. Mailed to: Gibson. [15-1413] |
Docket last updated: 09/02/2015 9:01 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 21, 2015 | ||
1 | 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 6:15-cv-00132-HMH. Case manager: PStump. 15-1413 (PKS) | |
2 | 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Asha Lane Gibson - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 05/21/2015 Originating case number: 6:15-cv-00132-HMH. Mailed to: Gibson. 15-1413 (PKS) | |
Att: 1 1 pgs | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs form(s) sent | ||
3 | 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Gibson. Informal Opening Brief due 05/15/2015 Informal response brief, if any: 17 days after informal opening brief filed. 15-1413 (PKS) | |
Att: 1 11 pgs | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs disclosure form | ||
4 | 4 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 6:15-cv-00132-HMH. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. 15-1413 (PKS) |