Nebraska District Court
Judge:Joseph F Bataillon
Referred: Thomas D Thalken
Case #: 8:15-cv-00135
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause15:1126 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 22, 2015
Terminated:Sep 28, 2016
Last checked: Monday Oct 19, 2015 9:50 AM CDT
Defendant
HARVEST TRADING GROUP INC
Defendant
PROMERA HEALTH, LLC
Defendant
Harvest Trading Group, Inc.
Represented By
Luke C. Holst
Mcgrath, North Law Firm
contact info
Patrick E. Brookhouser, Jr.
Mcgrath, North Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Promera Health, LLC
Represented By
Luke C. Holst
Mcgrath, North Law Firm
contact info
Patrick E. Brookhouser, Jr.
Mcgrath, North Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
UNEMED CORPORTATION
Represented By
Robert M. Slovek
Kutak, Rock Law Firm - Omaha
contact info
Plaintiff
VIREO SYSTEMS, INC
Represented By
Andre R. Barry
Cline, Williams Law Firm - Lincoln
contact info
Plaintiff
UNeMed Corporation
Represented By
Robert M. Slovek
Kutak, Rock Law Firm - Omaha
contact info
Andre R. Barry
Cline, Williams Law Firm - Lincoln
contact info
Plaintiff
Vireo Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Stephen H. Hall
Bradley, Arant Law Firm - Huntsville
contact info
Robert M. Slovek
Kutak, Rock Law Firm - Omaha
contact info
Andre R. Barry
Cline, Williams Law Firm - Lincoln
contact info

GPO Jul 10 2015
ORDER on a telephone conference with counsel for the parties on July 10, 2015. In view of the defendants' pending Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to Transfer 19, the parties shall have ten (10) days from the date the court rules on the motion to schedule a telephone planning conference with the court, if necessary. Counsel for the plaintiffs shall contact the chambers of the undersigned magistrate judge within such time period to schedule the telephone planning conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
GPO Mar 30 2016
ORDER granting Motion to Consolidate Cases (Filing No. 80 in case 8:16cv08). The two cases listed in this order are consolidated for all purposes. Case No. 8:15CV135 is hereby designated as the "Lead Case." Case number 8:16CV08 is hereby designated as the "Member Case." The parties shall have until April 19, 2016, to meet, confer, and file either a planning report pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) encompassing both cases or a stipulation with regard to the progression of the newly consolidated action. Any objection to this Order shall be filed with the Clerk within 14 days after being served with a copy of this Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
GPO Sep 28 2016
s own costs and attorney's fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the above captioned, consolidated cases (Case No. 8:15-CV-00135-JFB-TDT and Case No. 8:16-CV-00008-JFB-TDT) are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear it

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, September 28, 2016
60 60 utility Report regarding Patent & Trademark (FIREFOX ONLY) Wed 09/28 1:29 PM
REPORT on the determination of an action regarding Patent. Order of Dismissal filed on September 28, 2016. Notification sent to U.S. Patent Office. (TCL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order of Dismissal
59 59 order Order on Stipulation for Dismissal Wed 09/28 11:27 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the above captioned, consolidated cases (Case No. 8:15-CV-00135-JFB-TDT and Case No. 8:16-CV-00008-JFB-TDT) are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2016
58 58 motion Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 09/26 2:03 PM
JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Attorney Luke C. Holst on behalf of Counter Claimants Harvest Trading Group, Inc., Promera Health, LLC, Defendants Harvest Trading Group, Inc., Promera Health, LLC.Member Cases: 8:15-cv-00135-JFB-TDT, 8:16-cv-00008-JFB-TDT(Holst, Luke)
Related: [-]