7
|
|
7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/31 1:20 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Solaray, LLC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Stromberg, Matthew)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Mon 08/31 2:27 PM
***Civil Case Terminated per chambers.(hw)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
order
Reassigning Case
Mon 07/06 3:24 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 07/06/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(aa)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
notice
Notice of Filing of Bankruptcy
Fri 07/03 12:55 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF BANKRUPTCY by Brendan McPherson on behalf of Gas-Mart USA, Inc.(McPherson, Brendan)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A - Voluntary Petition
|
4
|
|
4
service
Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED
Fri 06/12 1:39 PM
Alias SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- email to counsel for Defendant upon the parties' agreement, by Solaray, LLC. upon Gas-Mart USA, Inc. served on 5/26/2015, answer due 6/16/2015 (Stromberg, Matthew)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
service
Alias Summons Issued
Fri 05/22 12:13 PM
ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gas-Mart USA, Inc. Summons emailed to Plaintiff's Attorney for service. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ta)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
service
Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED
Tue 05/05 2:14 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Solaray, LLC. upon Gas-Mart USA, Inc. served on 4/27/2015, answer due 5/18/2015 (Stromberg, Matthew)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/27 11:12 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gas-Mart USA, Inc. Summons emailed to Plaintiff's Attorney for service. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ta)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/24 4:23 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Solaray, LLC.. (Stromberg, Matthew)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/24 4:22 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-3393405.), filed by Solaray, LLC..(Stromberg, Matthew)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Fri 04/24 4:37 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ta)
Related: [-]
|