Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Halil S Ozerden
Referred: John C Gargiulo
Case #: 1:15-cv-00139
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:1334 Bankruptcy Appeal
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2015
Terminated:Sep 30, 2015

Debtor
Herman L. Fairley

,
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 21, 2015 9:52 AM CDT
Defendant
Walter J. Ledda
Represented By
Rex M. Shannon, III
Wise, Carter, Child & Caraway, Pa - Jackson
contact info
Dudley Collier Graham, Jr.
Wise, Carter, Child & Caraway
contact info
Defendant
Morgan Drexen, Inc.
Represented By
Rex M. Shannon, III
Wise, Carter, Child & Caraway, Pa - Jackson
contact info
Dudley Collier Graham, Jr.
Wise, Carter, Child & Caraway
contact info
Defendant
Tami L. Munsch
Represented By
Rex M. Shannon, III
Wise, Carter, Child & Caraway, Pa - Jackson
contact info
Dudley Collier Graham, Jr.
Wise, Carter, Child & Caraway
contact info
Interested Party
U.S. Bankruptcy Court-Gulfport
Dan M. Russell, Jr. U.S. Courthouse 2012 15th St., Suite 244
Gulfport, MS 39501
Plaintiff
Kimberly R. Lentz
Represented By
Jason E. Graeber
Jason Graeber Attorney At Law
contact info
Trustee
Kimberly R. Lentz
2505 14th Street Suite 100
Gulfport, MS 39501
Represented By
Jason E. Graeber
Jason Graeber Attorney At Law
contact info
Matthew Stephen Lott
Law Office Of Matthew S. Lott
contact info
Trustee
U.S. Trustee
501 East Court Street Suite 6-430
Jackson, MS 39201


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, September 30, 2015
7 7 15 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Wed 09/30 11:02 AM
Memorandum Opinion and Order Affirming the United States Bankruptcy Court and Dismissing Appeal re1 Bankruptcy Appeal Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 9/30/2015 (wld)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 13, 2015
6 6 appeal Appellants Reply Brief Sat 06/13 12:57 AM
Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by Kimberly R. Lentz. (Graeber, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2015
5 5 appeal Appellees Brief Wed 06/03 9:07 AM
Appellee's BRIEF by Tami L. Munsch. (Shannon, Rex)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 16, 2015
4 4 appeal Appellants Brief Sat 05/16 3:52 PM
Appellant's BRIEF by Kimberly R. Lentz, Kimberly R. Lentz. Appellee Brief due by 6/15/2015(Graeber, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State of West Virginia v Morgan Drexen,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Consumer Fin. Prot. Bureau v Morgan Drexen
Wednesday, May 13, 2015
3 3 utility Remark Wed 05/13 12:51 PM
Record on Appeal (wld)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Clerk's Certificate,
Att: 2 Part 1,
Att: 3 Part 2,
Att: 4 Part 3,
Att: 5 Part 4,
Att: 6 Part 5,
Att: 7 Part 6,
Att: 8 Part 7,
Att: 9 Part 8
Tuesday, April 28, 2015
2 2 misc Letter Tue 04/28 3:29 PM
Letter from U.S. Bankruptcy Court with complete docket sheet. (wld)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket Sheet
Friday, April 24, 2015
1 1 2 pgs appeal Bankruptcy Appeal Mon 04/27 11:02 AM
Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 13-52526 The docketing of the appeal starts the briefing schedule. Attorneys should refer to Bankruptcy Rule 8009 for all briefing schedules.Appeal filed by Kimberly R. Lentz.(wld)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Clerk's Notice,
Att: 2 Transmittal Letter,
Att: 3 Docket Sheet