Arizona District Court
Judge:Stephen M Mcnamee
Case #: 2:15-cv-00757
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 24, 2015
Terminated:Sep 27, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 21, 2015 8:35 AM MST
Defendant
FreeLife International Holdings LLC
Represented By
David Andrew Gaona
Coppersmith Brockelman PLC
contact info
Kent S Brockelman
Coppersmith Brockelman PLC
contact info
Marvin Christopher cRuth
Coppersmith Brockelman PLC
contact info
Defendant
Freelife International Incorporated
Represented By
David Andrew Gaona
Coppersmith Brockelman PLC
contact info
Kent S Brockelman
Coppersmith Brockelman PLC
contact info
Marvin Christopher cRuth
Coppersmith Brockelman PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
NLABS SA de CV
Represented By
Craig William Broadbent
Law Offices Of Donald W Hudspeth PC
contact info
Brian K Stanley
Law Offices Of Donald W Hudspeth PC
contact info
Patrick J Ascione
Ascione & Associates LLC
contact info
Donald Wayne Hudspeth
Law Offices Of Donald W Hudspeth PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM MST
Friday, September 27, 2019
50 50 minute_ord ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 09/27 9:31 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Notice of Consent and Voluntary Dismissal49 ,Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2019
49 49 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Entire Case/Action Thu 09/26 4:36 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by FreeLife International Holdings LLC, Freelife International Incorporated. (Brockelman, Kent)
Related: [-]