California Northern District Court
Judge:Beth Labson Freeman
Referred: Nathanael M Cousins
Case #: 5:15-cv-00334
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2015
Terminated:May 26, 2015
Last checked: Thursday Oct 01, 2015 8:44 AM PDT
3rd party defendant
Scott Anderson
5659 W. Warwick St.
Chicago, IL 60634
Represented By
Stephen Charles McArthur
Stubbs Alderton
contact info
3rd party defendant
The 5659 Design Co
5659 W. Warwick St.
Chicago, IL 60634
Represented By
Stephen Charles McArthur
Stubbs Alderton
contact info
3rd party plaintiff
Marshmallow Skins, Inc.
Represented By
Gregory Timothy Victoroff
Rohde & Victoroff
contact info
Defendant
Scott Anderson
5659 W. Warwick St.
Chicago, IL 60634
Defendant
Marshmallow Skins, Inc.
Represented By
Gregory Timothy Victoroff
Rohde & Victoroff
contact info
Defendant
The 5659 Design Co
5659 W. Warwick St.
Chicago, IL 60634
Plaintiff
Victor Chapa
Represented By
David Alden Erikson
Erikson Law Group
contact info
S. Ryan Patterson
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, June 15, 2015
26 26 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 06/15 2:39 PM
STIPULATION for Dismissal of Third Party Complaint (Impleader) filed by Marshmallow Skins, Inc.. (Victoroff, Gregory) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 26, 2015
25 25 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 05/26 12:20 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL filed by Marshmallow Skins, Inc.. (Victoroff, Gregory) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2015
24 24 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Thu 05/21 4:58 PM
STIPULATION for extension of time to file Answer filed by Scott Anderson, The 5659 Design Co. (McArthur, Stephen) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 12, 2015
23 23 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/12 4:51 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marshmallow Skins, Inc.. Scott Anderson, an individual (Victoroff, Gregory) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/12 4:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marshmallow Skins, Inc.. Marshmallow Skins, Inc. served on 5/1/2015, answer due 5/22/2015. (Victoroff, Gregory) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Affidavit of Service Tue 05/12 4:47 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Third Party Complaint and summons served on 5659 Design Co.; Scott Anderson on May 1, 2015, filed by Marshmallow Skins, Inc.. (Victoroff, Gregory) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 27, 2015
20 20 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/27 10:31 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION TO DISMISS; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 7 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction: Motion Hearing set for 06/25/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Case Management Statement due by 06/18/2015. Case Management Conference set for 06/25/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. All other deadlines associated with the initial case management conference are adjusted accordingly. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf ***THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENTRY*** (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/27 9:23 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Beth Labson Freeman and Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/27/15. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
Related: [-]
adr ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held Mon 04/27 3:27 PM
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Robin Siefkin on 4/27/2015. Neither side appeared for the call. A further ADR Phone Conference is scheduled on 6/16/2015 at 1:30 PM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 24, 2015
18 18 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2015
17 17 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [PROPOSED] ORDER; filed by Marshmallow Skins, Inc.. (Victoroff, Gregory) (Filed on 4/23/2015) Modified on 4/24/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 22, 2015
ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference previously scheduled on 4/23/2015 has been rescheduled to 4/27/2015 at 3:00 PM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2015)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 10, 2015
16 16 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Thursday, April 23, 2015 at 10:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 09, 2015
15 15 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Erikson, David) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
Related: [-]
14 14 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Victoroff, Gregory) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
Related: [-]
13 13 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Victoroff, Gregory) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
Related: [-]
12 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marshmallow Skins, Inc... (Victoroff, Gregory) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
Related: [-]
11 11 ***erroneous docket entry***CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marshmallow Skins, Inc. (Victoroff, Gregory) (Filed on 4/9/2015) Modified on 4/9/2015 (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
10 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/22/2015. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 08, 2015
9 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Marshmallow Skins, Inc. (Victoroff, Gregory) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
Related: [-]
8 8 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT (IMPLEADER) against The 5659 Design Co, Scott Anderson. Filed byMarshmallow Skins, Inc..(Victoroff, Gregory) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
7 7 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Marshmallow Skins, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 4/22/2015. Replies due by 4/29/2015.(Victoroff, Gregory) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 05, 2015
6 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Victor Chapa re5 Summons Issued,1 Complaint, (Erikson, David) (Filed on 3/5/2015)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 26, 2015
5 5 Summons Issued as to Marshmallow Skins, Inc. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
Related: [-]
4 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 23, 2015
3 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2015. Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2015 10:00 AM.(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Standing Order,
Att: 3 Standing Order
2 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Marshmallow Skins, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9232958.). Filed byVictor Chapa.(Erikson, David) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Summons