New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 7:15-bk-22581
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2015
Terminated:Aug 06, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
A'Mangiare of Elmsford, Inc.
121 E Main St
Elmsford, NY 10523-3217
Represented By
Anne J. Penachio
Penachio Malara LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


1. A'Mangiare in Elmsford files Chapter 11 bankruptcy (lohud.com)
Submitted Thu 05/14/2015
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, October 21, 2015
13 13 6 pgs misc Transcript Thu 10/22 5:20 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on July 30, 2015 at 10:41 AM RE: Motion to Dismiss Case Voluntarily. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/19/2016. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: TypeWrite Word Processing Service.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/28/2015. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 11/12/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/23/2015. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/19/2016. (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 06, 2015
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 08/06 7:29 AM
Case Closed. (Logue Togher, Claire)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2015
12 12 misc Certificate of Mailing - Order to Dismiss Thu 08/06 12:30 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Order to Dismiss Related [+] . Notice Date 08/05/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #11 )
Monday, August 03, 2015
11 11 order Motion, Dismiss Case Mon 08/03 11:21 AM
Order signed 7/31/2015 Granting Debtor's Motion to Dismiss Case Related [+]. (Logue Togher, Claire) Modified on 8/3/2015 (Correa, Mimi)
Related: [-] 9
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Mon 08/03 11:24 AM
Pending Deadlines Terminated -- case dismissed. (Logue Togher, Claire)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2015
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/08 11:36 AM
Certificate of Service for Notice of Hearing on the Debtor's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss its Chapter 11 case Related [+] Filed by Anne J. Penachio on behalf of A'Mangiare of Elmsford, Inc.. (Penachio, Anne)
Related: [-] 9
Tuesday, July 07, 2015
9 9 motion Motion, Dismiss Case Tue 07/07 2:48 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case Voluntarily filed by Anne J. Penachio on behalf of A'Mangiare of Elmsford, Inc. with hearing to be held on 7/30/2015 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse. (Penachio, Anne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Newspaper article
Att: 2 Exhibit B In Re Weidenbenner Decision
Att: 3 Exhibit C Proposed order
Monday, June 08, 2015
8 8 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Mon 06/08 8:16 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing - Notice of Adjournment of Meeting of Creditors (to July 8, 2015, at 1:00 p.m.), filed by Andrew D. Velez-Rivera on behalf of United States Trustee. (Velez-Rivera, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 13, 2015
7 7 motion Application, Extend Time to File Schedules Wed 05/13 3:23 PM
Application to Extend Time to File Schedules filed by Anne J. Penachio on behalf of A'Mangiare of Elmsford, Inc.. (Penachio, Anne)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 01, 2015
6 6 misc Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting Sat 05/02 12:26 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Related [+] . Notice Date 05/01/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #3 )
Wednesday, April 29, 2015
5 5 notice Notice, Appearance Wed 04/29 6:10 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for PACER DOCS Only filed by Gavin McGrane on behalf of PacerPro, Inc.. (McGrane, Gavin)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Affirmation Wed 04/29 10:48 AM
Affirmation pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 1007-2 filed by Anne J. Penachio on behalf of A'Mangiare of Elmsford, Inc.. (Penachio, Anne)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc 341(a) Notice (Chapter 11,12) (BNC) Wed 04/29 10:17 AM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/10/2015 at 01:30 PM at Room 243A, White Plains Courthouse. (Vargas, Ana)
Related: [-]
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Wed 04/29 9:48 AM
Pending Deadlines Terminated: Balance Sheet; Income Tax Return; Schedule C; Statement of Operations and Summ. of Schedules Pg 2 . (Vargas, Ana)
Related: [-]
misc Set Deficiency Deadlines Wed 04/29 9:51 AM
Deficiencies Set: Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit due by: 5/12/2015. Incomplete Filings due by 5/12/2015. (Vargas, Ana)
Related: [-]
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Wed 04/29 11:19 AM
Pending Deadlines TERMINATED: Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit. (Logue Togher, Claire)
Related: [-]
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Wed 04/29 11:28 AM
Pending Deadlines TERMINATED: Chapter 11 Small Business Plan -- Not Applicable. (Logue Togher, Claire)
Related: [-]
misc Set Deficiency Deadlines Wed 04/29 11:29 AM
Deficiencies Set: Schedule H due 5/12/2015. Incomplete Filings due by 5/12/2015. (Logue Togher, Claire)
Related: [-]
utility Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadlines Wed 04/29 11:39 AM
Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline Updated: Chapter 11 Plan and Chapter 11 Disclosure Statement due 9/1/2015. (Logue Togher, Claire)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 28, 2015
2 2 misc Letter Tue 04/28 4:24 PM
Letter /Corporate Resolution Filed by Anne J. Penachio on behalf of A'Mangiare of Elmsford, Inc.. (Penachio, Anne)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 04/28 4:11 PM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. Schedule A due 05/12/2015. Schedule B due 05/12/2015. Schedule C due 05/12/2015. Schedule D due 05/12/2015. Schedule E due 05/12/2015. Schedule F due 05/12/2015. Schedule G due 05/12/2015. Summary of schedules - Page 1 due 05/12/2015. Summary of schedules - Page 2 (Statistical Summary) due 05/12/2015. Statement of Financial Affairs due 05/12/2015. Atty Disclosure State. due 05/12/2015. Statement of Operations Due: 05/12/2015. Balance Sheet Due Date:05/12/2015. Federal Income Tax Return Date: 05/12/2015 Incomplete Filings due by 05/12/2015, Small Business Chapter 11 Plan due by 2/22/2016, Filed by Anne J. Penachio of Penachio Malara LLP on behalf of A'Mangiare of Elmsford, Inc.. (Penachio, Anne)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Tue 04/28 4:18 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-22581 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 10672456. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1