Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Robin J Cauthron
Referred: Gary M Purcell
Case #: 5:15-cv-00446
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2015
Terminated:Jun 30, 2015

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, June 30, 2015
16 16 order Judgment Tue 06/30 3:20 PM
JUDGMENT; copy mailed to Neal Flowers, PAULS VALLEY-GCDC, 201 W Grant St, Pauls Valley, OK 73075. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 6/30/15. (lg)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order Adopting Report and Recommendation Tue 06/30 3:17 PM
ORDER ADOPTING12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; counts as a strike; copy mailed to Neal Flowers, PAULS VALLEY-GCDC, 201 W Grant St, Pauls Valley, OK 73075. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 6/30/15. (lg)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2015
14 14 respm Objection to Report and Recommendation Tue 06/30 7:43 AM
OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION12 filed by Neal Flowers.(cps)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Newclip,
Att: 2 Envelope
Tuesday, June 23, 2015
13 13 notice ~Notice (other) Tue 06/23 2:23 PM
NOTICE of article in Wynnewood Gazette by Neal Flowers(cps)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, June 22, 2015
12 12 motion Report and Recommendation Mon 06/22 4:00 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Complaint filed by Neal Flowers. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's cause of action be DISMISSED under 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915A(b) and 1915(e)(2)(B) as frivolous and for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the dismissal of this cause of action count as one "prior occasion" or "strike" pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Objections to R&R due by 7/13/2015. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues referred to the Magistrate Judge, and any pending motion not specifically addressed herein is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 6/22/15. (lb)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 12, 2015
11 11 misc Letter Fri 06/12 2:46 PM
LETTER from Neal Flowers (cps)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, June 04, 2015
10 10 misc Receipt Thu 06/04 3:27 PM
Receipt for Money Received from Neal Flowers in the amount of $16.09, receipt number OKW500046970 regarding1 Complaint. Remaining Balance of Complaint is $ 333.91. (cps)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 20, 2015
9 9 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/20 3:00 PM
ORDER granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis re6 ,8 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 5/20/2015. (brs)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/20 1:40 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Neal Flowers. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (njr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Letter from Neal Flowers,
Att: 2 Envelope
Wednesday, May 13, 2015
7 7 order Order Wed 05/13 10:23 AM
ENTER ORDER: Plaintiff is sua sponte granted an extension of time until June 1, 2015, to cure deficiencies as set out in the Order (Doc. #5) dated April 29, 2015. Plaintiff is advised that failure to comply with this Order may result in a recommendation that Plaintiffs cause of action be dismissed without prejudice to refiling re5 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 5/13/2015. (brs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2015
6 6 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/07 3:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Neal Flowers. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell.(cps)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, April 29, 2015
5 5 order Order Wed 04/29 11:49 AM
ORDER to Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency on or before 5/18/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 4/29/2015. (brs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 28, 2015
4 4 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 04/28 12:01 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell.. By direction of District Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 4/28/15. (pw)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Order Reassigning Case Tue 04/28 11:58 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Robin J. Cauthron for all further proceedings. Honorable Tim Leonard no longer assigned to case. By direction of district Judge Tim Leonard on 4/28/15. (pw)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Previous Cases Tue 04/28 11:52 AM
PREVIOUS CASES (pw)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4 Tue 04/28 2:17 PM
Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4 to Neal Flowers PAULS VALLEY-GCDC 201 W Grant St Pauls Valley, OK 73075 (pw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 27, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/28 11:46 AM
COMPLAINT against Shannon Kile, Ken Moore filed by Neal Flowers.(pw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope