Emma Ragab v. Gerald Heinauer et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Christina A Snyder |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-03155 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Apr 28, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 05, 2015 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 25, 2015 7:35 AM PDT |
Defendant
Gerald Heinauer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emma Ragab
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Sunday, July 05, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Sun 07/05 11:31 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Emma Ragab. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Sturman, David) |
|
Thursday, June 04, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Thu 06/04 3:02 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth Marie Gunter counsel for Defendant Gerald Heinauer. Adding Elizabeth M. Gunter as counsel of record for Defendant for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Gerald Neinauer. (Attorney Elizabeth Marie Gunter added to party Gerald Heinauer(pty:dft))(Gunter, Elizabeth) |
|
Friday, May 15, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Fri 05/15 3:07 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA,,,11 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Document image was scanned rotated 90 degrees.. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (kss) |
|
Wednesday, May 13, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (60 days)
Wed 05/13 4:00 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Emma Ragab, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Genoveva Ortega. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to A. Owens. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to T. Wynn. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned.(Sturman, David) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Proof of Service on US Attorney General, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Proof of Service on Defendant, Gerald Heinauer | ||
Wednesday, May 06, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Wed 05/06 3:42 PM
60-Day Summons Issued re Complaint1 as to Defendant Gerald Heinauer, Director of the Citizenship and Immigration Services, Nebraska Service Center. (gk) |
|
Tuesday, May 05, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Summons Request
Tue 05/05 2:30 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Emma Ragab. (Sturman, David) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Deficiency in Summons - optional html form
Tue 05/05 2:04 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint1 . The following error(s) was found: Blank form AO 440 submitted by plaintiff. Please resubmit form made ready for a clerk's signature/date. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk) |
|
Friday, May 01, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Summons Request
Fri 05/01 12:42 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Emma Ragab. (Sturman, David) |
|
Wednesday, April 29, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Clerical Error (G-11)
Wed 04/29 12:01 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening,5 was issued in error. ***Notice should be disregarded*** (car) |
|
Tuesday, April 28, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form
Tue 04/28 4:40 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 04/28 4:38 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 04/28 2:00 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Emma Ragab. (Sturman, David) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 04/28 1:59 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Emma Ragab, (Sturman, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 04/28 1:43 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-15621470 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Emma Ragab. (Attorney David M Sturman added to party Emma Ragab(pty:pla))(Sturman, David) |