Original Case: 2:13-cv-00935

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:15-cv-03447
Typecivil / private / federal question
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2015
Terminated:Jan 19, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 26, 2016 4:22 AM CST
Amicus Curiae
CENTER FOR COMPETITIVE DEMOCRACY
Represented By
Mark R. Brown
Capital University Law School
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
JON HUSTED
Represented By
Bridget Carty Coontz
Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Sarah E. Pierce
Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Tiffany L. Carwile
Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Ryan Lynn Richardson
Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Intervenor
STATE OF OHIO
Plaintiff - Appellee
CITIZENS IN CHARGE, INC.
Represented By
Maurice Aaron Thompson
1851 Center for Constitutional Law
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
OHIOANS FOR WORKPLACE FREEDOM
Represented By
Maurice Aaron Thompson
1851 Center for Constitutional Law
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CHRISTOPHER LITTLETON
Represented By
Maurice Aaron Thompson
1851 Center for Constitutional Law
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CINCINNATI FOR PENSION REFORM
Represented By
Maurice Aaron Thompson
1851 Center for Constitutional Law
contact info

GPO Jan 19 2016
OPINION and JUDGMENT filed : The district courtâ??s decision on qualified immunity is REVERSED, the district court is directed to grant summary judgment to Husted on the plaintiffsâ?? money-damages claims, and the case is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with the opinion of this court.decision for publication. R. Guy Cole, Jr., Chief Judge; Jeffrey S. Sutton (AUTHORING), Circuit Judge; Robert Holmes Bell, U.S. District Judge for the Western District of Michigan, sitting by designation.

Docket last updated: 01/26/2016 4:22 AM CST
Tuesday, April 28, 2015
The case manager for this case is: Laura Jones (LAJ)
Related: [-]
Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Jon Husted. Transcript needed: n. (LAJ)
Related: [-]