Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Carol A Doyle
Case #: 1:15-bk-15245
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2015
Claims Deadline:May 29, 2015
Terminated:Aug 27, 2015
Plan Confirmed:May 21, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Northwest Bancorporation of Illinois, Inc.
300 E Northwest Hwy
Palatine, IL 60067-8117
Represented By
David R Seligman
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Brad Weiland
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604


1. Northwest Bancorporation to Restructure Under Chapter 11 (thestreet.com)
Submitted Fri 05/01/2015
Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Thursday, August 27, 2015
72 72 court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 08/27 12:11 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed . (Ross, Demetrius)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2015
71 71 order Final Decree Thu 08/27 9:07 AM
Order Granting Motion For Final Decree and Closing Chapter 11 Case Related [+]. Signed on 8/26/2015. (Ross, Demetrius)
Related: [-] 58
70 70 order Compensation Wed 08/26 3:47 PM
Order Granting Application For Compensation Related [+]. Kirkland & Ellis LLP, fees awarded: $271709.50, expenses awarded: $13859.50. Signed on 8/26/2015. (Livermore, Corrina)
Related: [-] 57
69 69 order Employ Wed 08/26 3:44 PM
Order Granting Application to Employ Kirkland & Ellis Llp for Northwest Bancorporation of Illinois, Inc., Kirkland & Ellis International LLP for Northwest Bancorporation of Illinois, Inc. (Collectively, "K&E") Retroactive to the Petition date 4/29/2015. Related [+]. Signed on 8/26/2015. (Livermore, Corrina)
Related: [-] 55
68 68 utility U - Draft Order Wed 08/26 10:59 AM
Draft Order Related [+]. due by 09/09/2015 (Devine, Tina)
Related: [-] #:57 Compensation WITH Notice of Motion
67 67 order Leave Wed 08/26 10:43 AM
(E)Order Granting Motion for Leave Related [+]. Signed on 08/26/2015. (Devine, Tina)
Related: [-] 56
Tuesday, August 25, 2015
66 66 notice 4-Notice of Filing Tue 08/25 7:58 PM
Notice of Filing of (A) Additional Exhibit to Plan Supplement to Debtor's Prepackaged Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization and (B) Waiver Letter Filed by David R Seligman on behalf of Northwest Bancorporation of Illinois, Inc.. (Seligman, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - TruPS Amendments
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Waiver Letter
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
65 65 trustee Quarterly Fee Statement Tue 08/25 6:19 PM
U S Trustee Quarterly Fee Statement for Quarter Ending September 30, 2015 Filed by Brad Weiland on behalf of Northwest Bancorporation of Illinois, Inc.. (Weiland, Brad)
Related: [-]
64 64 misc Statement Tue 08/25 4:04 PM
Supporting Statement Filed by David R Seligman on behalf of Kirkland & Ellis LLP Related [+]. (Seligman, David)
Related: [-] 55 Application to Employ