RNPM, LLC v. Cabrera
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Aida M Delgado-Colon |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-01509 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1345 Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Apr 29, 2015 |
Terminated: | Dec 29, 2015 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 26, 2015 10:43 AM AST |
Defendant
Rosa Milagros Cabrera
|
|
Plaintiff
RNPM, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
48 | 48
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Tue 03/27 10:04 AM
ORDER finding as moot44 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/27/2018. (wm) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
47 | 47
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 02/27 5:36 PM
ORDER. Plaintiff's motion to amend, ECF No. 39, is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, without prejudice, and the Order for Eviction at ECF No. 35 is VACATED. For the same reasons, plaintiff's motion for cancellation of a junior lien, ECF No. 38, is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Furthermore, ECF Nos. 40, 41, 42, 43, are MOOT. Finally, ECF No. 46 is NOTED. Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 2/21/2018.(wm) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
46 | 46
motion
In Compliance
Fri 12/22 3:15 PM
Motion In Compliance as to 45 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,, filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of TRM, LLC Responses due by 1/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Wed 12/20 9:13 AM
ORDER re44 Motion to Amend/Correct. HELD IN ABEYANCE. Plaintiff shall inform the Court within ten calendar days from the issuance of this Order whether the mortgage in question is an FHA-approved loan, or one under either Fannie Mae or Freddie Mac. If so, plaintiff shall show cause within that term as to why the case should not be subject to the temporary foreclosure moratorium instituted by the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) for properties in areas impacted by Hurricanes Harvey, Irma and Maria, see HUD Mortgagee Letter 2017-15; or under temporary servicing requirements for mortgages impacted by Hurricane Maria. See Freddie Macs Bulletin number 2017-21 of September 25, 2017, and Fannie Maes News Release of October 6, 2016. Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 12/18/2017. (sr) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 09/08 5:19 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Re:42 MOTION to Amend/Correct Re:28 MOTION for Eviction filed by TRM, LLC filed by TRM, LLC filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of TRM, LLC Responses due by 9/22/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
43 | 43
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 09/08 5:15 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Re:41 Second MOTION for Leave to File Document filed by TRM, LLC filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of TRM, LLC Responses due by 9/22/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 08/07 11:50 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Re:28 MOTION for Eviction filed by TRM, LLC filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of TRM, LLC Responses due by 8/21/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
41 | 41
motion
Leave to File Document
Mon 08/07 11:34 AM
Second MOTION for Leave to File Document filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of TRM, LLC Responses due by 8/21/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
motion
Leave to File Document
Thu 07/06 12:19 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Document filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of TRM, LLC Responses due by 7/20/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
39 | 39
motion
Leave to File Document
Thu 07/06 12:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Document filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of TRM, LLC Responses due by 7/20/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Cancellation of Lis Pendens
Fri 03/24 11:50 AM
MOTION for Cancellation of Lis Pendens filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of TRM, LLC Responses due by 4/7/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order on Motion for Confirmation of Sale
Fri 03/17 4:13 PM
ORDER finding as moot30 Motion for Confirmation of Sale. Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/17/17. (gsr) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Confirmation of Sale
Mon 03/13 3:17 PM
Fourth MOTION for Confirmation of Sale filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of TRM, LLC Responses due by 3/27/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order on Motion for Confirmation of Sale
Fri 03/17 4:13 PM
ORDER finding as moot29 Motion for Confirmation of Sale. Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/10/17. (gsr) |
|
35 | 35
order
Order on Motion for Eviction
Fri 03/17 4:12 PM
ORDER granting28 Motion for Eviction. Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/10/17. (gsr) |
|
34 | 34
order
Order on Motion for Confirmation of Sale
Fri 03/17 4:11 PM
ORDER finding as moot27 Motion for Confirmation of Sale. Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/10/17. (gsr) |
|
33 | 33
order
Order on Motion for Confirmation of Sale
Fri 03/17 4:11 PM
ORDER granting26 Motion for Confirmation of Sale. Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/10/17. (gsr) |
|
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Party
Fri 03/17 1:19 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/10/17. (gsr) |
|
31 | 31
order
Memorandum of the Clerk
Fri 03/17 11:40 AM
MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK. In view of the retirement of Judge Jose A. Fuste, this case has been reassigned to the docket of Chief Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon.Signed by Clerk on 3/10/17.(gsr) Modified on 3/17/2017 (gsr) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Confirmation of Sale
Wed 01/11 4:28 PM
Third MOTION for Confirmation of Sale filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of TRM, LLC Responses due by 1/25/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Tuesday, October 04, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Eviction
Tue 10/04 12:37 PM
MOTION for Eviction filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of TRM, LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/21/2016(Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, September 29, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Confirmation of Sale
Thu 09/29 5:11 PM
Second MOTION for Confirmation of Sale filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of TRM, LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/17/2016 (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Friday, June 24, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Confirmation of Sale
Fri 06/24 5:21 PM
MOTION for Confirmation of Sale filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of TRM, LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/11/2016(Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 20, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 05/20 2:02 PM
NOTICE of Hearing to Substitute Party by RNPM, LLC re24 MOTION to Substitute Party (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Substitute Party
Fri 05/20 1:57 PM
MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of RNPM, LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/6/2016(Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, April 05, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
order
Writ Issued
Tue 04/05 3:20 PM
WRIT of Execution Issued as to Rosa Milagros Cabrera. (nat) |
|
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Execution of Judgment
Tue 04/05 3:20 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion for Execution of Judgment. Signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste on 4/5/2016. (nat) |
|
Wednesday, March 30, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Execution of Judgment
Wed 03/30 11:34 AM
MOTION for Execution of Judgment filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of RNPM, LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/18/2016(Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 04, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/04 2:04 PM
NOTICE of Judgment by Publication issued as to Rosa Milagros Cabrera Cruz (jla) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/04 1:22 PM
***FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT JUDGMENT*** NOTICE of Judgment by Publication issued as to Rosa Milagros Cabrera Cruz. (jla) Modified on 2/4/2016 (nat) |
|
Friday, January 22, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion requesting Order
Fri 01/22 3:35 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion requesting Order. Signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste on 1/22/2016. (nat) |
|
Wednesday, January 13, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Requesting Order
Wed 01/13 12:07 PM
MOTION requesting Order re issuance of notice of judgment by publication filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of RNPM, LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/1/2016(Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 29, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Judgment - Default
Tue 12/29 4:10 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Rosa Milagros Cabrera. Signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste on 12/29/2015. (nat) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Tue 12/29 4:04 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Default Judgment. Default Judgment to be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste on 12/29/2015. (nat) |
|
Tuesday, December 22, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Default -Judgment
Tue 12/22 3:35 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Rosa Milagros Cabrera filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of RNPM, LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/8/2016(Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, December 18, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 12/18 4:47 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff will expeditiously move this case to conclusion by default judgment in strict compliance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 55, submitting the necessary affidavits and form of judgment. Signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste on 12/18/2015.(mrj) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Mon 11/16 10:57 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Rosa Milagros Cabrera (su) |
|
Friday, November 13, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Default - Entry
Fri 11/13 12:45 PM
MOTION for Default Entry as to Rosa Milagros Cabrera filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of RNPM, LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/3/2015(Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, October 15, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion In Compliance
Thu 10/15 11:52 AM
ORDER noted9 Motion In Compliance. Plaintiff to proceed accordingly. Signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste on 10/15/2015. (mrj) |
|
Friday, October 09, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
motion
In Compliance
Fri 10/09 11:21 AM
Motion In Compliance filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of RNPM, LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/26/2015 (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Wednesday, October 07, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Wed 10/07 2:24 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff will move this case to conclusion expeditiously, by default or otherwise, or face dismissal for lack of diligent prosecution. Signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste on 10/7/2015.(mrj) |
|
Thursday, August 20, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/20 3:39 PM
Summons by Publication Issued as to Rosa Milagros Cabrera (ar) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Service by Publication
Thu 08/20 2:21 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by Judge Jose A. Fuste on 8/20/2015. (nat) |
|
Monday, August 17, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Service by Publication
Mon 08/17 12:52 PM
MOTION for Service by Publication as to Rosa Milagros Cabrera filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of RNPM, LLC Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/3/2015(Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Mon 08/17 11:53 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by RNPM, LLC as to Rosa Milagros Cabrera. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Thursday, April 30, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/30 10:00 AM
Summons Issued as to Rosa Milagros Cabrera (arg) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Thu 04/30 9:39 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jose A. Fuste (arg) |
|
Wednesday, April 29, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/29 3:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Rosa Milagros Cabrera ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-4377301.), filed by RNPM, LLC. Service due by 8/31/2015,(Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Mortgage Note, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Mortgage Deed #81, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Allonge, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Modification deed #152, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Title Search, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 Category Sheet, | ||
Att: 8 Summons |