California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sandra R Klein
Case #: 2:11-bk-52832
Case Filed:Oct 13, 2011
Dismissed:Apr 27, 2012
Terminated:May 22, 2012

Debtor
K Land Associates, LLC
1900 Avenue of the Stars Ste 2860
Los Angeles, CA 90067-4513
Represented By
Glenn Ward Calsada
Law Offices Of Glenn W Calsada
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
725 S Figueroa St., 26th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Represented By
Dare Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/20/2013 9:23 PM PST
Thursday, October 13, 2011
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(2:11-bk-52832) [misc,volp11] (1039.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22929100. Fee amount 1039.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Receipt of Certification Fee - $9.00 by 09. Receipt Number 10046811. (admin)
Related: [-]
Receipt of Photocopies Fee - $19.00 by 09. Receipt Number 10046811. (admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 37 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1039 Filed by K Land Associates, LLC Schedule B due 10/27/2011. Schedule C due 10/27/2011. Schedule D due 10/27/2011. Schedule E due 10/27/2011. Schedule F due 10/27/2011. Schedule G due 10/27/2011. Schedule H due 10/27/2011. Schedule I due 10/27/2011. Schedule J due 10/27/2011. Statement of Financial Affairs due 10/27/2011. List of Equity Security Holders due 10/27/2011. Summary of schedules due 10/27/2011. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor due 10/27/2011. Statistical Summary due 10/27/2011. Incomplete Filings due by 10/27/2011. (Calsada, Glenn) Warning: Item subsequently amended by docket entry no. 2. Deadlines terminated re: Statistical Summary; Schedules C, I and J; these documents are not required on a business filing. Modified on 10/17/2011 (Ventura, Olivia).
Related: [-]