J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Mendoza et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Morrison C England, Jr |
Referred: | Sandra M Snyder |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-00660 |
Nature of Suit | 490 Other Statutes - Cable/Sat TV |
Cause | 47:553 Unauthorized Reception of Cable Service |
Case Filed: | Apr 29, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jan 27, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 26, 2015 6:36 AM PDT |
Defendant
Hilda Mendoza
|
|
Defendant
Jose A. Mendoza
|
|
Defendant
Maria Socorro Prado
|
|
Defendant
Roberto Prado
|
|
Plaintiff
J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 04, 2022 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Satisfaction of Judgment
Wed 05/04 11:41 PM
SATISFACTION of JUDGMENT re26 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations,,, Order on Motion for Default Judgment,,, Findings and Recommendations (Order),, as to ALL PARTIES by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Lustgarten, Al) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Association of Counsel
Wed 05/04 11:37 PM
ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Added attorney Al Lustgarten for J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Lustgarten, Al) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Association of Counsel
Fri 02/21 11:27 AM
ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Added attorney Eric Bensamochan for J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Bensamochan, Eric) |
|
Wednesday, January 27, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
order
Judgment - Default
Wed 01/27 3:32 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Hilda Mendoza, Jose A. Mendoza, Maria Socorro Prado, Roberto Prado signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/27/2016. (Zignago, K.) |
|
26 | 26
order
Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Wed 01/27 3:28 PM
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/26/2016 ORDERING that the22 findings and recommendations are ADOPTED in full. Plaintiff's17 Motion for Default Judgment is GRANTED as to Plaintiff's 47 U.S.C. § 605 and conversion claims. Judgment is entered against Defendants Hilda Mendoza, Jose A. Mendoza, Maria Socorro Prado, and Roberto Prado, individually and doing business as El Agave Night Club as to Plaintiff's 47 U.S.C. § 605 and conversion claims. Damages be awarded in the total amount of $7,500.00, allocated as $3,000.00 in statutory damages and $4,500.00 in enhanced damages. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this action. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.) |
|
Monday, January 11, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 01/11 1:21 PM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Chief District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: Pursuant to the Order of Reassignment (ECF No. 24), the order for a joint status report and the March 28, 2016, scheduling conference are VACATED. A Pretrial Scheduling Order will be forthcoming. (Deutsch, S) |
|
Friday, January 08, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Order Reassigning Retired or Senior Judge
Fri 01/08 8:15 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: Due to the senior status of District Judge *Garland E. Burrell, Jr.*, this action is reassigned to *Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.* for all further proceedings. (Benson, A) |
|
Tuesday, January 05, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
order
Minute Order
Tue 01/05 9:08 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The scheduling conference, currently set for 1/19/16, is rescheduled for 3/28/16 at 9:00 a.m. A joint status report shall be filed fourteen days prior to the hearing. Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 1/5/16. (Furstenau, S) |
|
Thursday, November 19, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Thu 11/19 11:10 AM
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending 1) Plaintiff's motion for default judgment be GRANTED IN PART as to Plaintiff's 47 U.S.C. § 605 and conversion claims; 2) Judgment be entered against Defendants Hilda Mendoza, Jose A. Mendoza, Maria Socorro Prado, and Roberto Prado, individually and doing business as El Agave Night Club, with joint and several liability, as to Plaintiff's 47 U.S.C. § 605 and conversion claims; 3) Plaintiff's 47 U.S.C. § 553 claim be dismissed; and 4) Damages be awarded in the total amount of $7,500.00, allocated as $3,000.00 in statutory damages pursuant to 47 U.S.C. § 605(e)(3)(C)(i)(II), and $4,500.00 in enhanced damages pursuant to 47 U.S.C. § 605(e)(3)(C)(ii). These findings are referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, with objections due within (30) thirty days of service. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 11/16/2015. (Rooney, M) |
|
Tuesday, November 10, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 11/10 3:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The Court has deemed plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, document17 , suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). As such, the hearing on same currently noticed for 11/18/2015 before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder is VACATED and the matter will be taken under submission as of that date. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 11/10/2015. (Rooney, M) |
|
Tuesday, October 20, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 10/20 1:08 PM
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 10/20/2015 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 1/19/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; ORDERING the plaintiff to file a status report fourteen (14) days prior to the Status Conference. (Michel, G.) |
|
Monday, October 19, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Ex Parte Application
Mon 10/19 4:29 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. for an Order Continuing the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference; and Order (Proposed).(Riley, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, October 12, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Status Report
Mon 10/12 12:10 PM
STATUS REPORT by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
Friday, October 09, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 10/09 4:44 PM
MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Hilda Mendoza, Jose A. Mendoza, Maria Socorro Prado, and Roberto Prado by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder.(Riley, Thomas) Modified on 10/13/2015 . |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Thomas P. Riley, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Affiant, | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit Plaintiff's, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 11, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Fri 09/11 12:44 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Hilda Mendoza, Jose A. Mendoza, Maria Socorro Prado, Roberto Prado* (Sant Agata, S) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Request for Entry of Default
Fri 09/11 12:32 PM
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Hilda Mendoza, Jose A. Mendoza, Maria Socorro Prado, Roberto Prado by J & J Sports Productions, Inc..(Riley, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Wednesday, August 19, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 08/19 9:08 AM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. re13 Order. (Riley, Thomas) Modified on 8/20/2015 (Kaminski, H). |
|
Thursday, August 13, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 08/13 11:01 AM
ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/12/15 re12 Ex Parte Application: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference is hereby CONTINUED to 10/26/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. A joint status report shall be filed 14 days prior to the hearing. (Meuleman, A) |
|
Tuesday, August 11, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Ex Parte Application
Tue 08/11 2:19 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. for an Order Continuing the Scheduling Conference.(Riley, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 07, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 08/07 2:18 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Roberto Prado served on 7/24/2015, answer due 8/14/2015. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 08/07 2:14 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Maria Socorro Prado served on 7/24/2015, answer due 8/14/2015. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 08/07 2:11 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Jose A. Mendoza served on 7/24/2015, answer due 8/14/2015. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 08/07 2:09 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Hilda Mendoza served on 7/24/2015, answer due 8/14/2015. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
Monday, June 01, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Civil New Case Documents for GEB
Mon 06/01 7:19 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/31/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. (Donati, J) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 VDRP | ||
Friday, May 29, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 05/29 11:52 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: (text entry only) This case is assigned to District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. The New Case Number is: 1:15-cv-00660-GEB-SMS. (Gonzalez, R) |
|
5 | 5
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 05/29 8:40 AM
MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) As a decline to magistrate jurisdiction has been filed, document4 , the Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to randomly assign this matter to a SACRAMENTO District Judge. The Court further VACATES any and all pending deadlines and hearings before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/29/2015. (Rooney, M) |
|
Tuesday, May 26, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Tue 05/26 2:13 PM
DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Riley, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, April 30, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil New Case Documents for Unassigned DJ
Thu 04/30 10:27 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Status Conference re Consent / Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. (Martin-Gill, S) |
|
Att: 1 Order Assigning Action to Sac DJ, | ||
Att: 2 Order re Consent, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons
Thu 04/30 10:26 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Hilda Mendoza, Jose A. Mendoza, Maria Socorro Prado, Roberto Prado* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thomas P. Riley* *Law Offices of Thomas P. Riley, P.C.* *First Library Square, 1114 Fremont Avenue* *South Pasadena, CA 91030-3227*. (Martin-Gill, S) |
|
Wednesday, April 29, 2015 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Hilda Mendoza, Jose A. Mendoza, Maria Socorro Prado, Roberto Prado by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-5866947)(Riley, Thomas) | |
Att: 1 Certification as to Interested Parties, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |