Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Paul G Byron
Referred: Gregory J Kelly
Case #: 6:15-cv-00696
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 01, 2015
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 28, 2015 11:28 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Jameis Winston
Represented By
Christopher J. Bayh
Barnes & Thornburg, LLP
contact info
Brian T. Coughlin
Bedell, Dittmar, Devault, Pillans & Coxe, PA
contact info
Wm. David Cornwell
Barnes & Thornburg, LLP
contact info
Oliver David Barksdale
Bedell, Dittmar, Devault, Pillans & Coxe, PA
contact info
Kathleen L. Matsoukas
Barnes & Thornburg, LLP
contact info
Henry M. Coxe, III
Bedell, Dittmar, Devault, Pillans & Coxe, PA
contact info
John F. Meyers
Barnes & Thornburg, LLP
contact info
Patrick P. Coll
Bedell, Dittmar, Devault, Pillans & Coxe, PA
contact info
Counter Defendant
Erica Kinsman
Represented By
David B. King
King, Blackwell, Zehnder & Wermuth, PA
contact info
Taylor Flanagan Ford
King, Blackwell, Zehnder & Wermuth, PA
contact info
Baine Kerr
Hutchinson Black And Cook, LLC
contact info
Thomas A. Zehnder
King, Blackwell, Zehnder & Wermuth, PA
contact info
John Clune
Hutchinson Black And Cook, LLC
contact info
Lauren E. Groth
Hutchinson Black And Cook, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jameis Winston
Represented By
Christopher J. Bayh
Barnes & Thornburg, LLP
contact info
Brian T. Coughlin
Bedell, Dittmar, Devault, Pillans & Coxe, PA
contact info
Wm. David Cornwell
Barnes & Thornburg, LLP
contact info
Oliver David Barksdale
Bedell, Dittmar, Devault, Pillans & Coxe, PA
contact info
Kathleen L. Matsoukas
Barnes & Thornburg, LLP
contact info
Henry M. Coxe, III
Bedell, Dittmar, Devault, Pillans & Coxe, PA
contact info
John F. Meyers
Barnes & Thornburg, LLP
contact info
Patrick P. Coll
Bedell, Dittmar, Devault, Pillans & Coxe, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Erica Kinsman
Represented By
David B. King
King, Blackwell, Zehnder & Wermuth, PA
contact info
Taylor Flanagan Ford
King, Blackwell, Zehnder & Wermuth, PA
contact info
Baine Kerr
Hutchinson Black And Cook, LLC
contact info
Thomas A. Zehnder
King, Blackwell, Zehnder & Wermuth, PA
contact info
John Clune
Hutchinson Black And Cook, LLC
contact info
Lauren E. Groth
Hutchinson Black And Cook, LLC
contact info

Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
84 84 order Order on motion to dismiss Tue 01/17 4:57 PM
ORDER granting 83 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/17/2017. (MMW)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2017
83 83 motion Dismiss Fri 01/13 4:29 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by All Defendants. (Boudet, John)
Related: [-]