Trahan et al v. Eagle U S 2 L L C et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Richard T Haik, Sr |
Referred: | Kathleen Kay |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-01506 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 01, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 05, 2015 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 28, 2015 8:52 AM CDT |
Defendant
Eagle US 2 LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eagle U S 2 L L C
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David L Ardoin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony J Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
All Plaintiffs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hattie Young
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kay Wyatt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Wayne Wyatt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emma Woods
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debra Wiseman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phyllis M Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elaine Marie Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Isabella Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sarah Trahan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tommy Wilkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosa Lee Wilkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert D Wilkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Wilkins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura White
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joyce Whatley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William West
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timmie Ware
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angelia Ward
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Victorian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Candace Victorian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry Don Valyon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theodric Trumps
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, November 10, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Remark (Public)
Thu 11/10 4:36 PM
REMARK: This case was associated with lead case 2:15-cv-273 but it has been remanded. The clerk is to terminate the relationship between this case and the lead case. (jud,Kay, Kathleen) |
|
Wednesday, August 12, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
utility
District Transfer/Remand Record Received
Fri 08/14 10:51 AM
REMAND RECORD RECEIVED by 14th Judicial District Court Calcasieu Parish on 08/07/2015, case number 2014-5041. (crt,Williams, L) |
|
Wednesday, August 05, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Remand (Form Included)
Wed 08/05 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Remand to Clerk of 14th Judicial District Court. (crt,Whidden, C) |
|
Wednesday, July 29, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Order on Motion to Remand
Fri 07/31 9:57 AM
MEMORANDUM RULING granting Motion to Remand; denying Motion for Attorney Fees. See attached PDF for affected cases. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on July 27, 2015. (crt,Dunford, T) |
|
Friday, June 26, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 06/30 5:07 PM
SUR-REPLY MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand in All Applicable Cases by Eagle U S 2 L L C. (crt,Putch, A) |
|
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Tue 06/30 4:43 PM
ORDER regarding the Motions for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand in All Applicable Cases ; IT IS ORDERED Eagle is hereby granted leave to file its Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition in All Applicable Cases . Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 6/24/2015. (crt,Putch, A) |
|
Tuesday, June 23, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Leave to File Document
Tue 06/23 2:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Remand with consent sought but not yet obtained by Eagle U S 2 L L C. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay.(aty,Leitzelar, Luis) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed pleading Sur-Reply Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed order | ||
utility
Motions Transferred
Wed 06/24 8:30 AM
Motions Transferred regarding MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Remand with consent sought but not yet obtained in All Applicable Cases . Motions referred to Richard T Haik, Sr.(crt,Yocum, M) |
||
Wednesday, June 10, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 06/10 2:56 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re7 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by All Plaintiffs.(aty,Schwartzberg, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, June 02, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Leave to File Document Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
Tue 06/02 5:00 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Remand with consent , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply with consent by All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay.(aty,Schwartzberg, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
utility
Motions Transferred
Wed 06/03 10:25 AM
Motions Transferred regarding MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Remand in All Applicable Cases . Motions referred to Richard T Haik, Sr. (crt,Putch, A) |
||
Thursday, May 28, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Sat 05/30 11:30 AM
ORDER granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00671-RTH-KK; granting (14) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00672-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C, in case 2:15-cv-00675-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00676-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C Douglas in case 2:15-cv-00677-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00678-RTH-KK; granting (14) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00679-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00680-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00681-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00682-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00683-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00685-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00687-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00688-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00689-RTH-KK; granting (14) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00690-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00691-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00692-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00693-RTH-KK; granting (14) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00694-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00695-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00696-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00697-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00698-RTH-KK; granting (15) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00700-RTH-KK; granting (12) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00701-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00702-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00703-RTH-KK; granting (14) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C, in case 2:15-cv-00704-RTH-KK; granting (14) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00706-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00707-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00708-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00709-RTH-KK; granting (12) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00710-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00711-RTH-KK; granting (12) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00712-RTH-KK; granting (11) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00713-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C, in case 2:15-cv-00714-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00715-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00716-RTH-KK; granting (12) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00717-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00718-RTH-KK; granting (14) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00719-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00720-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00721-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00722-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00723-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00724-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00725-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00726-RTH-KK; granting (14) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L Cin case 2:15-cv-00727-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00728-RTH-KK; granting (12) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00729-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00730-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00731-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00732-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00733-RTH-KK; granting (14) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00734-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00735-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00736-RTH-KK; granting (14) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00737-RTH-KK; granting (14) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00738-RTH-KK; granting (14) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00739-RTH-KK; granting (14) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00741-RTH-KK; granting (14) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00742-RTH-KK; granting (14) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00743-RTH-KK; entered (14) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00744-RTH-KK; granting (9) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00745-RTH-KK; granting (14) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00746-RTH-KK; granting (14) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00747-RTH-KK; granting (14) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C, in case 2:15-cv-00748-RTH-KK; granting (14) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00749-RTH-KK; granting (14) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00750-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00684-RTH-KK; granting (13) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00705-RTH-KK; granting (14) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-00740-RTH-KK; granting (11) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Douglas J Kurtenbach for Eagle U S 2 L L C in case 2:15-cv-01506-RTH-KK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 05/28/2015. (crt,Williams, L) |
|
Wednesday, May 27, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Wed 05/27 3:13 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re7 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Eagle U S 2 L L C.(aty,Leitzelar, Luis) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix A, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibits 1-34 | ||
Friday, May 22, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 05/22 12:23 PM
MOTION for Douglas J. Kurtenbach to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-2808252) by Eagle U S 2 L L C. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay.(aty,Leitzelar, Luis) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of good standing Douglas J. Kurtenbach, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed order | ||
Friday, May 15, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 05/15 1:17 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eagle U S 2 L L C identifying Corporate Parent Axiall Corp, Corporate Parent Eagle Spinco Inc for Eagle U S 2 L L C. (aty,Leitzelar, Luis) |
|
Wednesday, May 13, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 05/14 1:57 PM
ORDER: Considering the Motions for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Motions to Remand and for Leave to File Excess Pages; IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Eagle US 2 L L C is hereby granted an additional 14 days, or through 5/27/2015, to file its Opposition to plaintiff's pending Motions to Remand in the above captioned matters; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Eagle US 2 L L C is hereby granted leave to file a single Memorandum in Opposition to the Motions to Remand, containing up to 33 pages, exclusive of the table of authorities and table of contents, which would be applicable to all captioned actions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that oral argument on Plaintiffs' Motions to Remand is DENIED. Responses due by 5/27/2015. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 5/13/2015. (crt,Putch, A) |
|
Friday, May 08, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Motion Setting (without oral argument)
Fri 05/08 1:31 PM
NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding7 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motions referred to Richard T Haik, Sr. Motion day set for 6/18/2015 before Judge Richard T Haik Sr. (crt,Dauterive, C) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion File Excess Pages Hearing
Fri 05/08 1:13 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to3 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with consent , First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , MOTION for Hearing re3 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Eagle U S 2 L L C. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay.(aty,Leitzelar, Luis) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 05/08 1:12 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Eagle U S 2 L L C.(aty,Leitzelar, Luis) |
|
utility
Motions Transferred
Mon 05/11 10:06 AM
Motions Transferred regarding5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages MOTION for Hearing re7 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motions referred to Richard T Haik, Sr. (crt,Putch, A) |
||
Thursday, May 07, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Remand Attorney Fees
Fri 05/08 1:18 PM
MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees by All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay.(crt,Dauterive, C) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1442 Depo of Eagle | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Fri 05/08 1:15 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 5/7/2015. (crt,Dauterive, C) |
|
Tuesday, May 05, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
motion
File Excess Pages
Tue 05/05 10:15 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay.(aty,Schwartzberg, Michael) Modified on 5/5/2015 to add filers (Dauterive, C) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order Exceed Page Limit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed pleading Motion to Remand, | ||
Att: 3 Memorandum / Brief In Support of Motion to Remand, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1442 Depo of Eagle, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed order to Remand | ||
utility
Motions Transferred
Tue 05/05 2:48 PM
Motions Transferred regarding3 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Motions referred to Richard T Haik, Sr. (crt,Dauterive, C) |
||
Monday, May 04, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Mon 05/04 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal sent to Luis A Leitzelar, David M Bienvenu, Jr, Phillip E Foco, John A Viator, Lexi Trahan Holinga, Tam Catherine Bourgeois, Benjamin J Guilbeau, Jr, Marcelynn Hartman, F Charles Marionneaux on behalf of Eagle U S 2 L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/18/2015. (crt,Thigpen, M) |
|
Friday, May 01, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 05/01 5:01 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2014-5041 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-2791624) filed by Eagle US 2 LLC.(Attorney Luis A Leitzelar added to party Eagle US 2 LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Leitzelar, Luis) |
|
Att: 1 State court petition Exh. A, | ||
Att: 2 State court notice of filing Exh. B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil cover sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet & Rule 3.1.1 Certificate, | ||
Att: 5 Affidavit & Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 6 Notice to Adverse Parties | ||
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/04 10:33 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by David L Ardoin. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 05/04 11:13 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Richard T Haik, Sr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M) |