Member Case
Lead case is: 3:11-bk-53308

Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gregg W Zive
Case #: 3:11-bk-53309
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2011
Terminated:Jul 16, 2014

Debtor
UVRP, LLC
1180 W Peckham Ln
Reno, NV 89509-5220
Represented By
ALAN R SMITH
contact info
Debtor
RENO QUALITY HOMES, INC.
P.O. BOX 8070
RENO, NV 89507
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - RN - 11
300 BOOTH STREET, STE 3009
RENO, NV 89509


Docket last updated: 02/16/2013 9:12 AM PST
Wednesday, October 26, 2011
1 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1039. Filed by ALAN R SMITH on behalf of UVRP, LLC (SMITH, ALAN)
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement of Social Security Number(s). This document contains sensitive information and cannot be viewed by the public. Filed by ALAN R SMITH on behalf of UVRP, LLC (SMITH, ALAN)
Related: [-]
3 3 Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by ALAN R SMITH on behalf of UVRP, LLC (SMITH, ALAN)
Related: [-]
4 4 Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 11-53309 [misc,volp11pb] (1039.00). Receipt number 11555621, fee amount $1039.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
5 5 Corporate Resolution Filed by ALAN R SMITH on behalf of UVRP, LLC (SMITH, ALAN)
Related: [-]
6 6 Meeting of Creditors 341 Meeting to be held on 11/28/2011 at 03:00 PM at Young Bldg,Rm 3024. Last day to file Proof of Claims 02/26/2012.
Related: [-]