Sunkin v. Hunter Engineering Company
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Kathleen B Burke |
Referred: | Kathleen B Burke |
Case #: | 5:15-cv-00892 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | May 05, 2015 |
Terminated: | Sep 27, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 01, 2015 7:40 AM EST |
Defendant
Hunter Engineering Company
106 S Main Street Ste 1100
Akron, OH 44308 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Sunkin
4209 Sunnyview Dr.
Uniontown, OH 44685 |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 27, 2016 | ||
59 | 59
![]() Judgment Entry re58 . The Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 53) and enters judgment in favor of Hunter Engineering Company. This matter is terminated on the docket of this Court. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 9/27/2016. (D,I) |
|
58 | 58
![]() Memorandum Opinion & Order: Hunter is entitled to judgment as a matter of law on both claims alleged by Sunkin in his Verified Complaint, i.e., misappropriation of trade secrets and interference with business relationships. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Hunters Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc.53 ). Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 9/27/2016.(D,I) |
|
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Tue 09/27 3:58 PM
Copy of59 Judgment,58 Order on Motion for summary judgment, mailed to Christopher Sunkin 4209 Sunnyview Dr. Uniontown, OH 44685 on 9/27/2016. Related document(s)59 ,58 . (D,I) |