California Central District Court
Judge:R Gary Klausner
Referred: Paul L Abrams
Case #: 2:15-cv-03370
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:May 05, 2015
Terminated:Apr 11, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Nov 01, 2015 5:36 AM PST
Defendant
Pacquiao D Emmanuel
Defendant
Top Rank, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey A Barker
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Esteban Rodriguez
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Emmanuel D Pacquiao
Represented By
Jeffrey A Barker
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel M Petrocelli
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Esteban Rodriguez
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Howard B Sirota
Represented By
William B Federman
Federman And Sherwood
contact info
James Robert Noblin
Green And Noblin PC
contact info
Robert S Green
Green And Noblin PC
contact info


1. Class-action lawsuits filed against Pacquiao, Top Rank (badlefthook.com)
Submitted Mon 05/11/2015
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, August 25, 2017
35 35 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Fri 08/25 10:52 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court DISMISSES each and every Complaint in this MDL action for failure to state a claim based on a cognizable injury to a legally protected right or interest. (ah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 23, 2016
34 34 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Tue 02/23 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Howard B Sirota. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Federman, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2016
33 33 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 01/20 10:11 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order re: Briefing Schedule for Motions to Consolidate, Motions to Amend, and Joint Proposal re Motions to Dismiss by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Having read and considered the Joint Motion for Order on Deadlines and Briefing Schedules (DE 63), the Court orders the following briefing schedule for Motions to Consolidate and Motions to Amend: February 22, 2016: Deadline for Plaintiffs to (a) file amended complaint as of right pursuant to Rule 15(a)(1); (b) move or stipulate to consolidate cases; (c) seek leave of Court to amend complaints pursuant to Rule 15(a)(2); and/or (d) voluntarily dismiss complaints. March 7, 2016: Deadline for any oppositions to motions or stipulations to consolidate cases or to seek leave of Court to amend complaints (procedural issues, not Rule 12(b)-type issues challenging the validity of the claims; such objections are reserved for subsequent motions) March 14, 2016: Deadline for any replies in support of motions or stipulations to consolidate cases or to seek leave of Court to amend complaints. March 28, 2016: Hearing on motions or stipulations to consolidate cases or seek leave of Court to amend complaints No later than fourteen (14) days after the date upon which the Court enters an order on a motion or stipulation, Plaintiffs must file the consolidated/amended complaint to which the order refers. The parties shall meet and confer no later than seven (7) days after all motions to consolidate and motions to amend have been ruled on, regarding: (1) Defendants proposal to the Court on the form of the motions, including the filing of master motions(s) to dismiss addressing all or multiple cases and/or separate non-duplicative motion(s) to dismiss on behalf of each of the three Defendant groups; and (2) the page limitations both parties seek with respect to any briefs related to any master motions or separate state motions. The parties shall file a stipulation pertaining to any agreement on the foregoing issues no later than fourteen (14) days after the parties have met and conferred. (bp)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 11, 2015
32 32 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 12/14 8:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Order re: Appointment of Lead and Liaison Counsel (DEs 39 and 41) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Having read and considered Plaintiffs' and Defendants' Motions, the Court appoints Hart Robinovitch of Zimmerman Reed to serve as Interim-Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs. This appointment may be re-evaluated after motions for consolidation and/or class certification have been determined. The Court appoints Daniel Petrocelli of Melvin & Myers LLP to serve as Lead Counsel for Defendants. The Court appoints Paul B. Derby of Derby Curtis LLP to serve as Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs, and Jeffrey Barker of O'Melveny & Myers LLP as Liaison Counsel for Defendants. See Civil Minutes for Further Specifics. (bp)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 09, 2015
30 30 misc Status Report Fri 10/09 8:06 PM
STATUS REPORT /Joint Pre-Status Conference Report filed by Defendants Emmanuel D Pacquiao, Top Rank, Inc..(Barker, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, October 08, 2015
29 29 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 10/08 10:08 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Top Rank, Inc. (Barker, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 10/08 10:02 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendants Emmanuel D Pacquiao, Top Rank, Inc., (Barker, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2015
27 27 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 09/16 4:46 PM
MINUTE (In Chambers) Order re Status Conference and Briefing by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court sets a Status Conference for 11/3/2015 at 10:00 AM. All trial Counsel must be present, as no telephonic appearances are allowed. (2) The Court vacates all pending dates, to be reset at the 11/3/2015 Status Conference. The Court orders the parties to file Pre-Status Conference Briefing with the court no later than 10/9/2015. The briefing shall be restricted to no more than 10 pages in length. (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2015
26 26 order Transferring Case purs GO 14-03 (Related Case)(CV 34) Wed 09/16 9:47 AM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:15-ML-02639 RGK(PLAx). Case transferred from Judge Philip S. Gutierrez to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 15-03370 RGK(PLAx). Signed by Judge R. Gary Klausner (esa)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2015
25 25 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) Fri 07/10 1:22 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Reply (Motion related)23 . The following error(s) was found: The Judge's initials are missing on the e-filed document. Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ab)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2015
24 24 order For Order Thu 07/09 3:07 PM
MINUTES (In Chambers): Order DENYING Plaintiff's motion for Order Respecting Fight Proceeds by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's motion for an order respecting Defendant Emmanuel D. Pacquiao's proceeds pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65. Dkt.10 . The Court finds the matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); L.R. 7-15. After considering the papers submitted by the Parties, the Court DENIES the motion. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Reply (Motion related) Thu 07/09 1:50 PM
REPLY MOTION for Order for Respecting Fight Proceeds 10 filed by Plaintiff Howard B Sirota. (Green, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2015
22 22 respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 06/29 8:29 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Order for Respecting Fight Proceeds 10 filed by Defendants Emmanuel D Pacquiao, Top Rank, Inc.. (Petrocelli, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2015
21 21 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 06/15 4:39 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting20 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William B. Federman on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Robert S. Green as local counsel. (lt)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 12, 2015
20 20 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/12 4:10 PM
APPLICATION for attorney William B. Federman to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15900641 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Howard B Sirota.(Green, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
19 19 order Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106) Fri 06/12 2:22 PM
ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice17 , for the following reasons: Local counsel did not sign the application. See LR 11-1. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (dgon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2015
18 18 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) Tue 06/09 2:17 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney William B. Federman to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15867256 paid.)17 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: No signature on Application. Local counsel did not sign the application. See LR 11-1. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 06/09 9:35 AM
APPLICATION for attorney William B. Federman to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15867256 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Howard B Sirota.(Green, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, June 08, 2015
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 06/08 2:25 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Howard B Sirota. upon Emmanuel D Pacquiao waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/5/2015, answer due 8/4/2015. Waiver of Service signed by Esteban Rodriguez. (Green, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2015
15 15 order Order Fri 06/05 12:42 PM
ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days),12 . (dgon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2015
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 06/03 2:52 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Esteban Rodriguez counsel for Defendants Emmanuel D Pacquiao, Top Rank, Inc.. Adding Esteban Rodriguez as counsel of record for Top Rank, Inc. and Emmanuel Pacquiao for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants Top Rank, Inc. and Emmanuel Pacquiao. (Attorney Esteban Rodriguez added to party Emmanuel D Pacquiao(pty:dft), Attorney Esteban Rodriguez added to party Top Rank, Inc.(pty:dft))(Rodriguez, Esteban)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 06/03 2:49 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffrey A Barker counsel for Defendants Emmanuel D Pacquiao, Top Rank, Inc.. Adding Jeffrey A. Barker as counsel of record for Top Rank, Inc. and Emmanuel Pacquiao for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants Top Rank, Inc. and Emmanuel Pacquiao. (Attorney Jeffrey A Barker added to party Emmanuel D Pacquiao(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey A Barker added to party Top Rank, Inc.(pty:dft))(Barker, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
12 12 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Wed 06/03 2:46 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to After Resolution of Pending Motion Under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by defendants Emmanuel D Pacquiao, Top Rank, Inc..(Petrocelli, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 06/03 2:39 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel M Petrocelli counsel for Defendants Emmanuel D Pacquiao, Top Rank, Inc.. Adding Daniel Petrocelli as counsel of record for Top Rank, Inc. and Emmanuel Pacquiao for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants Top Rank, Inc. and Emmanuel Pacquiao. (Attorney Daniel M Petrocelli added to party Emmanuel D Pacquiao(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel M Petrocelli added to party Top Rank, Inc.(pty:dft))(Petrocelli, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2015
10 10 motion Order Thu 05/21 2:43 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Respecting Fight Proceeds filed by Plaintiff Howard B Sirota. Motion set for hearing on 7/20/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez.(Noblin, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration James Woodruff,
Att: 3 Exhibit A and B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 19, 2015
9 9 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 05/19 9:58 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Howard B Sirota, upon Defendant Top Rank, Inc. served on 5/18/2015, answer due 6/8/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC-Becky DeGeorge, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Green, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2015
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 05/07 8:31 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2015
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 05/06 11:03 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Pacquiao D Emmanuel, Top Rank, Inc. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 05/06 11:01 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 05/06 11:00 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 05, 2015
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 05/05 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Howard B Sirota, (Green, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Tue 05/05 3:37 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by Plaintiff Howard B Sirota. (Green, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 05/05 3:34 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Howard B Sirota. (Green, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 05/05 3:32 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-15661942 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Howard B Sirota. (Attorney Robert S Green added to party Howard B Sirota(pty:pla))(Green, Robert)
Related: [-]