Filene's Basement, LLC
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin J Carey |
Case #: | 1:11-bk-13511 |
Case Filed: | Nov 02, 2011 |
Creditor Meeting: | Dec 06, 2011 |
Claims Deadline: | Mar 01, 2012 |
Terminated: | Dec 16, 2020 |
Plan Confirmed: | Aug 30, 2012 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Filene's Basement, LLC
1 Syms Way
Secaucus, NJ 07094-9400 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 24, 2013 5:13 AM EDT |
Claims Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
www.kccllc.com 2335 Alaska Ave
El Segundo, CA 90245 |
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
The Honorable James M. Peck
|
|
Trustee
Alan Cohen, the Series A Preferred Trustee
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
1. | To Assume or Not to Assume, that Is the Question: What Act Constitutes ?Assumption? Under Section 365(d)(4) of the Bankruptcy Code? (business-finance-restructuring.weil.com) |
Submitted Mon 06/02/2014 | |
Docket last updated: 47 minutes ago |