New York Eastern District Court
Judge:I Leo Glasser
Referred: Roanne L Mann
Case #: 1:15-cv-02545
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Case Filed:May 05, 2015
Terminated:Mar 11, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Nov 01, 2015 8:56 AM EST
Defendant
John Doe 1 through 12
Defendant
New York City Environmental Control Board
Defendant
Gabriel Simon
Represented By
Yuriy Moshes
Law Office Of Yuriy Moshes PC
contact info
Gennady Litvin
Law Office Of Yuriy Moshes, PC
contact info
Defendant
Rena Simon
Represented By
Yuriy Moshes
Law Office Of Yuriy Moshes PC
contact info
Gennady Litvin
Law Office Of Yuriy Moshes, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Summerlin Asset Management, LLC
Represented By
Alyssa L. Kapner
The Margolin & Weinreb Law Group, LLP
contact info
Alan H Weinreb
The Margolin And Weinreb Law Group, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, March 11, 2016
18 18 order Order Dismissing Case Fri 03/11 5:32 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISCONTINUANCE PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a)(1)(A), That the above entitled action be and the same hereby canceled and discontinued withoutprejudice, without costs to either party as against the other. 2. That the Answer with counterclaims filed by Defendants Gabriel Simon and Rena Simon isdeemed withdrawn. 3. That Plaintiff is given leave to reopen this action within 60 days should Defendants default in the settlement agreement executed by the parties. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 3/11/2016. (Layne, Monique)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 03/11 11:27 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Leave for Plaintiff to reopen in 60 days by Summerlin Asset Management, LLC (Weinreb, Alan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2016
16 16 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 01/19 4:34 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann:Settlement Conference held on 1/19/2016. The parties have reached an agreement in principle to settle the case and need to prepare the settlement papers. By March 11, 2016, they shall file a stipulation of discontinuance, with the right to reopen the case in 60 days if defendants default in their payments. (Maynard, Pat)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2015
15 15 misc Status Report Fri 11/20 11:42 AM
STATUS REPORT and proposed briefing schedule jointly filed by Plaintiff and Defendants by Summerlin Asset Management, LLC (Weinreb, Alan)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Fri 11/20 4:17 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re15 Status Report filed by Summerlin Asset Management, LLC. The Court adopts the parties' proposed briefing schedule. A Settlement Conference will be held on 1/19/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 13C South before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 11/20/2015. (Maynard, Pat)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 10, 2015
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/10 12:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gennady Litvin on behalf of Gabriel Simon, Rena Simon (aty to be noticed) (Litvin, Gennady)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 09, 2015
13 13 minutes Initial Conference Hearing Wed 09/09 5:15 PM
Minute Entry for Initial Conference held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 9/9/2015. Fact discovery is to be completed by January 8, 2016. A joint status report is due November 20, 2015. SEE ATTACHED MINUTE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL DEADLINES. (Dollar, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2015
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/08 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa L. Kapner on behalf of Summerlin Asset Management, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Kapner, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 18, 2015
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/18 11:02 AM
Verified Reply ANSWER to Complaint Counterclaim contained in Simon Defendants' Answer by Summerlin Asset Management, LLC. (Weinreb, Alan)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2015
10 10 order Scheduling Order Mon 06/15 3:27 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/9/2015 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 13C South before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 6/15/2015. (Maynard, Pat)
Related: [-]
9 9 9 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 06/15 12:46 PM
Verified ANSWER to1 Complaint by Gabriel Simon, Rena Simon. (Moshes, Yuriy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2015
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 06/10 2:42 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summerlin Asset Management, LLC. John Doe 1 through 12 served on 6/8/2015, answer due 6/29/2015. (Weinreb, Alan)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 06/10 2:42 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summerlin Asset Management, LLC. New York City Environmental Control Board served on 6/1/2015, answer due 6/22/2015. (Weinreb, Alan)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 06/10 2:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summerlin Asset Management, LLC. Gabriel Simon served on 6/1/2015, answer due 6/22/2015. (Weinreb, Alan)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 06/10 2:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summerlin Asset Management, LLC. Rena Simon served on 6/8/2015, answer due 6/29/2015. (Weinreb, Alan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2015
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 05/06 9:38 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 05, 2015
3 3 discov Disclosure of Interested Parties Wed 05/06 9:37 AM
DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Summerlin Asset Management, LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 05/06 9:36 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
1 1 76 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 05/06 9:36 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Summerlin Asset Management, LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Wed 05/06 9:38 AM
FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653087791 (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]