Kansas Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert D Berger
Case #: 2:15-bk-20951
Case Filed:May 07, 2015
Terminated:Oct 08, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
International Bridge Corporation
4626 SE 85th St
Berryton, KS 66409-9608
Represented By
Wesley F. Smith
Stevens & Brand, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee 301 North Main Suite 1150
Wichita, KS 67202
Represented By
Richard A. Wieland
Office Of U. S. Trustee
contact info
Joyce Owen
Office Of Us Trustee
contact info
Bonnie N. Hackler
U.S. Department Of Justice-U. S. Trustee
contact info
Jordan M Sickman
Office Of U.S. Trustee
contact info
Katherine Vance
Office Of U.S. Trustee
contact info


1. IBC Files for Bankruptcy, Owes GovGuam $4.7M (pacificnewscenter.com)
Submitted Mon 05/11/2015
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 6:08 PM CDT
Saturday, October 10, 2020
364 364 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 10/11 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 10/10/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 363 Order (Generic)
Thursday, October 08, 2020
363 363 order Generic Thu 10/08 9:47 AM
Order Closing Estate Signed on 10/8/2020 (ktb)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 10/08 9:53 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (ktb)
Related: [-]