Rhode Island District Court
Judge:William E Smith
Referred: Patricia A Sullivan
Case #: 1:15-cv-00189
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Case Filed:May 07, 2015
Terminated:Jul 15, 2015
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 03, 2015 7:36 AM EST
Defendant
Hartford Site Construction, LLC
112-114 Old Pocasset Road
Johnston, RI 02919
Plaintiff
Brad Bilodeau
Trustee, The IUOE Local 57 Apprenticeship Fund IUOE Local 57 141 Gano Street
Providence, RI 02906
Represented By
Ryan C. Hurley
Kiernan, Plunkett & Redihan
contact info
Plaintiff
Antonio B. Cardi
Trustee, The IUOE Local 57 Pension Fund and Annuity Fund IUOE Local 57 141 Gano Street
Providence, RI 02906
Represented By
Ryan C. Hurley
Kiernan, Plunkett & Redihan
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephen A. Cardi
Funds Treasurer IUOE Local 57 141 Gano Street
Providence, RI 02906
Represented By
Ryan C. Hurley
Kiernan, Plunkett & Redihan
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael D'Ambra
Trustee, The IUOE Local 57 Health and Welfare Fund IUOE Local 57 141 Gano Street
Providence, RI 02906
Represented By
Ryan C. Hurley
Kiernan, Plunkett & Redihan
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael A. Gammino, III
Funds Treasurer; Trustee, The IUOE Local 57 Industry Advancement Fund IUOE Local 57 141 Gano Street
Providence, RI 02906
Represented By
Ryan C. Hurley
Kiernan, Plunkett & Redihan
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephen P. Lynch
Trustee, The IUOE Local 57 Legal Service Fund IUOE Local 57 141 Gano Street
Providence, RI 02906
Represented By
Ryan C. Hurley
Kiernan, Plunkett & Redihan
contact info
Plaintiff
Gregory E. Olson
Trustee, The IUOE Local 57 Health and Welfare Fund, Legal Service Fund IUOE Local 57 141 Gano Street
Providence, RI 02906
Represented By
Ryan C. Hurley
Kiernan, Plunkett & Redihan
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy E. Quillen
Providence, RI 02906
Represented By
Ryan C. Hurley
Kiernan, Plunkett & Redihan
contact info
Plaintiff
Henry Sherlock
Funds Treasurer IUOE Local 57 141 Gano Street
Providence, RI 02906
Represented By
Ryan C. Hurley
Kiernan, Plunkett & Redihan
contact info
Plaintiff
Edwin L. Sullivan, Jr.
Trustee, The IUOE Local 57 Pension Fund IUOE Local 57 141 Gano Street
Providence, RI 02906
Represented By
Ryan C. Hurley
Kiernan, Plunkett & Redihan
contact info
Plaintiff
The IUOE Local 57
IUOE Local 57 141 Gano Street
Providence, RI 02906
Represented By
Ryan C. Hurley
Kiernan, Plunkett & Redihan
contact info
Plaintiff
James J. White
Funds Chairman IUOE Local 57 141 Gano Street
Providence, RI 02906
Represented By
Ryan C. Hurley
Kiernan, Plunkett & Redihan
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, July 15, 2015
6 6 order Judgment - Consent Wed 07/15 3:54 PM
CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of The IUOE Local 57, Antonio B. Cardi, Brad Bilodeau, Edwin L. Sullivan, Jr., Gregory E. Olson, Henry Sherlock, James J. White, Michael D'Ambra, Michael A. Gammino, III, Stephen A. Cardi, Stephen P. Lynch, Timothy E. Quillen against Hartford Site Construction, LLC. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/15/2015. (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2015
5 5 misc Stipulation Fri 07/10 10:20 AM
STIPULATION Judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Hurley, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2015
4 4 misc Affidavit Wed 06/10 10:07 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Brad Bilodeau, Antonio B. Cardi, Stephen A. Cardi, Michael D'Ambra, Michael A. Gammino, III, Stephen P. Lynch, Gregory E. Olson, Timothy E. Quillen, Henry Sherlock, Edwin L. Sullivan, Jr., The IUOE Local 57, James J. White.(Hurley, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit certified receipt returned
Monday, June 08, 2015
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 06/08 8:27 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by The IUOE Local 57. Hartford Site Construction, LLC served on 5/15/2015, answer due 6/5/2015. (Hurley, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2015
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 05/07 4:03 PM
Summons Issued as to Hartford Site Construction, LLC. (Melendez, Filipa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - New Case Thu 05/07 3:13 PM
COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-844176 ), filed by Michael D'Ambra, Brad Bilodeau, Michael A. Gammino, III, Edwin L. Sullivan, Jr., Timothy E. Quillen, The IUOE Local 57, Stephen A. Cardi, Antonio B. Cardi, James J. White, Henry Sherlock, Stephen P. Lynch, Gregory E. Olson.(Hurley, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 05/07 4:02 PM
Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Melendez, Filipa)
Related: [-]