Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin Gross
Case #: 1:15-bk-11018
Case Filed:May 08, 2015
Terminated:Mar 21, 2016

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.


Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Monday, March 21, 2016
court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 03/21 3:00 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (SH)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 06, 2016
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 03/07 1:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 03/06/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8
Friday, March 04, 2016
8 8 order Dismissing Case Fri 03/04 3:00 PM
Order Dismissing Chapter 11 Case Related [+] Tickle due by: 3/18/2016. Signed on 3/4/2016. (SH)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, March 03, 2016
7 7 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Thu 03/03 3:53 PM
Certification of Counsel Concerning Order Dismissing This Chapter 11 Case Filed by Airborne Media Group, Inc.. (Ward, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, May 15, 2015
6 6 misc Affidavit Fri 05/15 3:31 PM
Notice of Order Staying Chapter 11 Case Filed by Shaun Christensen . (SH)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 08, 2015
5 5 notice Service - Notice Fri 05/08 4:46 PM
Notice of Filing of Motion of the Debtor to (i) Dismiss the Chapter 7 Case and Award the Debtor Its Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Damages or (ii) Convert to a Voluntary Chapter 11 Case and Transfer Venue of the Case to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware Filed by Airborne Media Group, Inc.. (Ward, Christopher) Modified on 5/11/2015 (SH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
4 4 court Standing Order/Transcripts Fri 05/08 1:04 PM
The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 5/8/2015 to 5/22/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber Reliable. Telephone number (302) 654-8080. (AJL)
Related: [-]
3 3 crditcrd none Fri 05/08 12:16 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-11018 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 7566012, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
2 2 11 pgs misc Declaration Fri 05/08 12:08 PM
Declaration of Cordell R. Brown in Support of Chapter 11 Petition and Relief Related [+] Filed by Airborne Media Group, Inc.. (Ward, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 22 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 05/08 12:02 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Airborne Media Group, Inc.. (Ward, Christopher)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Fri 05/08 12:28 PM
Judge Kevin Gross added to case (BA)
Related: [-]
misc Add Attorney Fri 05/08 2:24 PM
Attorney Shanti M. Katona and Christopher A. Ward for Airborne Media Group, Inc., Jarrett Vine and Christopher A. Ward for Airborne Media Group, Inc. added to case Filed by Airborne Media Group, Inc.. (Ward, Christopher)
Related: [-]
misc Add Attorney Fri 05/08 2:42 PM
Attorney Linda Casey for United States Trustee added to case Filed by United States Trustee. (Casey, Linda)
Related: [-]