California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 4:15-cv-02077
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Case Filed:May 08, 2015
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 04, 2015 6:10 AM PST
Defendant
Fitbit, Inc.
Represented By
William Lewis Stern
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
James Webb Huston
Morrison & Foerster
contact info
Julie Yongsun Park
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Erin McCalmon Bosman
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
James P Brickman
Represented By
Christopher Land
Law Offices Of John A. Kithas
contact info
Christopher John Morosoff
Law Office Of Christopher J. Morosoff
contact info
Patrick J. Perotti
contact info
Frank A. Bartela
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephanie Mallick
Represented By
Christopher Land
Law Offices Of John A. Kithas
contact info
Christopher John Morosoff
Law Office Of Christopher J. Morosoff
contact info
Patrick J. Perotti
contact info
Frank A. Bartela
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 29, 2015
18 18 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Fri 05/29 4:05 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 05/29 8:29 AM
Stipulation to Extend time to Respond to Complaint filed by Fitbit, Inc.. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 5/29/2015) Modified on 5/29/2015 (vlk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 05/29 8:24 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fitbit, Inc... (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Certificate of Interested Entities Fri 05/29 8:23 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Fitbit, Inc. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Statement Fri 05/29 8:18 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fitbit, Inc.. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 5/29/2015) Modified on 5/29/2015 (vlk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/29 8:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Erin McCalmon Bosman , William L. Stern, James W. Huston, and Julie Y. Park for Defendant Fitbit, Inc. (Bosman, Erin) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 22, 2015
12 12 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 05/22 10:10 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James P Brickman re6 Summons Issued,1 Complaint (Land, Christopher) (Filed on 5/22/2015)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 14, 2015
11 11 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 05/14 11:21 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James P Brickman.. (Land, Christopher) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 12, 2015
10 10 order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/12 3:08 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 8 Patrick J. Perotti's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/12 3:07 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 7 Frank A. Bartela's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/12 1:17 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9514916.) filed by James P Brickman.(Perotti, Patrick) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/12 1:13 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9514894.) filed by James P Brickman.(Bartela, Frank) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing
Monday, May 11, 2015
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 05/11 8:40 AM
Summons Issued as to Fitbit, Inc.. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2015)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 05/11 8:38 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2015. Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2015 01:30 PM. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2015)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 08, 2015
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 05/08 12:20 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities Fri 05/08 10:23 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by James P Brickman (Land, Christopher) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 05/08 10:18 AM
Proposed Summons. (Land, Christopher) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/08 10:17 AM
COMPLAINT against Fitbit, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9506382.). Filed byJames P Brickman.(Land, Christopher) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet