Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Gerald A Mchugh
Case #: 2:15-cv-02601
Nature of Suit371 Torts - Personal Property - Truth in Lending
Cause15:1640 Truth in Lending
Case Filed:May 11, 2015
Terminated:Apr 12, 2016
Last checked: Saturday Nov 07, 2015 10:23 AM EST
Defendant
METRO AUTO SALES, INC.
Represented By
MATTHEW S. WOLF
Matthew S. Wolf, Esquire, LLC
contact info
MARISA J. HERMANOVICH
Matthew S Wolf Esq LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
RODNEY GREGORY
Represented By
ANN MILLER
Law Office Of Ann Miller
contact info
ROBERT P. COCCO
Law Offices Of Robert P. Cocco PC
contact info

GPO Jan 27 2016
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 1/27/16. 1/28/16 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
GPO Jan 27 2016
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART. COUNT I OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, ALLEGING A VIOLATION OF THE TRUTH IN LENDING ACT, IS DISMISSED. COUNT II OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, ALLEGING A VIOLATION OF THE UNFAIR TRADE PRACTICES AND CONSUMER PROTECTION LAW, AND PLAINTIFFS CLASS ALLEGATIONS ARE NOT DISMISSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 1/27/16. 1/28/16 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 21, 2016
31 31 order Order Dismissing Case Fri 04/22 9:43 AM
ORDER THAT ACTION IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO PLAINTIFFS RIGHTS TO REFILE IN STATE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 4/21/16. 4/22/16 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2016
30 30 order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 04/12 1:18 PM
ORDER THAT CASE IS REMANDED TO THE PHILADELPHIA COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS. BY VIRTUE OF THIS ORDER, DEFENDANT'S MOTION REMAND TO STATE COURT (DOC. 21) IS DENIED AS MOOT. THIS CASE SHOULD BE CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 4/11/16. 4/12/16 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, ) Modified on 4/12/2016 (rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2016
29 29 order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 03/29 11:09 AM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED. PLAINTIFF HAS LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE AN AMENDED RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 3/29/16. 3/29/16 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 14, 2016
28 28 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Sun 02/14 2:08 PM
ANSWER to12 Amended Complaint by METRO AUTO SALES, INC..(WOLF, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Sun 02/14 1:31 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re20 MOTION for Reconsideration re18 Memorandum and/or Opinion,19 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), partial, as to TILA Count filed by METRO AUTO SALES, INC.. (WOLF, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 12, 2016
26 26 order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 02/12 3:32 PM
ORDER RE: APPROVING PRAECIPE TO SUPPLEMENT PLAINTIFF'S PARTIAL MOTION TO RECONSIDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 2/12/16. 2/12/16 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 10, 2016
25 25 misc Praecipe/Request Wed 02/10 3:48 PM
praecipe to supplement plaintiff's partial motion to reconsider Order of January 28, 2016 by argument on additional case law by RODNEY GREGORY. (COCCO, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 09, 2016
24 24 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 02/09 11:02 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re23 Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by RODNEY GREGORY.(COCCO, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, February 08, 2016
23 23 motion Remand to State Court Mon 02/08 6:06 PM
Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by METRO AUTO SALES, INC..Brief, Order, Certificate of Service.(HERMANOVICH, MARISA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
22 22 respm Response to Motion Mon 02/08 5:10 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re21 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by RODNEY GREGORY.(COCCO, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, February 05, 2016
21 21 motion Remand to State Court Fri 02/05 2:59 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by METRO AUTO SALES, INC..brief.(WOLF, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
20 20 motion Reconsideration Fri 02/05 1:48 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re18 Memorandum and/or Opinion,19 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), partial, as to TILA Count filed by RODNEY GREGORY.Certificate of Service.(COCCO, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 27, 2016
19 19 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Thu 01/28 9:09 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION IS GRANTED IN PART. COUNT I OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, ALLEGING A VIOLATION OF THE TRUTH IN LENDING ACT, IS DISMISSED. COUNT II OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, ALLEGING A VIOLATION OF THE UNFAIR TRADE PRACTICES AND CONSUMER PROTECTION LAW, AND PLAINTIFFS CLASS ALLEGATIONS ARE NOT DISMISSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 1/27/16. 1/28/16 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
18 18 10 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Thu 01/28 9:04 AM
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 1/27/16. 1/28/16 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2015
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 10/22 4:00 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re13 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM sur-reply filed by RODNEY GREGORY. (COCCO, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2015
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/21 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARISA J. HERMANOVICH on behalf of METRO AUTO SALES, INC. (HERMANOVICH, MARISA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 20, 2015
15 15 respm Response in Support of Motion Tue 10/20 12:24 PM
RESPONSE in Support re13 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by METRO AUTO SALES, INC..(WOLF, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit (12 C.F.R. § 226.18),
Att: 2 Exhibit (Cowit v. CitiMortgage, Inc., No. 2013 WL 940466 (S.D.Ohio Mar.8, 2013)),
Att: 3 Exhibit (DuRocher v. National Collegiate Athletic Assn, 2015 WL 1505675 (S.D. Indiana 2015))
Tuesday, October 13, 2015
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 10/13 10:05 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by RODNEY GREGORY. (COCCO, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 28, 2015
13 13 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 09/28 5:42 PM
Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by METRO AUTO SALES, INC..Brief.(WOLF, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Memorandum,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Monday, September 14, 2015
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 09/14 4:09 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT-CLASS ACTION against METRO AUTO SALES, INC., filed by RODNEY GREGORY, EXHIBITS, JURY TRIAL DEMAND(rf, )
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 09/14 4:07 PM
ORDER THAT THE CLERK FILE FORTHWITH THE PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED AS EX. A TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE. ACCORDINGLY, DEFENDANTS MOTION IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 9/14/15. 9/14/15 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint
Thursday, August 20, 2015
10 10 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 08/20 12:46 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by RODNEY GREGORY.(COCCO, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-proposed 1st Am Compl
Wednesday, August 05, 2015
9 9 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 (COURT ONLY) Wed 08/05 12:30 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by METRO AUTO SALES, INC..(rf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 27, 2015
8 8 order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/27 2:22 PM
ORDER THAT TIME WITHIN WHICH PLAINTIFF MAY RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT IS HEREBY EXTENDED THROUGH AND INCLUDING 8/20/15.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 7/27/15. 7/27/15 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts) Mon 07/27 12:28 PM
STIPULATION re6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM extending time to answer of plaintiff by RODNEY GREGORY. (COCCO, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 15, 2015
6 6 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 07/15 6:41 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by METRO AUTO SALES, INC..Memorandum.(WOLF, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 (Document Containing Arbitration Clause),
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 (Dunn v. B & B Automotive),
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 (Federal Reserve Boards Official Staff Commentary),
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 16, 2015
5 5 order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 06/16 1:18 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT MAY ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO 7/15/15.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 6/16/15. 6/16/15 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2015
4 4 misc Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts) Mon 06/15 4:42 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint extending time to answer of defendant by RODNEY GREGORY. (COCCO, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2015
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/21 12:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by RODNEY GREGORY re: Karen Pagan-Petty served Summons and Complaint upon METRO AUTO SALES, INC. by personal service. METRO AUTO SALES, INC. served on 5/19/2015, answer due 6/9/2015. (COCCO, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 12, 2015
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/12 5:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANN MILLER on behalf of RODNEY GREGORY (MILLER, ANN)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 11, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/11 3:41 PM
COMPLAINT against METRO AUTO SALES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 120821.), filed by RODNEY GREGORY.(rt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
service Summons Issued Mon 05/11 3:42 PM
Summons Issued as to METRO AUTO SALES, INC. One Forwarded To: Counsel on May 11, 2015 (rt)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Mon 05/11 3:42 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by RODNEY GREGORY. (rt)
Related: [-]