Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08028
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 06, 2015
Terminated:Jan 05, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Pocatello Windustrial Co., a Delaware corporation
5108 Rainbow Lane
Chubbuck, ID 83202
Represented By
Jed W Manwaring
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins, Chapter 7 Trustee
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Thursday, January 05, 2017
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Thu 01/05 4:55 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8028 Judgment For N/A - Dismissed by Stipulation, Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8028 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2017
34 34 order Stipulated Order Tue 01/03 4:05 PM
Order Granting Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 1/3/2017. (drh)
Related: [-] 33
Thursday, December 29, 2016
33 33 motion Stipulation Thu 12/29 1:14 PM
Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2016
32 32 order Substitute Party Wed 11/23 11:57 AM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party adding Gary L. Rainsdon, terminating R. Sam Hopkins and Gary L. Rainsdon. Related [+] Signed on 11/23/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 29
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
31 31 misc Statement of No Objection Tue 11/15 9:28 AM
Statement of No Objection - In accordance with LBR 2002.2(d)(3) the moving party hereby certifies that no objection has been filed or received to the motion/application filed as Doc. Number29 . Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 29 Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party
Tuesday, October 25, 2016
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Tue 10/25 10:38 AM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Clerk added an objection deadline of November 10, 2016, based on the notice given [14 days + 3 for mailing. No further action is required. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 29 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon
Monday, October 24, 2016
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/24 2:12 PM
Notice of Appearance by Jason Ronald Naess Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Substitute Party Mon 10/24 2:12 PM
Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2016
28 28 misc Withdrawal Fri 10/21 3:39 PM
Withdrawal of Substitution of Counsel Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 27 Substitution of Attorney
utility Add Attorney Fri 10/21 4:09 PM
Attorney Robert J Maynes for R. Sam Hopkins added to case (drh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2016
27 27 utility Substitution of Attorney Thu 10/20 9:16 AM
Substitution of Attorney. Involvement of Steven L Taggart; Stephen Kent Madsen and Robert J Maynes Terminated Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
26 26 order Order (Generic) Mon 10/26 9:00 AM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Re: Signed on 10/26/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2015
25 25 order Withdrawal of Reference Thu 10/15 5:03 PM
Order Granting in part, Denying in part Motion For Withdrawal Of Referenc Related [+] . The bankruptcy court will preside over all pretrial matters in this case, including discovery and pretrial conferences, and will resolve routine and dispositive motions. Until the bankruptcy court certifies that this case is ready for trial, the parties shall file all motions, pleadings, and other papers in the adversary proceeding in bankruptcy court. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill 10/7/2015. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (drh)
Related: [-] 15
Wednesday, September 09, 2015
24 24 notice Notice Wed 09/09 5:06 PM
The District Court misc file has closed; A civil case has been opened: 4:15-cv-00358-BLW. No PDF Attached Related [+] Filed by Dana R Hoyle, Deputy Clerk. (drh)
Related: [-] 18 Notice 18 Notice of Receipt of Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference. The District Court case number is 4:15-mc-08173 -BLW. No PDF Attached (related documents15 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference) Filed by (RE: related document(s)15 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176 Filed by Defendant Pocatello Windustrial Co.). (drh)
Friday, August 28, 2015
23 23 misc Returned Mail Fri 08/28 8:22 AM
Returned mail received for Pocatello Windustrial Co. 5108 Rainbow Lane Chubbuck, ID 83202 . ***No PDF Attached*** Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 21 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Filing of a Transcript
Wednesday, August 19, 2015
22 22 misc Statement of Compliance Wed 08/19 12:16 PM
Statement of Compliance Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins Related [+]. (Taggart, Steven)
Related: [-] 13 Order (Generic)
Friday, August 07, 2015
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Filing of a Transcript Fri 08/07 10:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Filing of a Transcript Notice Date 08/07/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 06, 2015
20 20 misc Returned Mail Thu 08/06 3:49 PM
Returned mail received for Does 1-10 ***NO PDF ATTACHED*** Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 19 Transcript
Wednesday, August 05, 2015
19 19 court Transcript Wed 08/05 10:51 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 06/23/15 RE: Motion to Stay. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 11/3/2015. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [Court Reporter/Transcriber Gayle Martin-Lutz @ NW Transcripts, LLC, Telephone number 208-989-3455.] Purchasing Party: Robert Maynes, Esq. Related [+] (drh)). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 08/12/2015. Redaction Request Due By 08/26/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 09/8/2015. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/3/2015. (Lutz, Gayle) Modified on 8/5/2015 (drh)
Related: [-] 7 Motion To Stay filed by Defendant Pocatello Windustrial Co.
Monday, August 03, 2015
18 18 notice Notice Mon 08/03 1:53 PM
Notice of Receipt of Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference. The District Court case number is 4:15-mc-08173 -BLW. No PDF Attached Related [+] Filed by. (drh)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference15 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176 Filed by Defendant Pocatello Windustrial Co.
Friday, July 31, 2015
17 17 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 07/31 4:55 PM
Receipt of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference 15-08028 JDP) [motion,mwdref] ( 176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5594539. Fee amount 176.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#15
16 16 misc Support Brief/Memorandum Fri 07/31 4:28 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference Filed by Defendant Pocatello Windustrial Co. Related [+]. (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176
15 15 motion Withdrawal of Reference Fri 07/31 4:28 PM
Motion for Withdrawal of Reference . Fee Amount $176 Filed by Defendant Pocatello Windustrial Co. (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Consent Fri 07/31 4:18 PM
Consent Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2015
13 13 order Order (Generic) Fri 07/24 1:17 PM
Order Re Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders and Motions to Withdraw Reference. See attached Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders [to file Consent use Adversary/Notices/Consent] Signed on 7/24/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2015
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 07/09 9:26 AM
Amended Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Pocatello Windustrial Co. (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2015
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/08 4:35 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Pocatello Windustrial Co. (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2015
10 10 court Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other) Tue 06/23 3:47 PM
Hearing Held Appearances: Robert Maynes for Plaintiff; Jed Manwaring for Defendant Report of Proceedings: Comments by counsel with questions by the Court. After a brief recess, there is a tentative agreement between the parties for submission of an order granting stay, subject to certain conditions. Counsel to submit an appropriate order. [ESR: DRH] Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 7 Motion To Stay filed by Defendant Pocatello Windustrial Co.
Monday, June 15, 2015
9 9 answer Objection Mon 06/15 7:18 PM
Objection to Related [+] Defendant's Motion to Stay Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins (Madsen, Stephen)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, June 04, 2015
8 8 Notice of Hearing Filed by Defendant Pocatello Windustrial Co. Related [+]. Miscellaneous hearing to be held on 6/23/2015 at 09:00 AM Pocatello - US Courthouse, Bankruptcy/Magistrate Courtroom for7 , (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-] 7 Motion To Stay Filed by Defendant Pocatello Windustrial Co. filed by Defendant Pocatello Windustrial Co.
7 7 Motion To Stay Filed by Defendant Pocatello Windustrial Co. (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2015
6 6 Amended Notice of Appearance by Jed W Manwaring Filed by Defendant Pocatello Windustrial Co. Related [+]. (Manwaring, Jed)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Appearance by Jed W Manwaring Filed by Defendant Pocatello Windustrial Co..
5 5 DISREGARD; SEE NO.6 . Notice of Appearance by Jed W Manwaring Filed by Defendant Pocatello Windustrial Co.. (Manwaring, Jed) Modified on 5/28/2015 (drh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 12, 2015
4 4 Summons Service Executed on Pocatello Windustrial Co. 5/12/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 11, 2015
3 3 Receipt of Complaint 15-08028 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5485603. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Thursday, May 07, 2015
2 2 Summons Issued on John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 5/7/2015, Answer Due 6/8/2015; Pocatello Windustrial Co. Date Issued 5/7/2015, Answer Due 6/8/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2015
1 1 Adversary case 15-08028 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against Pocatello Windustrial Co., John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons