Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08035
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 08, 2015
Terminated:Feb 06, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Compressor, Pump & Service, Inc., a Utah corporation
3333 W. 2400 S.
Salt Lake City, UT 84119
Represented By
Rick L Knuth
contact info
Paul R. Smith
Jones Waldo Holbrook & Mcdonough PC
contact info
Brady Lee Rasmussen
Jones Waldo
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins, Chapter 7 Trustee
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Monday, February 06, 2017
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Mon 02/06 10:31 AM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8035 Judgment For N/A - Case Settled., Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8035 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2017
26 26 order Stipulated Order Fri 02/03 4:14 PM
Order Granting Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 2/3/2017. (drh)
Related: [-] 25
25 25 motion Stipulation Fri 02/03 11:10 AM
Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2016
24 24 order Substitute Party Wed 11/23 11:53 AM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party adding Gary L. Rainsdon, terminating R. Sam Hopkins. Related [+] Signed on 11/23/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 21
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
23 23 misc Statement of No Objection Tue 11/15 9:32 AM
Statement of No Objection - In accordance with LBR 2002.2(d)(3) the moving party hereby certifies that no objection has been filed or received to the motion/application filed as Doc. Number21 . Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 21 Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party
Tuesday, October 25, 2016
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Tue 10/25 10:44 AM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Clerk added an objection deadline of November 10, 2016, based on the notice given [14 days + 3 for mailing. No further action is required. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 21 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon
Monday, October 24, 2016
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/24 2:43 PM
Notice of Appearance by Jason Ronald Naess Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Substitute Party Mon 10/24 2:42 PM
Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2016
20 20 misc Withdrawal Fri 10/21 3:42 PM
Withdrawal of Substitution of Counsel Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 19 Substitution of Attorney
utility Add Attorney Fri 10/21 4:18 PM
Attorney Robert J Maynes for R. Sam Hopkins added to case (drh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2016
19 19 utility Substitution of Attorney Thu 10/20 9:27 AM
Substitution of Attorney. Involvement of Steven L Taggart; Stephen Kent Madsen and Robert J Maynes Terminated Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
18 18 order Order (Generic) Mon 10/26 9:04 AM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Re: Signed on 10/26/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2015
17 17 misc Consent Fri 07/31 4:22 PM
Consent Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2015
16 16 order Order (Generic) Fri 07/24 1:30 PM
Order Re Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders and Motions to Withdraw Reference. See attached Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders [to file Consent use Adversary/Notices/Consent] Signed on 7/24/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 18, 2015
TRANSFER Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee TO 15-8034 - $350.00 by TW. Receipt Number 454769. (admin) Modified on 6/23/2015 (Duboise, Jennifer).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2015
15 15 Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Compressor, Pump & Service, Inc. (Smith, Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2015
Corrective Action: The attorney login used does not match the attorney signature on the attachment. Please refile the document using the correct attorney login that corresponds to the signature contained on the document filed. For additional information, please refer to sections 2(F) and 13 of the CM/ECF Procedure Guide as well as Local Bankruptcy Rule 5003.1(j) available at www.id.uscourts.gov. Related [+] Corrective Action due by 6/15/2015. (drh)
Related: [-] 14 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Compressor, Pump & Service, Inc.
Friday, June 05, 2015
14 14 DISREGARD; SEE NO.15 . Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Compressor, Pump & Service, Inc. (Rasmussen, Brady) Modified on 6/11/2015 (drh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 04, 2015
13 13 Court's Certificate of Service re 11 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application, 12 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application A notice of entry of the related document has been served on Registered Participants as reflected by the Notice of Electronic Filing. A Notice of Entry has also been served by First Class Mail Addressed to: Rick L. Knuth/Paul R. Smith, 170 South Main Street, Suite 1500, Salt Lake City, Utah 84101 Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application filed by Defendant Compressor, Pump & Service, Inc., 12 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application filed by Defendant Compressor, Pump & Service, Inc.
12 12 Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Application for Applicant Paul R. Smith by Judge Jim D. Pappas U.S. Bankruptcy Judge This is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. Pursuant to LBR 9010.1(d)(2)(A), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. This Order has been served on Debtor at the address of record. Related [+] Signed on 6/4/2015. (drh)
Related: [-] 9
11 11 Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Application for Applicant Rick L. Knuth by Judge Jim D. Pappas U.S. Bankruptcy Judge This is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. Pursuant to LBR 9010.1(d)(2)(A), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. This Order has been served on Debtor at the address of record. Related [+] Signed on 6/4/2015. (drh)
Related: [-] 7
Wednesday, June 03, 2015
10 10 Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 15-08035 JDP) [motion,mprohac] ( 225.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5518614. Fee amount 225.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#9
9 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Paul R. Smith Filed by Defendant Compressor, Pump & Service, Inc. (Rasmussen, Brady) Modified on 6/4/2015 (drh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Order Granting Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
8 8 Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 15-08035 JDP) [motion,mprohac] ( 225.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5518600. Fee amount 225.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#7
7 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Rick L. Knuth Filed by Defendant Compressor, Pump & Service, Inc. (Rasmussen, Brady) Modified on 6/4/2015 (drh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Order Granting Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tuesday, May 12, 2015
6 6 Summons Service Executed on Compressor, Pump & Service, Inc. 5/12/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
5 5 Supplement to (Adversary Cover Sheet to Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins Related [+]. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, May 11, 2015
4 4 DISREGARD; PLEASE SEE5 . Supplement to (Adversary Cover Sheet to Complaint ) Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins Related [+]. (Maynes, Robert) Modified on 5/12/2015 (Hoyle, Dana)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
3 3 Summons Issued on Compressor, Pump & Service, Inc. Date Issued 5/11/2015, Answer Due 6/10/2015; John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 5/11/2015, Answer Due 6/10/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
2 2 Receipt of Complaint 15-08035 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5485603. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Corrective Action: The Adversary Cover Sheet is blank on page 2. Counsel to please complete the form and refile. It appears the Cover Sheet was not saved as a pdf. Related [+] Corrective Action due by 5/18/2015. (nl)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins
Friday, May 08, 2015
1 1 Adversary case 15-08035 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against Compressor, Pump & Service, Inc., John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons