Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:14-bk-16707

Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mike K Nakagawa
Case #: 2:15-ap-01056
Nature of Suit64 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(15), divorce or separation obligation (other than domestic support)
61 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(5), domestic support
Case Filed:May 06, 2015
Terminated:Sep 23, 2015
Last checked: never
Counter-Claimant
DAVID A. ROSENBERG, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE
5030 PARADISE RD, STE 215
LAS VEGAS, NV 89119
Represented By
HOWARD C. KIM
Howard Kim & Associates
contact info
Defendant
MARY COLLEEN O'CALLAGHAN-MIELE
251 S. GREEN VALLEY PKWY BLD 43 #4321
HENDERSON, NV 89012
Represented By
MARJORIE A. GUYMON
Goldsmith & Guymon, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
DAVID A. ROSENBERG, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE
5030 PARADISE RD, STE 215
LAS VEGAS, NV 89119
Represented By
HOWARD C. KIM
Howard Kim & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
MATTHEW MIELE
11 OLD MARSH COURT
HENDERSON, NV 89052
Represented By
MATTHEW MIELE
Pro Se
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, April 06, 2016
46 46 notice Notice (Adv) Wed 04/06 1:50 PM
Notice of Satisfaction and Release of Lien for Attorney's Fees and Costs Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP (AXELROD, BRETT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2015
45 45 court Close Adversary Case Wed 09/23 12:06 PM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (arv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 09, 2015
44 44 adv_misc Certificate of Service Wed 09/09 2:40 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by MARK M. WEISENMILLER on behalf of MATTHEW MIELE Related [+] (WEISENMILLER, MARK)
Related: [-] 38 Stipulation filed by Counter-Defendant MATTHEW MIELE, Plaintiff MATTHEW MIELE,41 Notice filed by Counter-Defendant MATTHEW MIELE, Plaintiff MATTHEW MIELE.
Tuesday, September 08, 2015
43 43 court Minute Entry - Hearing Vacated Per Order Entered on Docket (ADV) Tue 09/08 3:53 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 9/16/2015 9:30 AM. Vacated Per Order Entered on Docket. Docket Number 39 Related [+] (pal )
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by MATTHEW MIELE
42 42 court Minute Entry - Hearing Vacated Per Order Entered on Docket (ADV) Tue 09/08 3:53 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 9/16/2015 9:30 AM. Vacated Per Order Entered on Docket. Docket Number 39 Related [+] (pal )
Related: [-] 33 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by MARY COLLEEN O'CALLAGHAN-MIELE
41 41 notice Notice (Adv) Tue 09/08 3:30 PM
Notice Order Approving the Stipulation to Dismiss Complaint Filed by MARK M. WEISENMILLER on behalf of MATTHEW MIELE Related [+](WEISENMILLER, MARK)
Related: [-] 39 Stipulated/Agreed Order, Order of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding.
39 39 orderad Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Tue 09/08 3:00 PM
Stipulated/Agreed Order , Order of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 38 Stipulation filed by Counter-Defendant MATTHEW MIELE, Plaintiff MATTHEW MIELE.
Thursday, September 03, 2015
38 38 adv_misc Stipulation Thu 09/03 4:12 PM
Stipulation By MATTHEW MIELE and Between Debtor and Trustee TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF TO DETERMINE SEPARATE PROPERTY IS NOT PROPERTY OF THE BANKRUPTCY ESTATE, PARTITION OF EXEMPT COMMUNITY PROPERTY, AND NON-DISCHARGEABILITY Filed by MARK M. WEISENMILLER on behalf of MATTHEW MIELE (WEISENMILLER, MARK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 20, 2015
37 37 court Minute Entry Continued (ADV) Fri 08/21 12:39 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 8/20/2015 10:00 AM. Continued. Related [+] Scheduling Conference scheduled for 09/16/2015 at 09:30 AM. (brr )
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by MATTHEW MIELE
Tuesday, August 11, 2015
36 36 adv_misc Certificate of Service Tue 08/11 3:39 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by MARJORIE A. GUYMON on behalf of MARY COLLEEN O'CALLAGHAN-MIELE Related [+] (GUYMON, MARJORIE)
Related: [-] 33 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant MARY COLLEEN O'CALLAGHAN-MIELE,34 Notice of Hearing filed by Defendant MARY COLLEEN O'CALLAGHAN-MIELE.
35 35 court Hearing Sched/Resched (BK) Tue 08/11 10:41 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 9/16/2015 at 09:30 AM at BTB LV-Courtroom 4, Foley Federal Bldg. Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 33 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant MARY COLLEEN O'CALLAGHAN-MIELE
Monday, August 10, 2015
34 34 notice Hearing (Adv) Mon 08/10 3:01 PM
Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: 09/16/2015 Hearing Time: 9:30 A.M. Filed by MARJORIE A. GUYMON on behalf of MARY COLLEEN O'CALLAGHAN-MIELE Related [+](GUYMON, MARJORIE)
Related: [-] 33 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant MARY COLLEEN O'CALLAGHAN-MIELE.
33 33 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 08/10 2:56 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with DECLARATION OF MARY COLLEEN O'CALLAGHAN-MIELE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Filed by MARJORIE A. GUYMON on behalf of MARY COLLEEN O'CALLAGHAN-MIELE (GUYMON, MARJORIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 DECLARATION
Att: 2 DECLARATION Part 2
Tuesday, July 07, 2015
32 32 misc Certificate of Service Tue 07/07 2:43 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by HOWARD C. KIM on behalf of DAVID A. ROSENBERG Related [+] (KIM, HOWARD)
Related: [-] 31 Answer to Complaint filed by Counter-Claimant DAVID A. ROSENBERG, Defendant DAVID A. ROSENBERG, Counterclaim
Monday, July 06, 2015
31 31 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Mon 07/06 2:02 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+], Counterclaim by DAVID A. ROSENBERG against MATTHEW MIELE Filed by HOWARD C. KIM on behalf of DAVID A. ROSENBERG (KIM, HOWARD)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, June 25, 2015
30 30 adv_misc Certificate of Service Thu 06/25 11:26 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP Related [+] (AXELROD, BRETT)
Related: [-] 29 Notice of Claim of Attorney's Lien filed by Other Prof. FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP.
29 29 notice Claim of Attorney's Lien Thu 06/25 11:10 AM
Notice of Claim of Attorney's Lien and Costs Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP (AXELROD, BRETT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2015
28 28 adv_misc Certificate of Service Tue 06/23 2:36 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of MATTHEW MIELE Related [+] (AXELROD, BRETT)
Related: [-] 27 Notice filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW MIELE.
Monday, June 22, 2015
27 27 notice Notice (Adv) Mon 06/22 4:21 PM
Notice of Entry of Order Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of MATTHEW MIELE Related [+](AXELROD, BRETT)
Related: [-] 26 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record.
26 26 order Withdraw As Attorney of Record Mon 06/22 11:52 AM
Order Granting Motion To Withdraw As Attorney of Record Related [+] BRETT A. AXELROD terminated from the case. (mag)
Related: [-] 13
25 25 orderad Stipulated/Agreed Order Mon 06/22 11:51 AM
Order Approving Debtors Extended Deadline To File Responsive Pleading To Adversary Complaint Related [+] (mag)
Related: [-] 23 Stipulation filed by Defendant MARY COLLEEN O'CALLAGHAN-MIELE.
Thursday, June 18, 2015
24 24 adv_misc Declaration Thu 06/18 4:41 PM
Declaration Of: Brett A. Axelrod Regarding Matthew A. Miele Jr.'s Last Known Address Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of MATTHEW MIELE (AXELROD, BRETT)
Related: [-]
23 23 adv_misc Stipulation Thu 06/18 9:06 AM
Stipulation By MARY COLLEEN O'CALLAGHAN-MIELE and Between Creditor With Proposed Order Filed by MARJORIE A. GUYMON on behalf of MARY COLLEEN O'CALLAGHAN-MIELE Related [+] (GUYMON, MARJORIE)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW MIELE.
Wednesday, June 10, 2015
22 22 Certificate of Service Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of MATTHEW MIELE Related [+] (AXELROD, BRETT)
Related: [-] 21 Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW MIELE.
Tuesday, June 09, 2015
21 21 Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: June 17, 2015 Hearing Time: 2:30 pm Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of MATTHEW MIELE Related [+] (AXELROD, BRETT). Modified on 6/10/2015 to relate to #13 in place of #20 (Youngblood, CL).
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW MIELE.
Monday, June 08, 2015
20 20 Order Granting Motion for Order Shortening Time Related [+]. Hearing scheduled 6/17/2015 at 02:30 PM at MKN-Courtroom 2, Foley Federal Bldg. (arv)
Related: [-] 18 13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW MIELE.
Friday, June 05, 2015
19 19 Attorney Information Sheet Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of MATTHEW MIELE Related [+] (AXELROD, BRETT)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Order Shortening Time filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW MIELE.
18 18 Ex Parte Motion for Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Matthew A. Miele Jr. Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of MATTHEW MIELE Related [+] (AXELROD, BRETT). Modified on 6/8/2015 to relate to #13 (Youngblood, CL).
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW MIELE.
17 17 Certificate of Service Filed by HOWARD C. KIM on behalf of DAVID A. ROSENBERG Related [+] (KIM, HOWARD)
Related: [-] 16 Notice of Entry of Order filed by Defendant DAVID A. ROSENBERG
16 16 Notice of Entry of Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time for Trustee to File a Responsive Pleading to the Adversary Complaint Filed by HOWARD C. KIM on behalf of DAVID A. ROSENBERG (KIM, HOWARD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 04, 2015
15 15 Certificate of Service Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of MATTHEW MIELE Related [+] (AXELROD, BRETT)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW MIELE.
14 14 Declaration Of: Brett Axelrod in support of Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Matthew A. Miele, Jr. Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of MATTHEW MIELE Related [+] (AXELROD, BRETT)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW MIELE.
13 13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Matthew A. Miele, Jr. Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of MATTHEW MIELE (AXELROD, BRETT)
Related: [-]
12 12 Stipulated/Agreed Order Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulation filed by Defendant DAVID A. ROSENBERG.
Tuesday, June 02, 2015
11 11 Stipulation By DAVID A. ROSENBERG and Between Matthew Miele Filed by HOWARD C. KIM on behalf of DAVID A. ROSENBERG Related [+] (KIM, HOWARD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW MIELE.
Friday, May 08, 2015
10 10 Summons Issued on MARY COLLEEN O'CALLAGHAN-MIELE , DAVID A. ROSENBERG (arv)
Related: [-]
9 9 Scheduling Conference scheduled for 8/20/2015 at 10:00 AM at MKN-Courtroom 2, Foley Federal Bldg. Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW MIELE.
Thursday, May 07, 2015
8 8 Errata to the Declaration of Tara H. Popova Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of MATTHEW A. MIELE JR Related [+] (AXELROD, BRETT)
Related: [-] 5 Declaration filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW A. MIELE.
Wednesday, May 06, 2015
7 7 Request to Issue Summons On: DAVID A. ROSENBERG. Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of MATTHEW A. MIELE JR. (AXELROD, BRETT)
Related: [-]
6 6 Request to Issue Summons On: MARY COLLEEN O'CALLAGHAN-MIELE. Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of MATTHEW A. MIELE JR. (AXELROD, BRETT)
Related: [-]
5 5 Declaration Of: Tara H. Popova Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of MATTHEW A. MIELE JR Related [+] (AXELROD, BRETT)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW A. MIELE.
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
Att: 8 Exhibit 8
Att: 9 Exhibit 9
Att: 10 Exhibit 10
4 4 Declaration Of: Andrew Zimmerman Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of MATTHEW A. MIELE JR Related [+] (AXELROD, BRETT)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW A. MIELE.
3 3 Declaration Of: Matthew A. Miele, Jr. Filed by BRETT A. AXELROD on behalf of MATTHEW A. MIELE JR Related [+] (AXELROD, BRETT)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW A. MIELE
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
Att: 8 Exhibit 8
Att: 9 Exhibit 9
Att: 10 Exhibit 10
Att: 11 Exhibit 11
Att: 12 Exhibit 12
2 2 Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint 15-01056 mkn) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 16014105, fee amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 Adversary case 15-01056 Complaint for Declaratory Relief to Determine Separate Property is Not Property of the Bankruptcy Estate, Partition of Exempt Community Property and Non-Dischargeability of Debt Filed by MATTHEW A. MIELE JR. vs. MARY COLLEEN O'CALLAGHAN-MIELE, DAVID A. ROSENBERG Fee Amount $350. (61 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(5), domestic support)(64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)(AXELROD, BRETT) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
Related: [-]