Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:David J Hale
Referred: Colin H Lindsay
Case #: 3:15-cv-00354
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:May 12, 2015
Terminated:Jun 01, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Nov 08, 2015 9:35 AM EST
Defendant
Marathon Petroleum Company LP
Represented By
Sheryl G. Snyder
Frost Brown Todd Llc - Louisville
contact info
Matthew C. Blickensderfer
Frost Brown Todd Llc - Cincinnati
contact info
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By
Robert R. Sparks
Strauss Troy Co., Lpa
contact info
Helen M. Maher
Boies Schiller & Flexner Llp - Armonk
contact info
Elizabeth U. Natter
Kentucky Attorney General
contact info
Robyn R. Bender
Kentucky Attorney General
contact info
Michael M. Merley
Boies Schiller & Flexner Llp - New York
contact info
Theresa L. Nelson
Strauss Troy Co., Lpa
contact info
Sean J. Riley
Kentucky Attorney General
contact info
Michael I. Endler
Boies Schiller & Flexner Llp - Albany
contact info
Laura S. Crittenden
Kentucky Attorney General
contact info
Ronald R. Parry
Strauss Troy Co., Lpa
contact info
Nicholas A. Gravante, Jr.
Boies Schiller & Flexner Llp - New York
contact info

GPO Jun 08 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 6/8/2016 - Defendant Marathon Petroleum Company LP's Motion to Dismiss (D.N. 28) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is granted as to Plaintiffs unjust enrichment claim (D.N. 18, PageID # 169 (COUNT 7)). The motion is denied as to all other claims. cc: Counsel(DAK)
GPO Dec 01 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 12/1/2016 - Marathon's motion to amend order to permit interlocutory appeal (D.N. 48) is DENIED. cc: Counsel(DAK)
GPO May 24 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 5/23/2017 - The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part the parties' joint motion for a protective order (DN 62). cc: Counsel(DAK)
GPO Oct 24 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 10/24/2017 - The Commonwealth's Motion to Amend its First Amended Complaint (DN 71) is GRANTED. The Commonwealth shall file an amended complaint identical to its proposed second amended complaint. cc: Counsel(DAK)
GPO Jun 26 2018
Memorandum Opinion and Order by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 6/25/2018 - 87 Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED; 95 Motion to Stay is DENIED; 100 Motion to Seal Document is GRANTED ; 102 Motion to Seal Document is GRANTED; 106 Motion to Seal Document is GRANTED ; 108 Motion to Seal Document is GRANTED ; 123 Motion to Seal Document is GRANTED ; 129 Motion to Seal Document is GRANTED ; 131 Motion to Seal Document is GRANTED. cc: Counsel(DAK)
GPO Sep 26 2018
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 9/26/2018. Marathon Corp.'s and Speedway's motion to dismiss (D.N. 92) is DENIED. Marathon LP's motion to dismiss (D.N. 93) is DENIED. This case is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for a status conference. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
GPO Mar 01 2019
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 3/1/19: Accordingly, the order will be UNSEALED in 45 days, absent further order by the Court. If any party opposes unsealing the order, it shall file a motion to seal, with citations to applicable law, within 14 days of this Order. Status Report due by 4/15/2019.cc: Counsel (DJT)
GPO Sep 17 2019
Memorandum Opinion and Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 9/17/2019. The Commonwealth's Motion DN 197 is GRANTED. The Commonwealth's Motions DNs 164, 192, 202, 213 are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Marathon's Motions DNs 155, 166, 189, 194, 198, 211, 210, 214, are GRANTED. Parties have 30 DAYS to file additional motions to seal or supplemental redacted versions of Exhibits pursuant to the above Order. DNs 203-25, 203-32, 203-45, 215-2, 215-3, 193-2, 193-10, 193-16, 165-7, 165-8, and 165-9 shall be PROVISIONALLY SEALED for 30 DAYS. The Court directs the Clerk to unseal any of the documents identified in this paragraph if no party files a motion to seal such documents on or before 10/30/2019. Parties shall comply as set forth in Order. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
GPO Jun 01 2020
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 6/1/2020 - Marathon Petroleum Corporation's motion for summary judgment on personal jurisdiction (D.N. 156) is DENIED. Defendants' motion to exclude the testimony of Dr. Sattinger (D.N. 191) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's motion to exclude the testimony of Dr. Shehadeh and Dr. Baye (D.N. 190) is DENIED as moot. Defendants' motion for summary judgment (D.N. 195) is GRANTED as to the Commonwealth's federal antitrust claims (Counts 1, 2, and 3). Plaintiff's remaining state-law claims are DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c)(3). A separate judgment will be entered this date. (KD)

1. UPDATE: Ky. AG Files Lawsuit Against Marathon Petroleum (wsaz.com)
Submitted Wed 05/13/2015
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, June 01, 2020
239 239 order Judgment Mon 06/01 1:54 PM
JUDGMENT - Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, and Speedway LLC with respect to the federal antitrust claims asserted in this matter by Plaintiff the Commonwealth of Kentucky. The plaintiff's federal antitrust claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiff's state law claims, which are DISMISSED without prejudice. Consistent with the foregoing, this matter is CLOSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket. This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment, and there is no just cause for delay. (KD)
Related: [-]
238 238 24 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 06/01 1:49 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 6/1/2020 - Marathon Petroleum Corporation's motion for summary judgment on personal jurisdiction (D.N.156 ) is DENIED. Defendants' motion to exclude the testimony of Dr. Sattinger (D.N.191 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's motion to exclude the testimony of Dr. Shehadeh and Dr. Baye (D.N.190 ) is DENIED as moot. Defendants' motion for summary judgment (D.N.195 ) is GRANTED as to the Commonwealth's federal antitrust claims (Counts 1, 2, and 3). Plaintiff's remaining state-law claims are DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c)(3). A separate judgment will be entered this date. (KD)
Related: [-]