McDonald v. Simpler et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | George Jarrod Hazel |
Case #: | 8:15-cv-01343 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | May 11, 2015 |
Terminated: | Oct 02, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 07, 2015 8:55 AM EST |
Defendant
Andrew Pretzello
|
|
Defendant
Gary Simpler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Nuclear Regulatory Commission
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karl J. McDonald
104 Bertha Circle
Indian Head, MD 20640 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Scott Williamson
Terminated: 06/02/2015
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, October 02, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
![]() ORDER consolidating 15-1343 GJH with Civil Case No. 15-1302 RDB for all purposes; directing clerk to Close McDonald v. Simpler, et aI., No. 15-1343 GJH. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 10/1/2015. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01302-RDB, 8:15-cv-01343-GJH(c/m 10/2/2015 aos, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/2/2015 (aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
utility
Remark - Member Case
Fri 10/02 9:44 AM
THIS IS A CONSOLIDATED CASE. PLEASE DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE OR SPREAD TEXT IN THIS CASE. ALL SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS ARE TO BE ELECTRONICALLY FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE (RDB 15-cv-1302). (aos, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Friday, September 25, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
![]() NOTICE by Gary Simpler of Withdrawal of Representative (Smith, William) |
|
Tuesday, September 22, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
![]() MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Gary Simpler Responses due by 10/9/2015(Huhta, Susan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
22 | 22
![]() MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Gary Simpler Responses due by 10/9/2015(Huhta, Susan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, September 18, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
![]() NOTICE by Gary Simpler of Consent to Motion to Consolidate (Huhta, Susan) |
|
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Susan E Huhta on behalf of Gary Simpler (Huhta, Susan) |
|
Thursday, September 17, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
![]() MOTION to Stay all Proceedings Pending a Resolution of the Motion to Consolidate by United States Nuclear Regulatory Commission Responses due by 10/5/2015(Phelps, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, September 02, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
![]() MOTION to Consolidate Cases by United States Nuclear Regulatory Commission Responses due by 9/21/2015(Phelps, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, August 24, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Correspondence re: Response Deadline for Gary Simpler. (aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by William Colonel Smith, Jr on behalf of Gary Simpler (aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, August 19, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed United States Nuclear Regulatory Commission (US Attorney and US Attorney General) served on 8/17/2015, answer due 10/16/2015. (kns, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/19/2015 (kns, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, August 18, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Correspondence re: Response Deadline for Defendant Pretzello (Phelps, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, August 06, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed Gary Simpler served on 8/3/2015, answer due 8/24/2015. (aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, August 05, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed United States Nuclear Regulatory Commission served on 7/31/2015, answer due 9/29/2015. (aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, July 31, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed Andrew Pretzello served on 7/28/2015, answer due 8/18/2015. (aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, July 21, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Summons Issued 60 days as to Andrew Pretzello, Gary Simpler, United States Nuclear Regulatory Commission, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (kns, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, July 09, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing clerk to mail three US Marshal forms to plaintiff; granting plaintiff twenty-one days to complete and return the US Marshal forms to the clerk for issuance. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 7/9/2015. (c/m 7/10/2015 aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, June 26, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
![]() RESPONSE re5 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff 28 days to SUPPLEMENT the Complaint. filed by Karl J. McDonald.(aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, June 02, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Tue 06/02 9:59 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER approving4 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Scott Williamson. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 6/2/2015. (c/m ch 6/2/15 am2s, Chambers) Modified on 6/2/2015 (jf2s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, May 29, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff 28 days to SUPPLEMENT the Complaint. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 5/29/2015. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 5/29/15) |
|
Friday, May 22, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Scott Williamson by Karl J. McDonald. (jf2s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, May 11, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Karl J. McDonald. (jf2s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Jury Trial Demand by Karl J. McDonald. (jf2s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Andrew Pretzello, Gary Simpler, United States Nuclear Regulatory Commission, Scott Williamson, filed by Karl J. McDonald.(jf2s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |