California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mark D Houle
Case #: 6:15-bk-14946
Case Filed:May 16, 2015
Dismissed:Jun 02, 2016
Terminated:Jun 30, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
HNO Green Fuels, Inc.
42309 Winchester Rd Ste E
Temecula, CA 92590-4859
Represented By
Eve H Karasik
Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Brill L.L.P
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501


Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago
Thursday, June 30, 2016
164 164 court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 06/30 10:11 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing the above referenced case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the case is closed. Related [+] (Cargill, Rita)
Related: [-] 139 Transcript,161 Transcript
Tuesday, June 28, 2016
163 163 court Hearing Held (Motion) Tue 06/28 4:50 PM
Hearing Held re Motion allowing Administrative Claim - Off Calendar - Case dismissed 6/2/16.145 (Cargill, Rita)
Related: [-]