TAKEDA GMBH et al v. STRIDES PHARMA, INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Freda L Wolfson |
Referred: | Douglas E Arpert |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-03378 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 15, 2015 |
Terminated: | Feb 21, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 11, 2015 10:05 AM EST |
Counter Claimant
STRIDES PHARMA GLOBAL PTE LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
STRIDES PHARMA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
TAKEDA GMBH
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
STRIDES PHARMA GLOBAL PTE LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
STRIDES PHARMA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TAKEDA GMBH
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
3
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Wed 02/21 2:36 PM
CONSENT JUDGMENT. All claims, counterclaims, affirmative defenses and demands in this action are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 2/21/2018. (mps) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Letter
Wed 02/07 5:35 PM
Letter from John E. Flaherty to the Hon. Freda L. Wolfson, U.S.D.J.(FLAHERTY, JOHN) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Redacted Document
Fri 09/15 10:15 AM
REDACTION to23 Amended Answer to Complaint,, by STRIDES PHARMA GLOBAL PTE LIMITED, STRIDES PHARMA, INC.. (WANG, HUA) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 09/15 8:49 AM
Set Deadlines as to24 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by ASTRAZENECA AB, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED re (192 in 3:15-cv-03375-FLW-DEA, 192 in 3:15-cv-03375-FLW-DEA, 192 in 3:15-cv-03375-FLW-DEA) Memorandum,, Opinion,, Order. Motion set for 10/16/2017 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps) |
||
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court
Thu 09/14 9:02 PM
APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by ASTRAZENECA AB, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED re (192 in 3:15-cv-03375-FLW-DEA, 192 in 3:15-cv-03375-FLW-DEA, 192 in 3:15-cv-03375-FLW-DEA) Memorandum,, Opinion,, Order,(FLAHERTY, JOHN) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 14 | ||
23 | 23
respoth
Amended Answer to Complaint
Thu 09/14 12:38 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (WANG, HUA) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case
Mon 09/11 2:14 PM
Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney MICHAEL H. IMBACUAN terminated. (IMBACUAN, MICHAEL) |
|
Thursday, June 23, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order
Thu 06/23 11:53 AM
CONSENT ORDER Regarding Substitution of Plaintiffs and Amendment of Case Captions in Consolidated Actions. AstraZeneca AB is added as Plaintiff and Takeda GmbH is terminated. Takeda GmbH will produce certain information. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/23/2016. (mmh) |
|
Monday, November 09, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order
Tue 11/10 12:11 PM
ORDER to Consolidate. Civil action nos. 3:15-cv-3375, 3:15-cv-03376-FLW-DEA, 3:15-cv-03377-FLW-DEA, 3:15-cv-03378-FLW-DEA, 3:15-cv-03379-FLW-DEA, 3:15-cv-03380-FLW-DEA, 3:15-cv-03382-FLW-DEA, 3:15-cv-03383-FLW-DEA, 3:15-cv-03384-FLW-DEA and 3:15-cv-03385-FLW-DEA are consolidated for pretrial and case management purposes only; that all filings of general application to the Related Actions shall be filed in 3:15-cv-3375-FLW-DEA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/9/2015. (mmh) |
|
Thursday, October 15, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order
Thu 10/15 4:07 PM
LETTER ORDER granting the request that the 10/20/2015 status conference be converted to a telephone conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/15/2015. (mmh) |
|
Thursday, September 24, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order
Thu 09/24 11:41 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct an In Person Status Conference on October 20, 2015 at 3:30 P.M.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/24/2015. (ce3) |
|
Wednesday, September 23, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Letter
Wed 09/23 3:02 PM
Letter from John E. Flaherty to the Hon. Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J., requesting a status conference to address scheduling issues as well as consolidation. (FLAHERTY, JOHN) |
|
Thursday, August 13, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Thu 08/13 4:24 PM
Plaintiffs' ANSWER to Counterclaim of Defendants by ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED, TAKEDA GMBH.(FLAHERTY, JOHN) |
|
Tuesday, July 28, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order
Tue 07/28 4:08 PM
LETTER ORDER that all pre-trial proceedings will be handled by Judge Arpert. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/28/2015. (mmh) |
|
Monday, July 27, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Mon 07/27 12:49 PM
Letter from John E. Flaherty to the Hon. Freda L. Wolfson, U.S.D.J., regarding consolidation. (FLAHERTY, JOHN) |
|
Monday, July 20, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Mon 07/20 5:27 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by STRIDES PHARMA GLOBAL PTE LIMITED, STRIDES PHARMA, INC..(IMBACUAN, MICHAEL) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/20 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by HUA HOWARD WANG on behalf of All Defendants (WANG, HUA) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/20 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL H. IMBACUAN on behalf of All Defendants (IMBACUAN, MICHAEL) |
|
Friday, June 05, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 06/05 1:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TAKEDA GMBH, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED. STRIDES PHARMA, INC. waiver sent on 5/21/2015, answer due 7/20/2015. (FLAHERTY, JOHN) |
|
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 06/05 1:06 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TAKEDA GMBH, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED. STRIDES PHARMA GLOBAL PTE LIMITED waiver sent on 5/21/2015, answer due 7/20/2015. (FLAHERTY, JOHN) |
|
Thursday, May 21, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 05/21 4:18 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by STRIDES PHARMA GLOBAL PTE LIMITED, STRIDES PHARMA, INC.. (MILLER, ANDREW) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/21 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW J. MILLER on behalf of All Defendants (MILLER, ANDREW) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/21 3:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by RAVIN R. PATEL on behalf of ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED, TAKEDA GMBH (PATEL, RAVIN) |
|
Friday, May 15, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 05/18 1:24 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to STRIDES PHARMA GLOBAL PTE LIMITED, STRIDES PHARMA, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Karen McGonigle* (km) |
|
4 | 4
misc
AO120 Patent/Trademark Form
Mon 05/18 1:23 PM
AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (km) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 05/18 1:16 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED. (km) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 05/18 1:16 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by TAKEDA GMBH identifying Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited as Corporate Parent.. (km) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 05/18 1:15 PM
COMPLAINT against STRIDES PHARMA GLOBAL PTE LIMITED, STRIDES PHARMA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 6394664), filed by TAKEDA GMBH, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED.(km) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet |