New York Western District Court
Judge:Charles J Siragusa
Referred: Jonathan W Feldman
Case #: 6:15-cv-06320
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:May 21, 2015
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 17, 2015 8:07 AM EST
Defendant
Sutherland Global Services, Inc.
Represented By
Daniel J. Moore
Harris Beach LLP
contact info
Kyle William Sturgess
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DENISE DEANNE
Represented By
Jason T. Brown
Jtb Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KEVIN TARRANT
Represented By
Jason T. Brown
Jtb Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Denise Deanne
Represented By
Jesse L. Young
Sommers Schwartz, PC
contact info
Jason T. Brown
Jtb Law Group LLC
contact info
Kevin J. Stoops
Sommers Schwartz, PC
contact info
Jacob Robert Rusch
Johnson Becker, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sylvester Livingston
Represented By
Jesse L. Young
Sommers Schwartz, PC
contact info
Jason T. Brown
Jtb Law Group LLC
contact info
Kevin J. Stoops
Sommers Schwartz, PC
contact info
Jacob Robert Rusch
Johnson Becker, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin Tarrant
Represented By
Jesse L. Young
Sommers Schwartz, PC
contact info
Jason T. Brown
Jtb Law Group LLC
contact info
Kevin J. Stoops
Sommers Schwartz, PC
contact info
Jacob Robert Rusch
Johnson Becker, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sharon D. Smith
Represented By
Jason T. Brown
Jtb Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Veronica Toles
Represented By
Jason T. Brown
Jtb Law Group LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/13/2019 11:59 PM EST
Friday, November 04, 2016
39 39 order Order Fri 11/04 8:33 AM
-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-FINAL ORDER OF APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 11/4/16. (KAP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2016
38 38 minutes Motion Hearing Thu 11/03 4:00 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Charles J. Siragusa: Fairness Hearing held on 11/3/2016 re36 MOTION for Attorney Fees Final Approval of Class Counsel's Fees and Litigation and Settlement Administration Expenses (Unopposed) filed by Veronica Toles, Alaisha Browder, Sylvester Livingston, Dawnette James, Denise Deanne, Shawn Fitzgerald, Kevin Tarrant, Melissa Neal, Sharon D. Smith, Kenneth Dunmars,35 Joint MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class/Collective Action filed by Veronica Toles, Alaisha Browder, Sylvester Livingston, Dawnette James, Denise Deanne, Shawn Fitzgerald, Kevin Tarrant, Melissa Neal, Kenneth Dunmars, Sharon D. Smith. Court finds that the settlement is fair, reasonable and adequate and will sign proposed Order Approving Class Action Settlement submitted by counsel. (Court Reporter FTR GOLD.) (KJA)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2016
37 37 order Order Fri 10/07 3:05 PM
LETTER ORDER granting joint parties' request for page extension on briefs to not exceed 32 pages. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 10/7/16. (KAP)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2016
36 36 motion Attorney Fees Mon 10/03 10:26 AM
MOTION for Attorney Fees Final Approval of Class Counsel's Fees and Litigation and Settlement Administration Expenses (Unopposed) by Alaisha Browder, Denise Deanne, Kenneth Dunmars, Shawn Fitzgerald, Dawnette James, Sylvester Livingston, Melissa Neal, Sharon D. Smith, Kevin Tarrant, Veronica Toles.(Stoops, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of K Stoops
35 35 motion Settlement Mon 10/03 10:19 AM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class/Collective Action by Alaisha Browder, Denise Deanne, Kenneth Dunmars, Shawn Fitzgerald, Dawnette James, Sylvester Livingston, Melissa Neal, Sharon D. Smith, Kevin Tarrant, Veronica Toles.(Stoops, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Salinas
Friday, August 05, 2016
34 34 order Text Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 08/05 10:45 AM
TEXT ORDER, ( Fairness Hearing set for 11/3/2016 02:00 PM before Hon. Charles J. Siragusa.),. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 8/5/16. (KAP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2016
33 33 order Order on Motion for Settlement Thu 08/04 10:34 AM
ORDER granting31 Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 8/4/16. (KAP)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2016
32 32 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 07/29 2:25 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re31 Joint MOTION for Settlement in Support of Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement; Class Notice; Form of Final Order and Judgment filed by Kevin Tarrant.(Stoops, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order for Preliminary Approval,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Settlement Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Class Counsel
31 31 motion Settlement Fri 07/29 2:22 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement in Support of Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement; Class Notice; Form of Final Order and Judgment by Kevin Tarrant.(Stoops, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2016
utility E-Filing Notification Wrong Event Used Thu 07/21 11:34 AM
E-Filing Notification re30 NOTICE by Kevin Tarrant Plaintiff's Sixth Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action : Incorrect event used to electronically file document. For future reference, use "Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff" event. Court will make additional entry to add plaintiff. (LB)
Related: [-]
misc Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff Thu 07/21 11:37 AM
CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Jesse L. Young, Jacob Robert Rusch, Kevin J. Stoops, Jason T. Brown on behalf of Melissa Neal re30 Notice. (LB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2016
30 30 notice Notice (Other) Wed 07/20 10:58 AM
NOTICE by Kevin Tarrant Plaintiff's Sixth Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action(Young, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent to Join
Monday, July 18, 2016
29 29 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/18 10:29 AM
LETTER ORDER ( Status Report due by 7/29/2016.). Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 7/18/16. (KAP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2016
28 28 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 06/08 1:00 PM
LETTER ORDER granting joint parties' request for extension of time to defendant's deadline to provide identifying information regarding the class members and the corresponding deadlines by which opt-ins may join the lawsuit is extended to 7/15/16. ( Status Report due by 7/15/2016.). Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 6/8/16. (KAP)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2016
27 27 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 05/09 3:50 PM
LETTER ORDER granting joint parties' request for extension of time to defendant's deadline to provide identifying information regarding the class members and the corresponding deadlines by which opt-ins may join the lawsuit is extended to 6/7/16. ( Joint Status Report due by 6/7/2016.). Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 5/9/16. (KAP)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2016
26 26 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/21 2:11 PM
LETTER ORDER granting parties' joint request for extension of time. Defendant's deadline to provide identifying information regarding class members and the corresponding deadlines by which opt-ins may join in the lawsuit are extended to 5/6/16. ( Joint Status Report due by 5/6/2016.). Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 3/21/16. (KAP)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 05, 2016
utility E-Filing Notification Wrong Event Used Fri 02/05 10:25 AM
E-Filing Notification: Incorrect event used to electronically file document. For future reference, use Consent to become a party plaintiff event. No action required. RE:25 NOTICE by Denise Deanne, Kenneth Dunmars, Shawn Fitzgerald, Dawnette James, Sylvester Livingston, Sharon D. Smith, Kevin Tarrant (5th) of Filing Consents to Join Collective Action (TF)
Related: [-]
misc Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff Fri 02/05 10:27 AM
RE:25 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Jesse L. Young on behalf of Alaisha Browder. (TF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 04, 2016
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/04 4:15 PM
NOTICE by Denise Deanne, Kenneth Dunmars, Shawn Fitzgerald, Dawnette James, Sylvester Livingston, Sharon D. Smith, Kevin Tarrant (5th) of Filing Consents to Join Collective Action(Young, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, January 27, 2016
24 24 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 01/27 3:08 PM
LETTER ORDER granting parties' joint request that Defendant's deadline to provide identifying information regarding the class members and the corresponding deadline by which opt-ins may join the lawsuit is extended to 3/18/16., ( Joint Status Report due by 3/18/2016.). Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 1/27/16. (KAP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 14, 2016
utility E-Filing Notification Thu 01/14 4:05 PM
E-Filing Notification: revised docket text of23 to "CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF" to reflect correct filing event. This CM/ECF event should be used for all future filings adding parties to this action. (JHF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2016
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/13 10:06 AM
NOTICE by Denise Deanne, Shawn Fitzgerald, Sylvester Livingston, Sharon D. Smith, Kevin Tarrant, Veronica Toles (4th) of Filing Consents to Join Collective Action(Young, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Dawnette James Consent,
Att: 2 Exhibit Kenneth Dunmars
Monday, January 11, 2016
utility E-Filing Notification Mon 01/11 2:19 PM
E-Filing Notification: revised docket text of22 to "CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF" to reflect correct filing event. This CM/ECF event should be used for all future filings adding parties to this action. (JHF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 08, 2016
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/08 10:45 AM
NOTICE by Denise Deanne, Sylvester Livingston, Sharon D. Smith, Kevin Tarrant, Veronica Toles (3rd) of Filing Consents to Join Collective Action(Young, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent to Join
Friday, December 04, 2015
21 21 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/04 10:54 AM
LETTER ORDER granting parties' joint request for extension of time for defendants' to provide identifying information regarding class members and the corresponding deadline by which opt-ins may join the lawsuit be extended to 1/20/16 and a joint status report is also due on 1/20/16. ( Status Report due by 1/20/2016.). Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 12/4/15. (KAP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 03, 2015
20 20 order Order Tue 11/03 3:39 PM
LETTER ORDER granting the parties' joint request for extension of time to 12/2/15 to provide status report. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 10/30/15. (KAP)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 11/03 3:39 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/2/2015. (KAP)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2015
19 19 order Order Mon 08/31 4:24 PM
LETTER ORDER granting joint request for extension of time of the deadlines contained in the Court's Decision and Order, dated 8/20/2015 [Docket No. 17]. Defendant's deadline to provide identifying information regarding the class members is extended by sixty (60) days and is due by 11/2/2015. The deadline by which opt-ins may join the lawsuit is extended by sixty (60) days, to 12/18/15. The parties shall further provide a joint status report on the progress of this matter to be submitted to the Court on or before 11/2/2015. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 8/31/15. (KJA)
Related: [-]
18 18 order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Order Mon 08/31 10:09 AM
TEXT ORDER per letter-request submitted by counsel the scheduling conference set for 9/9/15 is cancelled. The parties are to provide a Status Report by 11/2/2015, so that the scheduling conference can be set if needed. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 8/31/15. (NNR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 20, 2015
17 17 order Order on Motion to Certify Class Thu 08/20 3:46 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion to Certify Class. See details in the Decision and Order. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 8/20/15. (MWP)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2015
16 16 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 07/31 11:33 AM
ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2015 10:30 AM before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 7/31/15. (NNR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 28, 2015
15 15 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 07/28 10:05 AM
TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. The Magistrate Judge is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre trial matters in this case are referred to the above named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. All non-dispositive motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 7/28/15. (KJA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2015
14 14 misc Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff Thu 07/23 5:41 PM
CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Jason T. Brown on behalf of Veronica Toles. (Brown, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2015
13 13 misc Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff Mon 07/13 11:59 AM
CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Jason T. Brown on behalf of Sharon D. Smith. (Brown, Jason)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/13 11:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle William Sturgess on behalf of Sutherland Global Services, Inc. (Sturgess, Kyle)
Related: [-]
utility E-Filing Notification Missing Caption/Case Number E-Filing Notification Wrong Document Attached Mon 07/13 10:48 AM
E-Filing Notification re9 CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF : Incorrect.pdf file attached to entry (name of party does on document not match name entered). Additionally, document missing case number. Action required: re-file document in proper format. (LB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2015
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 07/08 4:16 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sutherland Global Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sutherland Global Holdings, Inc. for Sutherland Global Services, Inc... (Moore, Daniel)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/08 4:08 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Sutherland Global Services, Inc..(Moore, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Defendant's Offer of Judgment to Named Plaintiff Denise Deanne Pursuant to FRCP 68,
Att: 2 Supplement Defendant's Offer of Judgment to Named Plaintiff Kevin Tarrant Pursuant to FRCP 68
9 9 misc Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff Wed 07/08 2:13 PM
CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Jason T. Brown on behalf of Denise Deanne, Sylvester Livingston, Kevin Tarrant. (Brown, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2015
8 8 order Decision and Order Mon 07/06 1:38 PM
DECISION AND ORDER re4 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Jacob R. Rusch, Esq. ( Filing fee $150 receipt number 0209-2281806) filed by Kevin Tarrant, Denise Deanne,7 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Kevin J. Stoops, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-2294754) filed by Sylvester Livingston, Kevin Tarrant, Denise Deanne,6 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Jesse L. Young, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-2294727) filed by Sylvester Livingston, Kevin Tarrant, Denise Deanne. Court grants pro hac vice and counsel are directed to comply with the Local Rule. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 7/6/15. (KJA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 25, 2015
utility Remark Thu 06/25 2:18 PM
Remark: confirmed MI bar admission for Jesse L. Young and Kevin J. Stoops. (JHF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2015
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/24 2:19 PM
MOTION to appear pro hac vice Kevin J. Stoops, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-2294754.) by Denise Deanne, Sylvester Livingston, Kevin Tarrant.(Brown, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Admission Petition Form,
Att: 2 Admission Sponsor Affidavit,
Att: 3 Attorneys Oath,
Att: 4 Civility Principles Oath,
Att: 5 Attorney Database Form,
Att: 6 Attorney CM/ECF Registation Form
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/24 2:08 PM
MOTION to appear pro hac vice Jesse L. Young, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-2294727.) by Denise Deanne, Sylvester Livingston, Kevin Tarrant.(Brown, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Admission Petition Form,
Att: 2 Admission Sponsor Affidavit,
Att: 3 Attorneys Oath,
Att: 4 Civility Principles Oath,
Att: 5 Attorney Database Form,
Att: 6 Attorney CM/ECF Registation Form
Monday, June 15, 2015
5 5 misc Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff Mon 06/15 10:28 AM
CONSENT TO BECOME A PARTY PLAINTIFF by Jason T. Brown on behalf of Denise Deanne, Kevin Tarrant. (Brown, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2015
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/05 5:13 PM
MOTION to appear pro hac vice Jacob R. Rusch, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0209-2281806.) by Denise Deanne, Kevin Tarrant.(Brown, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Admission Petition Form,
Att: 2 Admission Sponsor Affidavit,
Att: 3 Attorneys Oath,
Att: 4 Civility Principles Oath,
Att: 5 Attorney Database Form,
Att: 6 Attorney CM/ECF Registation Form
Friday, May 22, 2015
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 05/22 3:20 PM
Summons Issued as to Sutherland Global Services, Inc. (LB)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 05/22 3:18 PM
Case assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. (LB)
Related: [-]
adr Automatic Referral to Mediation Fri 05/22 3:21 PM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution (LB)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Fri 05/22 3:22 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (LB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2015
2 2 motion Certify Class Thu 05/21 7:38 PM
MOTION to Certify Class Pre-Discovery Motion for Conditional Class Certification and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) by DENISE DEANNE, KEVIN TARRANT.(Brown, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 INDEX OF EXHIBITS,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/21 7:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Sutherland Global Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-2271897.), filed by KEVIN TARRANT, DENISE DEANNE.(Brown, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 INDEX OF EXHIBITS,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 9 Summons to SUTHERLAND GLOBAL SERVICES, INC.