Colorado District Court
Judge:Christine M Arguello
Case #: 1:15-cv-01076
Nature of Suit625 Forfeiture/Penalty - Drug Related Seizure of Property 21 USC 881
Cause21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Case Filed:May 22, 2015
Terminated:Jul 08, 2015
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 18, 2015 7:21 AM MST
Claimant
Nikola Glisic
2213 Westdale Drive SW, Apt. 4
Cedar Rapids, IA 52404
Defendant
2006 Audi A4, VIN: WAUAF78E66A165756
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Laura Beth Hurd
U.S. Attorney'S Office-Denver
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Thursday, July 09, 2015
9 9 misc Statement Thu 07/09 4:01 PM
STATEMENT of Opposition re1 Complaint, by Claimant Nikola Glisic. (athom, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2015
8 8 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 07/08 12:48 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Dismiss. This case is DISMISSED in its entirety, without prejudice. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 07/08/2015. (athom, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2015
7 7 motion Dismiss Wed 07/01 1:20 PM
MOTION to Dismiss FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Plaintiff USA.(Hurd, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Wednesday, June 03, 2015
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Wed 06/03 9:55 AM
NOTICE re3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form,1 Complaint, by Plaintiff USA (Hurd, Laura)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2015
5 5 order Warrant Issued Wed 05/27 11:13 AM
WARRANT for Arrest of Property In Rem issued. (athom, ) (Main Document 5 replaced on 5/27/2015) (athom, ). Modified on 5/27/2015 to replace with correct pdf (athom, )
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order for Warrant for Arrest of Property Wed 05/27 11:11 AM
ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property In Rem. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 05/27/2015. (athom, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 22, 2015
3 3 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Fri 05/22 4:06 PM
Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued pursuant to Local Rule (dbera, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Fri 05/22 3:58 PM
Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) Modified on to reflect correct assignment. 5/22/2015 (dbera, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/22 12:15 PM
COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against 2006 Audi A4, VIN: WAUAF78E66A165756 Attorney Laura Beth Hurd added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA.(Hurd, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only),
Att: 2 Warrant for Arrest of Property,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet