Minnesota District Court
Judge:Patrick J Schiltz
Referred: Tony N Leung
Case #: 0:15-mc-00036
Case Filed:May 27, 2015
Last checked: Friday Dec 16, 2016 9:03 AM CST
Petitioner
Nicole Natalie Nelson
Represented By
Karin Ciano
Karin Ciano Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, June 02, 2015
3 3 order Order on Petition (in a Miscellaneous Case) Wed 06/03 10:17 AM
ORDER granting1 Petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 06/02/2015. (lmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2015
2 2 respm Declaration in Support Wed 05/27 1:06 PM
Declaration of Anne Sheane in Support of1 Ex Parte Application for Testimony Subpoena filed by Nicole Natalie Nelson.(kt) QC'd by KT on 5/27/15. (kt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-M
1 1 motion Petition (in a Miscellaneous Case) Wed 05/27 1:04 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TESTIMONY SUBPOENA. (Filing fee $ 46 receipt number 40083711.) Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Miscellaneous List and referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Filed by Nicole Natalie Nelson. (kt) QC'd by KT on 5/27/15. (kt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet