Hedges v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Donovan W Frank |
Referred: | Franklin L Noel |
Case #: | 0:15-cv-02574 |
Nature of Suit | 740 Labor - Railway Labor Act |
Cause | 45:151 Railway Labor Act |
Case Filed: | May 28, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 13, 2015 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 24, 2015 7:35 AM CST |
Defendant
Delta Air Lines, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Hedges
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 13, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
Thu 08/13 3:54 PM
JUDGMENT(lmb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal | ||
9 | 9
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 08/13 11:55 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 8/13/2015. (BJS) |
|
Wednesday, August 12, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 08/12 4:50 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Christopher Hedges. (Gilbertson, Britt) |
|
Tuesday, July 07, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 07/07 9:39 AM
ORDER re5 Stipulation. Delta Air Lines, Inc. answer due 8/14/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 7/1/15. (LPH) |
|
Thursday, June 18, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/18 11:20 AM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Gilbertson, Britt) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Thu 06/18 8:24 AM
STIPULATION To Extend Time to Respond by Delta Air Lines, Inc. Jointly Signed by Christopher Hedges. (Gilbertson, Britt) Modified text on 6/18/2015 (LEG) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/18 8:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Britt M Gilbertson on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Gilbertson, Britt) |
|
Thursday, May 28, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 05/28 12:36 PM
Summons Issued as to Delta Air Lines, Inc. (LEG) Modified text on 5/28/2015 (LEG) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Thu 05/28 12:33 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Please use case number 15-cv-2574 DWF/FLN. (LEG) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 05/28 11:57 AM
COMPLAINT against Delta Air Lines, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0864-4440761.) Filed by Christopher Hedges. Filer requests summons issued. (Corwin, Gregg) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |