Original Case: 3:15-cv-00211

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:15-cv-02143
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Case Filed:May 27, 2015
Terminated:Aug 13, 2015
Last checked: Friday Jan 08, 2016 11:19 PM CST
Defendant - Appellee
SCOTT A. NEITZEL, in his official capacity as Secretary of the Wisconsin Department of Administration
Represented By
Lewis W. Beilin
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
WISCONSIN DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION
Represented By
Lewis W. Beilin
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ANN W. BRADLEY, in her official capacity as a justice of the Wisconsin Supreme Court
Represented By
Ann W. Bradley
WISCONSIN SUPREME COURT
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
N. PATRICK CROOKS, in his official capacity as a justice of the Wisconsin Supreme Court
Represented By
Kevin St. John
BELL GIFTOS ST. JOHN
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MICHAEL J. GABELMAN, in his official capacity as a justice of the Wisconsin Supreme Court
Represented By
Kevin St. John
BELL GIFTOS ST. JOHN
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
PAM RADLOFF
Represented By
Jason Heinen
J. PETERMAN LEGAL GROUP, LTD
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MARGARET BRADY
Represented By
Lewis W. Beilin
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
SHIRLEY S. ABRAHAMSON
Represented By
Robert S. Peck
CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL LITIGATION P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOSEPH P. HEIM
Represented By
Robert S. Peck
CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL LITIGATION P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
DAVID PERKINS
Represented By
Robert S. Peck
CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL LITIGATION P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOHN V. LIEN
Represented By
Robert S. Peck
CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL LITIGATION P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARILYN WITTRY
Represented By
Robert S. Peck
CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL LITIGATION P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
HILDE ADLER
Represented By
Robert S. Peck
CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL LITIGATION P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/08/2016 10:03 PM CST
Wednesday, May 27, 2015
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Shirley S. Abrahamson, Hilde Adler, Joseph P. Heim, John V. Lien, David Perkins and Marilyn Wittry by 06/03/2015. Transcript information sheet due by 06/10/2015. Appellant's brief due on or before 07/06/2015 for Shirley S. Abrahamson, Hilde Adler, Joseph P. Heim, John V. Lien, David Perkins and Marilyn Wittry. [1] [6666076] 15-2143 (CD)
Related: [-]
2 2 THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES: Patience D. Roggensack, Annette K. Ziegler, Margaret Brady, Doug La Follette, Matt Adamczyk, and David T. Prosser, Jr. [2] [6666084] 15-2143 (CD)
Related: [-]