New Jersey District Court
Judge:Jerome B Simandle
Referred: Joel Schneider
Case #: 1:13-cv-00005
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause28:1338 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 02, 2013
Terminated:May 14, 2014
Last checked: Monday Jan 12, 2015 5:39 PM EST
Counter Claimant
MASCO CORPORATION OF INDIANA
Represented By
ROBERT A. ASSUNCAO
Ansa Assuncao, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
AS AMERICA, INC.
Represented By
DARREN H. GOLDSTEIN
Flaster Greenberg, PC
contact info
CHRISTOPHER IANNICELLI
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
contact info
VICTORIA JUNE MILLER
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
MASCO CORPORATION OF INDIANA
Represented By
ROBERT A. ASSUNCAO
Ansa Assuncao, LLP
contact info
JOHN P. MUELLER
Ansa Assuncao LLP
contact info
Notice Only
PHV MICHAEL P. DOERR
Notice Only
PHV JOHN V. GORMAN
Notice Only
PHV GEORGE D. MOUSTAKAS
Notice Only
PHV WILLIAM P. QUINN, JR.
Plaintiff
AS AMERICA, INC.
Represented By
DARREN H. GOLDSTEIN
Flaster Greenberg, PC
contact info
CHRISTOPHER IANNICELLI
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
contact info
VICTORIA JUNE MILLER
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info

GPO Aug 13 2013
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting defendant's 38 Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions. Defendant's invalidity contentions are amended in accordance with Exhibit R to its Reply Brief [41-2]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/13/2013. (tf, )

Docket last updated: 02/26/2013 12:37 AM EST
Wednesday, January 02, 2013
1 1 COMPLAINT against MASCO CORPORATION OF INDIANA ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4745773) with JURY DEMAND, filed by AS AMERICA, INC..(kas, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MASCO CORPORATION OF INDIANA Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *KIM STILLMAN* (kas, )
Related: [-]
3 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AS AMERICA, INC. (kas, )
Related: [-]
4 4 AO120 Patent Form filed. (kas, )
Related: [-]