Lorona v. Arizona Summit Law School LLC et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Neil V Wake |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-00972 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | May 28, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 01, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 24, 2015 7:13 AM MST |
Defendant
Arizona Summit Law School LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Infilaw Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unknown Parties
|
|
Plaintiff
Paula C Lorona
12705 W Sierra Cir.
El Mirage, AZ 85335 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Jason Lee
Terminated: 06/04/2015
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stephanie Lee
Terminated: 06/04/2015
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Scott Thompson
Terminated: 06/04/2015
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unknown Thompson
Terminated: 06/04/2015
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
90 | 90
order
Order Dismissing Case Order on Stipulation
Thu 06/01 2:41 PM
ORDER granting89 Stipulation of Dismissal. The above-captioned matter is dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 06/01/2017. (KAS) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
89 | 89
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 05/31 2:14 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice by Arizona Summit Law School LLC, Infilaw Corporation.(Johnson, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order |