Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Sim Lake
Case #: 4:15-cv-01470
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Case Filed:Jun 01, 2015
Terminated:Oct 21, 2016
Last checked: Saturday Nov 28, 2015 8:47 AM CST
Conflict Check Party
Vinson & Elkins LLP
Conflict Check Party
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
Conflict Check Party
Levi & Korsinsky, LLP
Conflict Check Party
Hall Maines Lugrin, P.C.
Defendant
Vanguard Natural Resources, LLC
Represented By
Craig Eric Zieminski
Vinson Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Herbert C. Williamson III
Defendant
William K. White
Represented By
Craig Eric Zieminski
Vinson Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Eagle Rock Energy G&P, LLC
Represented By
Craig Eric Zieminski
Vinson Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Talon Merger Sub, LLC
Represented By
Craig Eric Zieminski
Vinson Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
William A. Smith
Defendant
Philip B. Smith
Represented By
Craig Eric Zieminski
Vinson Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Christopher D. Ray
Represented By
Craig Eric Zieminski
Vinson Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Joseph A. Mills
Represented By
Craig Eric Zieminski
Vinson Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Peggy A. Heeg
Defendant
David W. Hayes
Represented By
Craig Eric Zieminski
Vinson Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Eagle Rock Energy Partners, L.P.
Represented By
Craig Eric Zieminski
Vinson Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Eagle Rock Energy GP, L.P.
Represented By
Craig Eric Zieminski
Vinson Elkins LLP
contact info
Movant
Irving Braun
Represented By
Andrew M Edison
Edison, Mcdowell & Hetherington, LLP
contact info
Movant
Judith Braun
Represented By
Andrew M Edison
Edison, Mcdowell & Hetherington, LLP
contact info
Movant
Cecil Philan
Represented By
Andrew M Edison
Edison, Mcdowell & Hetherington, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pieter Heydenrych
Represented By
Thomas E Bilek
The Bilek Law Firm LLP
contact info

GPO Oct 21 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 17 MOTION to Dismiss 16 Amended Complaint. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
GPO Oct 21 2016
FINAL JUDGMENT. Case terminated on 10/21/2016. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.