Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:14-bk-32005

Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:R Kimball Mosier
Case #: 2:15-ap-02101
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:Jun 01, 2015
Terminated:Sep 13, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ronnie A Sheppick
584 Teresa Street
Kaysville, UT 84037
Represented By
Lou G. Harris
Lincoln Law Center, LLC
contact info
Tyler J. Jensen
Lebaron & Jensen, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
United States Trustee
Ken Garff Bldg. 405 South Main Street Suite 300
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
John T. Morgan tr
Us Trustees Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Thursday, September 14, 2017
47 47 generic BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order Thu 09/14 10:48 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order. Related [+]. Notice Date 09/14/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 46 Order
Wednesday, September 13, 2017
court Dispose Adversary Case Wed 09/13 4:04 PM
Adversary Case 2:15-ap-2101 Disposed. (mkh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2017
46 46 3 pgs order Order (generic) (order) Tue 09/12 12:25 PM
Order Approving Stipulation to Waiver of Discharge and Judgment Waiving Discharge of Debts. Related [+] (mkh)
Related: [-] 43 Waiver of Discharge
45 45 misc Pending Order Tue 09/12 8:15 AM
Pending Order (Agreed to/Stipulated) related documents(s):44 Motion for Entry of Judgment/Order Filed by: (Morgan tr, John)
Related: [-]
44 44 motion Entry of Judgment/Order Re: (Motion) Tue 09/12 8:15 AM
Motion for Entry of Judgment/Order Related [+] Motion to Approve Stipulation to Waiver of Discharge and to Enter Judgment Waiving Discharge Filed by United States Trustee. (Morgan tr, John)
Related: [-] 43 Waiver of Discharge
43 43 misc Waiver of Discharge Tue 09/12 8:12 AM
Stipulated Waiver of Discharge and to Enter Judgment Waiving Discharge Filed by United States Trustee. (Morgan tr, John)
Related: [-]
order Unsigned Order (order) Tue 09/12 12:18 PM
Unsigned Order Related [+]. Reason Order Was Unsigned: Alternate order to be entered (mkh)
Related: [-] 45 Pending Order filed by John T. Morgan tr
Wednesday, May 17, 2017
42 42 generic BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order Wed 05/17 10:40 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/17/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 41 Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters
Monday, May 15, 2017
41 41 order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters (order) Mon 05/15 12:47 PM
Order on Stipulated Motion to Extend Trial Date. Trial date set for 06/21/17 and 6/22/17 is stricken. Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 9/12/2017 at 10:00AM at US Bankruptcy Court. (clo)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2017
40 40 misc Pending Order Fri 05/12 3:50 PM
Pending Order (Agreed to/Stipulated) related documents(s):39 Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing Filed by: (Jensen, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2017
39 39 motion Continue Hearing (Motion) Mon 05/08 4:51 PM
Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing Related [+] Filed by Ronnie A Sheppick. (Jensen, Tyler)
Related: [-] 37 Pre-Trial Order
Thursday, March 16, 2017
38 38 generic BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order Thu 03/16 10:39 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order. Related [+]. Notice Date 03/16/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 37 Pre-Trial Order
Tuesday, March 14, 2017
37 37 order Pre-Trial Order (order) Tue 03/14 4:21 PM
Pre-Trial Order. Signed As Modified By The Court. Trial date set for 6/21/17 and 6/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court. (clo)
Related: [-]
36 36 audio Tue 03/14 11:25 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/14/2017 10:17:05 AM ]. File Size [ 5633 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:11:44 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry Re: Final Pretrial Tue 03/14 10:35 AM
Minute Entry Re: Final Pre-Trial Conference.: Related [+] Appearances: John T. Morgan (USTR); Chase Adams (Dfds) Trial dates set for 06/21/2017 and 6/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court. Trial briefs due 6/14/17. Previously filed order will be entered as modified by the Court. (tjc)
Related: [-] 33 Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters
Wednesday, March 01, 2017
notice Notice of Endorsement (NO IMAGE) Wed 03/01 9:34 AM
Notice of Endorsemen Related [+]. Endorsed with no objection Filed by Tyler J. Jensen on behalf of Ronnie A Sheppick. (Jensen, Tyler)
Related: [-] 35 Pending Order (Other) related documents(s):33 Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters Filed by: (Morgan tr, John) [Order# 323910]
Tuesday, February 28, 2017
35 35 misc Pending Order Tue 02/28 6:46 PM
Pending Order (Other) related documents(s):33 Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters Filed by: (Morgan tr, John)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 02, 2016
34 34 generic BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order Sun 10/02 10:43 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order. Related [+]. Notice Date 10/02/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33 Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters
Friday, September 30, 2016
33 33 order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters (order) Fri 09/30 11:51 AM
Order Modifying Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters. Pre-Trial Order due by 2/28/2017. Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 3/14/2017 at 10:00AM at US Bankruptcy Court. (clo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2016
32 32 misc Pending Order Thu 09/29 3:46 PM
Pending Order (Agreed to/Stipulated) related documents(s):31 Motion to Amend Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters Filed by: (Morgan tr, John)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Amend Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters (Motion) Thu 09/29 3:45 PM
Stipulated Motion to Amend Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters Filed by United States Trustee. (Morgan tr, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2016
30 30 generic BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order Thu 09/01 10:46 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order. Related [+] Notice Date 09/01/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters
Tuesday, August 30, 2016
29 29 order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters (order) Tue 08/30 11:53 AM
Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters. Pre-Trial Order due by 11/29/2016. Attorney's Conference: 11/15/16; Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 12/13/2016 at 10:00AM at US Bankruptcy Court. (clo)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2016
notice Notice of Endorsement (NO IMAGE) Mon 08/29 3:00 PM
Notice of Endorsemen Related [+]. Endorsed with no objection Filed by Tyler J. Jensen on behalf of Ronnie A Sheppick (Jensen, Tyler)
Related: [-] 26 Stipulated Motion to Amend Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters Filed by United States Trustee (Morgan tr, John),27 Pending Order (Agreed to/Stipulated) related documents(s):26 Motion to Amend Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters Filed by: (Morgan tr, John) [Order# 311070]
Thursday, August 25, 2016
28 28 notice Notice to Take Deposition Thu 08/25 12:15 PM
Notice to Take Deposition of Lou G. Harris "Rescheduled" Filed by John T. Morgan tr on behalf of United States Trustee (Morgan tr, John)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Pending Order Thu 08/25 12:12 PM
Pending Order (Agreed to/Stipulated) related documents(s):26 Motion to Amend Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters Filed by: (Morgan tr, John)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Amend Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters (Motion) Thu 08/25 12:12 PM
Stipulated Motion to Amend Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters Filed by United States Trustee (Morgan tr, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2016
25 25 notice Notice to Take Deposition Fri 08/12 4:05 PM
Notice to Take Deposition of Lou G. Harris Related [+] Filed by John T. Morgan tr on behalf of United States Trustee (Morgan tr, John)
Related: [-] scheduled
Thursday, July 28, 2016
24 24 notice Notice to Take Deposition Thu 07/28 4:20 PM
Notice to Take Deposition of Lou G. Harris Filed by John T. Morgan tr on behalf of United States Trustee (Morgan tr, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2016
23 23 order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters (order) Thu 06/30 1:20 PM
Order Granting Related [+] Pre-Trial Order due by 11/29/2016. Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 12/13/2016 at 10:00AM at US Bankruptcy Court. (mkz)
Related: [-] (s):21 Motion to Amend Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters
Wednesday, June 29, 2016
notice Notice of Endorsement (NO IMAGE) Wed 06/29 8:59 AM
Notice of Endorsemen Related [+]. Endorsed with no objection Filed by Tyler J. Jensen on behalf of Ronnie A Sheppick (Jensen, Tyler)
Related: [-] 21 Stipulated Motion to Amend Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters Filed by United States Trustee (Morgan tr, John),22 Pending Order (Agreed to/Stipulated) related documents(s):21 Motion to Amend Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters Filed by: (Morgan tr, John) [Order# 307014]
Tuesday, June 28, 2016
22 22 misc Pending Order Tue 06/28 5:34 PM
Pending Order (Agreed to/Stipulated) related documents(s):21 Motion to Amend Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters Filed by: (Morgan tr, John)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Amend Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters (Motion) Tue 06/28 5:33 PM
Stipulated Motion to Amend Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters Filed by United States Trustee (Morgan tr, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2016
20 20 notice Notice to Take Deposition Tue 05/03 3:22 PM
Notice to Take Deposition of Melissa Sheppick Filed by United States Trustee (Morgan tr, John)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice to Take Deposition Tue 05/03 3:21 PM
Notice to Take Deposition of Ronnie Allen Sheppick Filed by United States Trustee (Morgan tr, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2016
18 18 generic BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Order Thu 04/07 10:46 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order. Related [+] Notice Date 04/07/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters
Tuesday, April 05, 2016
17 17 order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters (order) Tue 04/05 1:16 PM
Order Modifying Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters. Pre-Trial Order due by 9/27/2016. Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 10/11/2016 at 02:00PM at US Bankruptcy Court. (clo)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2016
16 16 misc Pending Order Mon 04/04 10:24 AM
Pending Order (Agreed to/Stipulated) related documents(s):15 Motion to Amend Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters Filed by: (Morgan tr, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2016
15 15 motion Amend Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters (Motion) Thu 03/31 4:05 PM
Stipulated Motion to Amend Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters Filed by United States Trustee (Morgan tr, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 11, 2016
14 14 notice Notice Fri 03/11 10:58 AM
Notice Related [+] of Cancelled Deposition of Melissa Sheppick Filed by John T. Morgan tr on behalf of United States Trustee (Morgan tr, John)
Related: [-] 11 Notice to Take Deposition filed by Plaintiff United States Trustee
13 13 notice Notice Fri 03/11 10:58 AM
Notice Related [+] of Cancelled Deposition of Ronnie Allen Sheppick Filed by John T. Morgan tr on behalf of United States Trustee (Morgan tr, John)
Related: [-] 10 Notice to Take Deposition filed by Plaintiff United States Trustee
Tuesday, March 01, 2016
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Tue 03/01 4:04 PM
Certificate of Service re: Request for Production of Documents Filed by United States Trustee (Morgan tr, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 25, 2016
11 11 notice Notice to Take Deposition Thu 02/25 2:19 PM
Notice to Take Deposition of Melissa Sheppick Filed by John T. Morgan tr on behalf of United States Trustee (Morgan tr, John)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice to Take Deposition Thu 02/25 2:18 PM
Notice to Take Deposition of Ronnie Allen Sheppick Filed by John T. Morgan tr on behalf of United States Trustee (Morgan tr, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 01, 2015
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/01 2:40 PM
Certificate of Service Initial Disclosures Filed by Ronnie A Sheppick (Jensen, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2015
8 8 notice Notice of Initial Disclosures (Rule7026(a)(1)) Tue 09/15 3:50 PM
Notice of Initial Disclosures as Per Bankruptcy Rule 7026(a)(1) Filed by United States Trustee (Morgan tr, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 13, 2015
7 7 order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters (order) Thu 08/13 1:50 PM
Order Governing Scheduling and Preliminary Matters. Pre-Trial Order due by 6/27/2016. Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 7/12/2016 at 10:00AM at US Bankruptcy Court. (sjl) (EOD: 08/13/2015)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 10, 2015
notice Notice of Endorsement (NO IMAGE) Mon 08/10 10:07 AM
Notice of Endorsemen Related [+]. Endorsed with no objection Filed by Tyler J. Jensen on behalf of Ronnie A Sheppick (Jensen, Tyler)
Related: [-] 6 Form 35/Report of Parties Planning Meeting Filed by United States Trustee (Morgan tr, John)
Notice of Endorsemen Related [+]. Endorsed with no objection Filed by Tyler J. Jensen on behalf of Ronnie A Sheppick (Jensen, Tyler) (EOD: 08/10/2015)
Related: [-] 6 Form 35/Report of Parties Planning Meeting Filed by United States Trustee (Morgan tr, John)
Friday, August 07, 2015
6 6 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (Form 35) Fri 08/07 4:22 PM
Form 35/Report of Parties Planning Meeting Filed by United States Trustee (Morgan tr, John) (EOD: 08/07/2015)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 15, 2015
5 5 order Order/Notice of Initial Pretrial Conf. (order) Wed 07/15 8:49 AM
Order and Notice of Initial Pre-Trial Conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/18/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court. Report of Parties Planning Meeting due by 8/7/2015. (jwg) (EOD: 07/15/2015)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 14, 2015
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/14 4:38 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Ronnie A Sheppick (Jensen, Tyler) (EOD: 07/14/2015)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance of Counsel and Request for Notice (With Image) Tue 07/14 4:11 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Tyler J. Jensen on behalf of Ronnie A Sheppick (Jensen, Tyler) (EOD: 07/14/2015)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2015
2 2 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 06/23 3:41 PM
Summons Service Executed. Party Served: Ronnie Sheppick. (Morgan tr, John) (EOD: 06/23/2015)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2015
[LINK:Summons Issued] Summons Reissued. Originally issued on 6/1/15. (Morgan tr, John) Modified on 6/22/2015 (clo). (EOD: 06/01/2015)
Related: [-]
Request for Reissuance of Summons Filed by United States Trustee (Morgan tr, John) (EOD: 06/22/2015)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 01, 2015
1 1 Adversary case[LINK 15-02101 . (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))):Complaint by United States Trustee against Ronnie A Sheppick. Receipt Number Waive, Fee Amount $350 (Morgan tr, John) (EOD: 06/01/2015)
Related: [-]