Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Referred: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Case #: 1:15-cv-01806
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 02, 2015
Terminated:Jul 05, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Nov 29, 2015 7:01 AM CST
Defendant
Jayson Linebaugh
Defendant
Natchitoches
Defendant
Jayson Daniel Linebaugh
Represented By
Ronald E Corkern, Jr
Corkern Crews & Guillet
contact info
Defendant
City of Natchitoches
Represented By
Ronald E Corkern, Jr
Corkern Crews & Guillet
contact info
Defendant
Police Dept City of Natchitoches
Defendant
Unknown Employees
Plaintiff
Brandon Grant
Represented By
Alex James Washington
Washington & Wells
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, July 05, 2017
52 52 order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary Wed 07/05 2:39 PM
ORDER granting51 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice. Jury Trial currently set for July 17, 2017 is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/5/2017. (crt,Tice, Y)
Related: [-]