Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Leslie J Abrams
Case #: 1:15-cv-00088
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2015
Terminated:Oct 23, 2015
Last checked: Monday Nov 30, 2015 6:54 AM EST
Counter Claimant
PIETER BOOYSEN
Represented By
CHARLES EDWARD PEELER
contact info
PATRICK S FLYNN
contact info
Counter Claimant
PWB AG CONSULTING LLC
Represented By
CHARLES EDWARD PEELER
contact info
PATRICK S FLYNN
contact info
Counter Defendant
BST AG SOLUTIONS INC
Represented By
Hugh Brown McNatt
contact info
MATTHEW B AMES
contact info
Defendant
PIETER BOOYSEN
Represented By
CHARLES EDWARD PEELER
contact info
PATRICK S FLYNN
contact info
Defendant
PWB AG CONSULTING LLC
Represented By
CHARLES EDWARD PEELER
contact info
PATRICK S FLYNN
contact info
Interested Party
RW GRIFFIN INDUSTRIES LLC
Represented By
Robert Lee Porter, Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
BST AG SOLUTIONS INC
Represented By
Hugh Brown McNatt
contact info
MATTHEW B AMES
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Ronny Shingler
7525 Highway 273
Blakely, GA 39823
Represented By
MATTHEW B AMES
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Linton Thompson
882 Piney Grove Church Road
Arlington, GA 39813
Represented By
MATTHEW B AMES
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
PIETER BOOYSEN
Represented By
CHARLES EDWARD PEELER
contact info
PATRICK S FLYNN
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
PWB AG CONSULTING LLC
Represented By
CHARLES EDWARD PEELER
contact info
PATRICK S FLYNN
contact info

GPO Jul 02 2015
FINAL ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction re:2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by BST AG SOLUTIONS INC. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 07/02/2015. (mdm)

Docket last updated: 80 minutes ago
Friday, October 23, 2015
41 41 order Order Fri 10/23 1:54 PM
ORDER approving40 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by PIETER BOOYSEN, PWB AG CONSULTING LLC Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 10/23/2015. (bcl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2015
40 40 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 10/22 10:12 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by PIETER BOOYSEN, PWB AG CONSULTING LLC (FLYNN, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing Thu 10/22 10:51 AM
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING: Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2015 at 2:30 PM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS (mtc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 15, 2015
39 39 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 10/15 11:16 AM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting38 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re34 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 10/15/2015. No further extension will be granted by the Court. (rdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 12, 2015
38 38 motion Ext of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 10/12 12:13 PM
THIRD MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to34 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by PIETER BOOYSEN, PWB AG CONSULTING LLC filed by PATRICK S FLYNN.(FLYNN, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2015
notice Notice of Hearing Tue 09/29 3:59 PM
NOTICE OF RESETTING HEARING Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2015 at 2:30 PM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS. (mtc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2015
37 37 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 09/24 1:19 PM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs' response to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgement on the Pleadings shall be due on October 13, 2015. Plaintiff's reply will be due on October 27, 2015. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 9/24/15.(rdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2015
36 36 motion Extension of Time (Misc) Ext of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 09/23 4:31 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion., MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to34 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by PIETER BOOYSEN, PWB AG CONSULTING LLC filed by CHARLES EDWARD PEELER.(PEELER, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 10, 2015
notice Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension Thu 09/10 9:08 AM
Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension re:35 Stipulation filed by PIETER BOOYSEN, PWB AG CONSULTING LLC,34 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Ronny Shingler, Linton Thompson, BST AG SOLUTIONS INC (bcl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 09, 2015
35 35 misc Stipulation Wed 09/09 4:48 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond re34 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by PIETER BOOYSEN, PWB AG CONSULTING LLC (PEELER, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 24, 2015
34 34 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Mon 08/24 5:37 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by BST AG SOLUTIONS INC, Ronny Shingler, Linton Thompson filed by MATTHEW B AMES.(AMES, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
Friday, August 21, 2015
33 33 order Order - Rules 16/26 Fri 08/21 6:12 PM
RULES 16/26 ORDER : Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 10/5/2015. Scheduling Conference set for 10/20/2015 at 2:00 PM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS. Corporate Disclosures due by 9/4/2015. (mtc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2015
32 32 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time (Misc) Wed 07/22 11:30 AM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER denying29 Motion for Extension of Time as MOOT. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 7/22/2015 (rdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 21, 2015
31 31 misc Withdrawal of Motion Tue 07/21 12:57 PM
WITHDRAWAL of Motion (AMES, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2015
30 30 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/17 5:52 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by BST AG SOLUTIONS INC, Ronny Shingler, Linton Thompson.(AMES, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Extension of Time (Misc) Fri 07/17 1:58 PM
CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Defendants' Counter-Claim and Third-Party Claim. by BST AG SOLUTIONS INC, Ronny Shingler, Linton Thompson filed by MATTHEW B AMES.(AMES, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, July 02, 2015
28 28 order Order Thu 07/02 4:11 PM
FINAL ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction re:2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by BST AG SOLUTIONS INC. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 07/02/2015. (mdm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2015
27 27 misc Stipulation Tue 06/30 4:40 PM
STIPULATION Regarding the Use of Droplet Icon by PIETER BOOYSEN, PWB AG CONSULTING LLC (PEELER, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 26, 2015
26 26 service Summons Issued Fri 06/26 4:42 PM
Summons Issued as to Linton Thompson on 6/26/2015. (mdm)
Related: [-]
25 25 service Summons Issued Fri 06/26 4:42 PM
Summons Issued as to Ronny Shingler on 6/26/2015. (mdm)
Related: [-]
24 24 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Third Party Complaint Counterclaim Fri 06/26 4:04 PM
ANSWER to16 Amended Complaint,23 Amended Complaint,, ANSWER to16 Amended Complaint,23 Amended Complaint,, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Linton Thompson, Ronny Shingler, COUNTERCLAIM against BST AG SOLUTIONS INC by PWB AG CONSULTING LLC, PIETER BOOYSEN.(PEELER, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2015
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 06/22 11:13 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against PIETER BOOYSEN, PWB AG CONSULTING LLC,filed by BST AG SOLUTIONS INC.(AMES, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Composite Exhibit of Corporate Documents,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - BST Ag Solutions Agreement for 2014 Email,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - RW Griffin Email from Pieter Booysen,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Annual Albit Distribution Agreement 2015 Email
Friday, June 19, 2015
22 22 trial Exhibit List Mon 06/22 10:50 AM
Exhibit List by BST AG SOLUTIONS INC re Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 6/18/2015.(bcl) (bcl). Modified on 6/22/2015 (bcl). (bcl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 1 - Cooperate formation documents,
Att: 2 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 2 - Copy of emails,
Att: 3 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 18 - Copy of invoice,
Att: 4 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 29 - P.W.B. Business Card,
Att: 5 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 3 - Albit Marketing Brochure,
Att: 6 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 4 - RW Griffin Proposal,
Att: 7 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 6 - Confidentiality Agreement,
Att: 8 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 7 - Albit Distribution Agreement 2015,
Att: 9 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 8 - Copy of email,
Att: 10 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 9 - Copy of email,
Att: 11 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 28 - Albit Agreement,
Att: 12 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 5 - Copy of email,
Att: 13 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 21 - Copy of email,
Att: 14 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 20 - Copy of email,
Att: 15 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 23 - Copy of email,
Att: 16 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 12 - Copy of letter to attorney,
Att: 17 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 10 - Copy of letter,
Att: 18 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 11 - Copy of email
Att: 19 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 25 - Copy of powerpointpresentation (Under Seal)
21 21 trial Exhibit List Mon 06/22 10:14 AM
Exhibit List by PIETER BOOYSEN, PWB AG CONSULTING LLC re Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 6/18/2015.(bcl) (bcl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 2 - Product Label,
Att: 2 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 1 - Copy of GOS NEEM 7-Way Label,
Att: 3 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 5 - Copy of 2014 BST tax retrun (Under Seal),
Att: 4 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 23 - Copy of BST Ag Solution transaction listing 2014,
Att: 5 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 3 - Copy of emails - BST Ag Solutions Agreement,
Att: 6 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 7 - Copy of Albit prodcut label,
Att: 7 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 6 - Copy of Albit website,
Att: 8 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 10 - Copy of Terramera Proposal 5/14/14,
Att: 9 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 13 - Copy of Email - Annual Albit Distribution Agreement 2015 (Exhibit D to Complaint),
Att: 10 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 14 - Copy of Email - Atur to Shingler 1/26/15,
Att: 11 (6/22/2015) Envelope 15 - Copy of email from Booysen to Shingler 2/19/15,
Att: 12 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 12 - Copy of Bank America PWB bank statement,
Att: 13 (6/22/2015) Exhibit 20 - Copy of email - private link to trials
19 19 order Order on Motion to Seal Document Fri 06/19 3:26 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Seal Document. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 6/19/2015. (bcl)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Seal Document(s) Fri 06/19 12:14 PM
CONSENT MOTION to Seal Document(s) by PIETER BOOYSEN, PWB AG CONSULTING LLC filed by CHARLES EDWARD PEELER.(PEELER, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
17 17 order Order Fri 06/19 10:50 AM
ORDER DISSOLVING the Temporary Restraining Order re5 Order on Motion for TRO and DENYING Preliminary Injunction re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by BST AG SOLUTIONS INC. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 06/19/2015. (mdm)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Fri 06/19 2:49 PM
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Fri 06/19 3:04 PM
Notice of Deficiency; Document must be refiled to include a description of exhibit(s) - Related [+]. (bcl)
Related: [-] 16 Amended Complaint filed by BST AG SOLUTIONS INC
Thursday, June 18, 2015
20 20 minutes Evidentiary Hearing Mon 06/22 10:08 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 6/18/2015. Court Reporter: Sherry Parker. (bcl)
Related: [-]
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 06/18 10:02 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against PIETER BOOYSEN, PWB AG CONSULTING LLC,filed by BST AG SOLUTIONS INC.(AMES, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Wednesday, June 17, 2015
15 15 minutes Telephone Conference Wed 06/17 5:31 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS: Telephone Conference held on 6/17/2015 Court Reporter: Sherry Parker. (mtc)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Wed 06/17 1:21 PM
Objection of R.W. Griffin Industries, LLC to Subpoena by RW GRIFFIN INDUSTRIES LLC(bcl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Wed 06/17 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of Non-Service by BST AG SOLUTIONS INC(AMES, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Non-Service
12 12 respm Response to Motion Wed 06/17 11:58 AM
RESPONSE filed by BST AG SOLUTIONS INC re11 MOTION to Quash Subpoena(AMES, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Email Thread with Charles Peeler
notice Notice of Hearing Wed 06/17 12:35 PM
NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING Telephone Conference set for 6/17/2015 at 3:00 PM in Albany before US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS. (mtc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2015
11 11 motion Quash Tue 06/16 5:44 PM
MOTION to Quash Subpoena by PIETER BOOYSEN, PWB AG CONSULTING LLC filed by CHARLES EDWARD PEELER.(PEELER, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Subpoena
10 10 motion Compel Tue 06/16 9:29 AM
MOTION to Compel Enforcement of Subpoena and Production of Relevant Materials by BST AG SOLUTIONS INC filed by MATTHEW B AMES.(AMES, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Subpoena for Ronny Shingler and Linton Thompson and Correspondence from Counsel,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Subpoena for Pieter Booysen and Correspondence from Counsel,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Email from Counsel Refusing Service of Subpoena for Pieter Booysen
notice Notice of Deficiency Tue 06/16 9:03 AM
Notice of Deficiency; Other - Please refile Motion to Compel Production fo Relevant Materials as a separate document. Related [+]. (bcl)
Related: [-] 9 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by BST AG SOLUTIONS INC
Monday, June 15, 2015
9 9 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 06/15 5:26 PM
REPLY to Response filed by BST AG SOLUTIONS INC re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order(AMES, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Subpoena for Ronny Shingler and Linton Thompson and Correspondence from Counsel,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Subpoena for Pieter Booysen and Correspondence from Counsel,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Email from Counsel Refusing Service of Subpoena for Pieter Booysen
Friday, June 12, 2015
8 8 respm Response to Motion Fri 06/12 6:19 PM
RESPONSE filed by PIETER BOOYSEN, PWB AG CONSULTING LLC re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order(FLYNN, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Pieter Booysen
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Fri 06/12 9:28 AM
NOTICE of Removal (Amended) by PIETER BOOYSEN, PWB AG CONSULTING LLC(FLYNN, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Verified Complaint (file-stamped),
Att: 2 Exhibit Motion for TRO (file-stamped)
notice Notice of Deficiency Fri 06/12 8:26 AM
Notice of Deficiency; Document must be refiled and converted into text-searchable PDF - Related [+]. (bcl)
Related: [-] 6 Notice (Other) filed by PIETER BOOYSEN, PWB AG CONSULTING LLC
Thursday, June 11, 2015
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Thu 06/11 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Removal (Amended) by PIETER BOOYSEN, PWB AG CONSULTING LLC(FLYNN, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Verified Complaint (file-stamped),
Att: 2 Exhibit Motion for TRO (file-stamped)
Monday, June 08, 2015
5 5 order Order on Motion for TRO Mon 06/08 5:24 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for TRO. A hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction shall be held on Thursday, June 18, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. in the Albany Division. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 6/8/2015.(rdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2015
4 4 motion Remand Fri 06/05 3:43 PM
MOTION to Remand by BST AG SOLUTIONS INC filed by MATTHEW B AMES.(AMES, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support of Motion to Remand
Wednesday, June 03, 2015
3 3 misc Consent Form (28 USC 636) Sent Wed 06/03 2:11 PM
Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to BST AG SOLUTIONS INC (bcl)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Temporary Restraining Order Wed 06/03 2:10 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by BST AG SOLUTIONS INC filed by MATTHEW B AMES, Hugh Brown McNatt.(bcl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 06/03 1:55 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PWB AG CONSULTING LLC, PIETER BOOYSEN from Superior Court of Early County Georgia, case number 2015cv169, consisting of Notice of Removal, Complaint & Exhibits. (Filing fee $ 400 Receipt Number 2094000), filed by PWB AG CONSULTING LLC, PIETER BOOYSEN.(bcl) (bcl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint & Exhibits
Att: 2 (6/3/2015) Civil Cover Sheet