Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:13-bk-11482

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin J Carey
Case #: 1:15-ap-50510
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2015
Terminated:Oct 13, 2015
Last checked: never
Defendant
Pure Marketing Group Corporation
225 Curie Drive Suite 1300
Alpharetta, GA 30005
Represented By
Pure Marketing Group Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as GUC Trust Trustee of the Exide Creditors' Liquidating Trust
2600 Eagan Woods Drive Suite 400
St. Paul, MN 55121
Represented By
Erin R Fay
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell, LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Robert J. Dehney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Edward E Neiger
Ask LLP
contact info
Alex Govze
Ask Financial LLP
contact info
Eric D. Schwartz
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Brigette G. McGrath
Ask LLP
contact info
Marianna Udem
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 13, 2015
court Close Adversary Case Tue 10/13 1:04 PM
Adversary Case 15-50510 Closed by Deputy Clerk. (LMD)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 09, 2015
16 16 notice Dismissal - Notice Fri 10/09 5:40 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Re: Pure Marketing Group Corporation Filed by Peter Kravitz, as GUC Trust Trustee of the Exide Creditors' Liquidating Trust (Fay, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, September 16, 2015
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Wed 09/16 8:09 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Schedule for Hearing on September 17, 2015 at 2:00 P.M. (ET) Filed by Peter Kravitz, as GUC Trust Trustee of the Exide Creditors' Liquidating Trust. (Fay, Erin)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Wed 09/16 2:51 PM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Peter Kravitz, as GUC Trust Trustee of the Exide Creditors' Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2015 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Fay, Erin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2015
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Tue 09/15 1:04 PM
Certificate of Service re Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on September 17, 2015 at 4:00 p.m Filed by Peter Kravitz, as GUC Trust Trustee of the Exide Creditors' Liquidating Trust. (Fay, Erin)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 09/15 11:55 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Peter Kravitz, as GUC Trust Trustee of the Exide Creditors' Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2015 at 04:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Fay, Erin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 10, 2015
11 11 misc Status Report Thu 09/10 6:51 PM
Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Proceedings Assigned to the Honorable Kevin J. Carey Filed by Peter Kravitz, as GUC Trust Trustee of the Exide Creditors' Liquidating Trust. (Fay, Erin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2015
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Thu 07/02 12:07 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Peter Kravitz, as GUC Trust Trustee of the Exide Creditors' Liquidating Trust. (Fay, Erin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2015
9 9 order Order Wed 07/01 10:55 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550. Order Signed on 6/30/2015 (LMD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2015
8 8 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Tue 06/30 3:19 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 Filed by Peter Kravitz, as GUC Trust Trustee of the Exide Creditors' Liquidating Trust. (Fay, Erin)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Adjourned/Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Tue 06/30 2:11 PM
Notice of Adjourned/Rescheduled Hearing Date and Time from July 1, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. (ET) to July 7, 2015 at 3:00 p.m. (ET) Filed by Peter Kravitz, as GUC Trust Trustee of the Exide Creditors' Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 7/7/2015 at 03:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Related [+] (Fay, Erin)
Related: [-] 6
Monday, June 29, 2015
6 6 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Mon 06/29 10:53 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Peter Kravitz, as GUC Trust Trustee of the Exide Creditors' Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 7/1/2015 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Fay, Erin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 18, 2015
5 5 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 06/18 2:43 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Pure Marketing Group Corporation. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 8/5/2015 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Fay, Erin)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, June 10, 2015
4 4 Certificate of Service regarding Motion of GUC Trust Trustee for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547 and 550 Filed by Peter Kravitz, as GUC Trust Trustee of the Exide Creditors' Liquidating Trust. (Fay, Erin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2015
3 3 Motion to Approve Motion of GUC Trust Trustee for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 Filed by Peter Kravitz, as GUC Trust Trustee of the Exide Creditors' Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 7/1/2015 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/24/2015. (Fay, Erin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2015
2 2 Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 15-50510 KJC) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 7597144, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 Adversary case 15-50510 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 by Peter Kravitz, as GUC Trust Trustee of the Exide Creditors' Liquidating Trust against Pure Marketing Group Corporation. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). AP Summons Served due date: 10/1/2015. (Fay, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives