Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08083
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2015
Terminated:Jan 31, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Applied Chemical Technology, Inc., an Alabama corporation
202 Shirley Drive
Florence, AL 35630
Represented By
Applied Chemical Technology, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins, Chapter 7 Trustee
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, January 31, 2017
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Tue 01/31 3:48 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8083 Judgment For - Dismissed by Stipulation, Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8083 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2017
20 20 order Stipulated Order Mon 01/30 4:27 PM
Order Granting Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 1/30/2017. (drh)
Related: [-] 19
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
19 19 motion Stipulation Wed 01/18 3:39 PM
Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2016
18 18 order Substitute Party Wed 11/23 2:29 PM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party adding Gary L. Rainsdon, terminating R. Sam Hopkins. Related [+] Signed on 11/23/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 15
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
17 17 misc Statement of No Objection Tue 11/15 11:06 AM
Statement of No Objection - In accordance with LBR 2002.2(d)(3) the moving party hereby certifies that no objection has been filed or received to the motion/application filed as Doc. Number15 . Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 15 Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Wed 10/26 11:29 AM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Clerk added an objection deadline of November 14, 2016, based on the notice given [14 days + 3 for mailing - (plus holiday and weekend)]. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon
Tuesday, October 25, 2016
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/25 1:07 PM
Notice of Appearance by Jason Ronald Naess Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Substitute Party Tue 10/25 1:06 PM
Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2016
14 14 misc Withdrawal Fri 10/21 4:11 PM
Withdrawal of Substitution of Counsel Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 13 Substitution of Attorney
Thursday, October 20, 2016
13 13 utility Substitution of Attorney Thu 10/20 2:56 PM
Substitution of Attorney. Involvement of Steven L Taggart; Stephen Kent Madsen and Robert J Maynes Terminated Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
12 12 order Order (Generic) Mon 10/26 10:17 AM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Re: Signed on 10/26/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2015
11 11 misc Consent Wed 09/02 8:58 AM
Consent Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2015
10 10 order Order (Generic) Fri 08/28 1:48 PM
Order Re Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders and Motions to Withdraw Reference. See attached Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders [to file Consent use Adversary/Notices/Consent] Signed on 8/28/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2015
9 9 misc Consent Thu 08/27 9:54 AM
Consent Filed by Defendant Applied Chemical Technology, Inc.. (Prince, Larry)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Thu 08/27 9:52 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Defendant Applied Chemical Technology, Inc.. (Prince, Larry)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/27 9:51 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Applied Chemical Technology, Inc. (Prince, Larry)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 06, 2015
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 07/06 9:01 AM
Summons Service Executed on Applied Chemical Technology, Inc. 7/1/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2015
5 5 court Summons Issued Wed 07/01 11:29 AM
Another Summons Issued on Applied Chemical Technology, Inc. Date Issued 7/1/2015, Answer Due 7/31/2015; John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 7/1/2015, Answer Due 7/31/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2015
4 4 Receipt of Complaint 15-08083 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5524547. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Monday, June 08, 2015
3 3 Summons Service Executed on Applied Chemical Technology, Inc. 6/8/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 Summons Issued on Applied Chemical Technology, Inc. Date Issued 6/8/2015, Answer Due 7/8/2015; John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 6/8/2015, Answer Due 7/8/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2015
1 1 Adversary case 15-08083 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against Applied Chemical Technology, Inc., John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons