Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08084
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2015
Terminated:Jan 17, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
ATR, Inc., a Texas corporation
1301 North Freeway
Houston, TX 77009
Represented By
ATR, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins, Chapter 7 Trustee
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Tue 01/17 4:09 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8084 Judgment For Dismissed by Stipulation, Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8084 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2017
20 20 order Stipulated Order Fri 01/13 4:52 PM
Order Granting Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 1/13/2017. (drh)
Related: [-] 19
19 19 motion Stipulation Fri 01/13 3:25 PM
Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2016
18 18 order Substitute Party Wed 11/23 2:30 PM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party adding Gary L. Rainsdon, terminating R. Sam Hopkins. Related [+] Signed on 11/23/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 15
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
17 17 misc Statement of No Objection Tue 11/15 11:07 AM
Statement of No Objection - In accordance with LBR 2002.2(d)(3) the moving party hereby certifies that no objection has been filed or received to the motion/application filed as Doc. Number15 . Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 15 Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Wed 10/26 11:43 AM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Clerk added an objection deadline of November 14, 2016, based on the notice given [14 days + 3 for mailing - (plus holiday and weekend)]. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon
Tuesday, October 25, 2016
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/25 1:11 PM
Notice of Appearance by Jason Ronald Naess Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Substitute Party Tue 10/25 1:11 PM
Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2016
14 14 misc Withdrawal Fri 10/21 4:12 PM
Withdrawal of Substitution of Counsel Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 13 Substitution of Attorney
Thursday, October 20, 2016
13 13 utility Substitution of Attorney Thu 10/20 2:59 PM
Substitution of Attorney. Involvement of Steven L Taggart; Stephen Kent Madsen and Robert J Maynes Terminated Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
12 12 order Order (Generic) Mon 10/26 10:18 AM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Re: Signed on 10/26/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2015
11 11 misc Consent Wed 08/05 11:04 AM
Consent Filed by Defendant ATR, Inc.. (Kerl, R)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2015
10 10 misc Consent Fri 07/31 4:48 PM
Consent Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2015
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 07/30 3:07 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant ATR, Inc. (Kerl, R)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2015
8 8 order Order (Generic) Fri 07/24 4:43 PM
Order Re Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders and Motions to Withdraw Reference. See attached Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders [to file Consent use Adversary/Notices/Consent] Signed on 7/24/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2015
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/20 9:09 AM
Notice of Appearance by R Ron Kerl Filed by Defendant ATR, Inc.. (Kerl, R)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2015
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 07/08 10:13 AM
Summons Service Executed on ATR, Inc. 7/8/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2015
5 5 court Summons Issued Tue 07/07 3:11 PM
Another Summons Issued on ATR, Inc. Date Issued 7/7/2015, Answer Due 8/6/2015; John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 7/7/2015, Answer Due 8/6/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2015
4 4 Receipt of Complaint 15-08084 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5524547. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Monday, June 08, 2015
3 3 Summons Service Executed on ATR, Inc. 6/8/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 Summons Issued on ATR, Inc. Date Issued 6/8/2015, Answer Due 7/8/2015; John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 6/8/2015, Answer Due 7/8/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2015
1 1 Adversary case 15-08084 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against ATR, Inc., John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons