Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08086
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2015
Terminated:Jan 31, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ocenco, Inc., a Pennsylvania corporation
10225 82nd Avenue
Pleasant Prairie, WI 53158
Represented By
Ocenco, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins, Chapter 7 Trustee
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, January 31, 2017
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Tue 01/31 3:54 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8086 Judgment For - Dismissed by Stipulation, Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8086 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2017
19 19 order Stipulated Order Mon 01/30 4:28 PM
Order Granting Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 1/30/2017. (drh)
Related: [-] 18
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
18 18 motion Stipulation Wed 01/18 3:41 PM
Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2016
17 17 order Substitute Party Wed 11/23 2:32 PM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party adding Gary L. Rainsdon, terminating R. Sam Hopkins. Related [+] Signed on 11/23/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 14
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
16 16 misc Statement of No Objection Tue 11/15 11:09 AM
Statement of No Objection - In accordance with LBR 2002.2(d)(3) the moving party hereby certifies that no objection has been filed or received to the motion/application filed as Doc. Number14 . Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 14 Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Wed 10/26 11:55 AM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Clerk added an objection deadline of November 14, 2016, based on the notice given [14 days + 3 for mailing - (plus holiday and weekend)]. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon
Tuesday, October 25, 2016
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/25 1:19 PM
Notice of Appearance by Jason Ronald Naess Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Substitute Party Tue 10/25 1:19 PM
Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2016
13 13 misc Withdrawal Fri 10/21 4:13 PM
Withdrawal of Substitution of Counsel Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 12 Substitution of Attorney
Thursday, October 20, 2016
12 12 utility Substitution of Attorney Thu 10/20 3:07 PM
Substitution of Attorney. Involvement of Steven L Taggart; Stephen Kent Madsen and Robert J Maynes Terminated Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
11 11 order Order (Generic) Mon 10/26 10:20 AM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Re: Signed on 10/26/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 06, 2015
10 10 misc Consent Thu 08/06 11:00 AM
Consent Filed by Defendant Ocenco, Inc.. (Prince, Larry)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/06 10:58 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Ocenco, Inc. (Prince, Larry)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2015
8 8 misc Consent Fri 07/31 4:49 PM
Consent Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2015
7 7 order Order (Generic) Fri 07/24 4:45 PM
Order Re Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders and Motions to Withdraw Reference. See attached Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders [to file Consent use Adversary/Notices/Consent] Signed on 7/24/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 21, 2015
6 6 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 07/21 10:43 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Defendant Ocenco, Inc.. (Prince, Larry)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice Tue 07/21 10:42 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Defendant Ocenco, Inc.. (Prince, Larry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2015
4 4 Receipt of Complaint 15-08086 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5524547. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Monday, June 08, 2015
3 3 Summons Service Executed on Ocenco, Inc. 6/8/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 Summons Issued on John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 6/8/2015, Answer Due 7/8/2015; Ocenco, Inc. Date Issued 6/8/2015, Answer Due 7/8/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2015
1 1 Adversary case 15-08086 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against Ocenco, Inc., John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons