Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08087
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2015
Terminated:Dec 21, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Otis Elevator Company, a New Jersey corporation
One Carrier Place
Farmington, CT 06032
Represented By
Otis Elevator Company
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins, Chapter 7 Trustee
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Wed 12/21 9:24 AM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8087 Judgment For N/A; Case Settled, Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8087 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
24 24 order Stipulated Order Tue 12/20 4:52 PM
Order Granting Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 12/20/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 23
23 23 motion Stipulation Tue 12/20 10:18 AM
Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2016
22 22 order Substitute Party Wed 11/23 2:33 PM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party adding Gary L. Rainsdon, terminating R. Sam Hopkins. Related [+] Signed on 11/23/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 19
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
21 21 misc Statement of No Objection Tue 11/15 11:10 AM
Statement of No Objection - In accordance with LBR 2002.2(d)(3) the moving party hereby certifies that no objection has been filed or received to the motion/application filed as Doc. Number19 . Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 19 Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Wed 10/26 11:57 AM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Clerk added an objection deadline of November 14, 2016, based on the notice given [14 days + 3 for mailing - (plus holiday and weekend)]. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon
Tuesday, October 25, 2016
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/25 1:30 PM
Notice of Appearance by Jason Ronald Naess Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Substitute Party Tue 10/25 1:29 PM
Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2016
18 18 misc Withdrawal Fri 10/21 4:14 PM
Withdrawal of Substitution of Counsel Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 17 Substitution of Attorney
Thursday, October 20, 2016
17 17 utility Substitution of Attorney Thu 10/20 3:10 PM
Substitution of Attorney. Involvement of Steven L Taggart; Stephen Kent Madsen and Robert J Maynes Terminated Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
16 16 order Order (Generic) Mon 10/26 10:20 AM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Re: Signed on 10/26/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 12, 2015
15 15 utility Substitution of Attorney Mon 10/12 10:27 AM
Substitution of Attorney. Involvement of Daniel C Green Terminated Filed by Defendant Otis Elevator Company. (Olsen, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 06, 2015
14 14 misc Consent Thu 08/06 8:43 AM
Consent Filed by Defendant Otis Elevator Company. (Green, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2015
13 13 misc Consent Fri 07/31 4:50 PM
Consent Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2015
12 12 order Order (Generic) Fri 07/24 4:46 PM
Order Re Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders and Motions to Withdraw Reference. See attached Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders [to file Consent use Adversary/Notices/Consent] Signed on 7/24/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2015
11 11 court Court's Certificate of Service Thu 07/09 11:25 AM
Court's Certificate of Service re 10 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application A notice of entry of the related document has been served on Registered Participants as reflected by the Notice of Electronic Filing. A Notice of Entry has also been served by First Class Mail Addressed to: Joshua W. Cohen Day Pitney, LLP One Audubon Street, 6th Floor New Haven, CT 06511 Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application filed by Defendant Otis Elevator Company
10 10 order Order on Pro Hac Vice Application Thu 07/09 11:25 AM
Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Application for Applicant Joshua W. Cohen by Judge Jim D. Pappas U.S. Bankruptcy Judge This is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. Pursuant to LBR 9010.1(d)(2)(A), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. This Order has been served on Debtor at the address of record. Related [+] Signed on 7/9/2015. (drh)
Related: [-] 6
Wednesday, July 08, 2015
9 9 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 07/08 1:27 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Corporate parents added to case: United Technologies Corporation. Filed by Defendant Otis Elevator Company. (Green, Daniel)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/08 1:25 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Otis Elevator Company (Green, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2015
7 7 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 07/07 10:52 AM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 15-08087 JDP) [motion,mprohac] ( 225.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5561246. Fee amount 225.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#6
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/07 10:50 AM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed by Defendant Otis Elevator Company (Green, Daniel)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/07 10:49 AM
Notice of Appearance by Daniel C Green Filed by Defendant Otis Elevator Company. (Green, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2015
4 4 Receipt of Complaint 15-08087 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5524547. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Monday, June 08, 2015
3 3 Summons Service Executed on Otis Elevator Company 6/8/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 Summons Issued on John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 6/8/2015, Answer Due 7/8/2015; Otis Elevator Company Date Issued 6/8/2015, Answer Due 7/8/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2015
1 1 Adversary case 15-08087 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against Otis Elevator Company, John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons