Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:13-bk-40838

Idaho Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jim D Pappas
Case #: 4:15-ap-08089
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2015
Terminated:Jan 17, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Terra Universal, Inc., a California corporation
9 San Simeon
Laguna Niguel, CA 92677
Represented By
Terra Universal, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 - 10
Represented By
John Does 1 - 10
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Sam Hopkins, Chapter 7 Trustee
P.O. Box 3014
Pocatello, ID 83206
Represented By
Robert J Maynes
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Steven L Taggart
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info
Stephen Kent Madsen
Maynes Taggart, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Tue 01/17 4:11 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:15-ap-8089 Judgment For Dismissed by Stipulation, Adversary Case 4:15-ap-8089 Closed (drh)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2017
22 22 order Stipulated Order Fri 01/13 4:55 PM
Order Granting Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 1/13/2017. (drh)
Related: [-] 21
21 21 motion Stipulation Fri 01/13 3:28 PM
Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2016
20 20 order Substitute Party Wed 11/23 2:35 PM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party adding Gary L. Rainsdon, terminating R. Sam Hopkins. Related [+] Signed on 11/23/2016. (drh)
Related: [-] 17
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
19 19 misc Statement of No Objection Tue 11/15 11:12 AM
Statement of No Objection - In accordance with LBR 2002.2(d)(3) the moving party hereby certifies that no objection has been filed or received to the motion/application filed as Doc. Number17 . Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 17 Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
utility Notification by the Clerk's Office Wed 10/26 12:01 PM
Notification by the Clerks Office: Clerk added an objection deadline of November 14, 2016, based on the notice given [14 days + 3 for mailing - (plus holiday and weekend)]. No further action is required. Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon
Tuesday, October 25, 2016
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/25 1:43 PM
Notice of Appearance by Jason Ronald Naess Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Substitute Party Tue 10/25 1:42 PM
Motion To Substitute Party Gary L. Rainsdon in place of Party Filed by Trustee Gary L. Rainsdon (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2016
utility Add Attorney Mon 10/24 10:35 AM
Attorney Robert J Maynes for R. Sam Hopkins added to case (drh)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2016
16 16 misc Withdrawal Fri 10/21 4:16 PM
Withdrawal of Substitution of Counsel Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins Related [+]. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-] 15 Substitution of Attorney
Thursday, October 20, 2016
15 15 utility Substitution of Attorney Thu 10/20 3:16 PM
Substitution of Attorney. Involvement of Steven L Taggart; Stephen Kent Madsen and Robert J Maynes Terminated Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Naess, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2015
14 14 order Order (Generic) Mon 10/26 10:22 AM
Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Re: Signed on 10/26/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2015
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/27 9:56 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Terra Universal, Inc. (Kerl, R)
Related: [-]
12 12 court Court's Certificate of Service Thu 08/27 9:10 AM
Court's Certificate of Service re 11 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application A notice of entry of the related document has been served on Registered Participants as reflected by the Notice of Electronic Filing. A Notice of Entry has also been served by First Class Mail Addressed to: Robert D. Coviello, Esq. 31815 Camino Capistrano, Ste 19 San Juan Capistrano CA 92675 Related [+] (drh)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Pro Hac Vice Application filed by Defendant Terra Universal, Inc.
11 11 order Order on Pro Hac Vice Application Thu 08/27 9:08 AM
Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Application for Applicant Robert D. Coviello by Judge Jim D. Pappas U.S. Bankruptcy Judge This is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. Pursuant to LBR 9010.1(d)(2)(A), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. This Order has been served on Debtor at the address of record. Related [+] Signed on 8/27/2015. (drh)
Related: [-] 9
Tuesday, August 25, 2015
10 10 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 08/25 9:17 AM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 15-08089 JDP) [motion,mprohac] ( 225.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5624143. Fee amount 225.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#9
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 08/25 9:16 AM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed by Defendant Terra Universal, Inc. (Kerl, R)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 24, 2015
8 8 misc Consent Mon 08/24 12:39 PM
Consent Filed by Plaintiff R. Sam Hopkins. (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Consent Mon 08/24 11:22 AM
Consent Filed by Defendant Terra Universal, Inc.. (Kerl, R)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2015
6 6 order Order (Generic) Fri 08/21 4:51 PM
Order Re Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders and Motions to Withdraw Reference. See attached Consent to Entry of Final Judgment and Orders [to file Consent use Adversary/Notices/Consent] Signed on 8/21/2015. (drh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/21 3:48 PM
Notice of Appearance by R Ron Kerl Filed by Defendant Terra Universal, Inc.. (Kerl, R)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2015
4 4 Receipt of Complaint 15-08089 JDP) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 5524547. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Monday, June 08, 2015
3 3 Summons Service Executed on Terra Universal, Inc. 6/8/2015 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 Summons Issued on John Does 1 - 10 Date Issued 6/8/2015, Answer Due 7/8/2015; Terra Universal, Inc. Date Issued 6/8/2015, Answer Due 7/8/2015 (nl)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2015
1 1 Adversary case 15-08089 13 Related [+]: Complaint by R. Sam Hopkins against Terra Universal, Inc., John Does 1 - 10. Fee Amount $350 (Maynes, Robert)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Supplement Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Supplement Summons